Aleksandr Malyutin, Petitioner v. Condoleeza Rice, former Secretary of State, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-663

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aleksandr Malyutin, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Davydkovskaya St.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aleksandr Malyutin +11212 +11 112 1212
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Respondent
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice, former Secretary of State, et al."
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 10-5015
Lower Court Decision Date 7/6/2010
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondents Condoleeza Rice, former Secretary of State, et al. to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2010)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?