Hamdy Alex Abou-Hussein, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-739

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hamdy Alex Abou-Hussein, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex Hamdy +1 405 405 0551
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al."
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-5358
Lower Court Decision Date 6/11/2010
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 21, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondents Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al. to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 426 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?