Arnaldo Cabrera, Petitioner v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-845

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Arnaldo Cabrera, Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-2553-cr
Lower Court Decision Date 5/6/2010
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 18, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?