Eddie Humphrey, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-10680

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eddie Humphrey, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eddie Humphrey 1 +10 +10 1000
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Celia Ann Terenzio +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5099 Celia.Terenzio@myfloridalegal.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 11-13549
Lower Court Decision Date 1/9/2012
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2012)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?