Shaw Coastal, Inc., Petitioner v. John Cherry
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-1419

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Shaw Coastal, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Frilot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie Weill Ehret +1 504 599 8203 +1 504 599 8263 lehret@frilot.com
Space Joseph N Mole PHV +1 504 599 8006 +1 504 599 8106 jmole@frilot.com
v.
No Logo John Cherry, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 11-30403
Lower Court Decision Date 1/19/2012
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
    Supplemental brief of petitioner Shaw Coastal, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012.
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent John Cherry in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2012)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 18 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?