Anthony Sarkis, Petitioner v. Miroslav Lajcak, et al.

Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-167
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Anthony Sarkis, Petitioner

Represented by MUSOLINO & DESSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Musolino +1 202 466 3883 +1 202 775 7477 pmusolino@musolinoanddessel.com
v.
No Logo Miroslav Lajcak, et al., Respondent

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Alan Cymrot +1 202 861 1677 +1 202 861 1783 mcymrot@bakerlaw.com
Attributes
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-17506
Lower Court Decision Date 3/28/2011
Timeline
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2011.
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
Reply of petitioner Anthony Sarkis filed.
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Brief of respondents Miroslav Lajcak, et al. in opposition filed.
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2011)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 20 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?