Gabriel R. DiMeco, III, Petitioner v. Connecticut
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-406

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gabriel R. DiMeco, III, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo CONNECTICUT, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy L. Chupak +1 860 258 5807
Lower Court Appellate Court of Connecticut
Lower Court Case No(s). AC 32202
Lower Court Decision Date 4/26/2011
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Connecticut to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 16 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?