Timothy Nelson Butler, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-6850

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Timothy Nelson Butler, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by P E Marine & Petroleum Equipment

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy N. Butler +1 503 503 0396
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Celia Ann Terenzio +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5099 Celia.Terenzio@myfloridalegal.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 11-11108
Lower Court Decision Date 6/17/2011
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 14, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?