Robert Bennett, Petitioner v. United States

Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-8280
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert Bennett, Petitioner

Represented by Etowah County Detention Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bennett +153680 153 536 8074
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Attributes
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 10-5165
Lower Court Decision Date 9/28/2011
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 10, 2012.
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/2012, Entered: None
Petition for Rehearing filed.
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2012.
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 43 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?