Alexander Samuel, Petitioner v. Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 12-7927

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexander, Samuel, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Samuel +1 718 338 0584
v.
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Respondent
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard J. Koerner +1 212 356 2500 lkoerner@law.nyc.gov
Related Case 12A288
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 11-4152
Lower Court Decision Date 3/21/2012
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2013.
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 22, 2013.
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondents Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York, et al. to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 28, 2013)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                Application (12A288) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until November 30, 2012.
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                  Application (12A288) to extend further the time from October 30, 2012 to November 30, 2012, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                    Application (12A288) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until October 30, 2012.
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                      Application (12A288) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 1, 2012 to October 30, 2012, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?