Michael Charles DeSue, Petitioner v. Michael D. Crews, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 13-6843

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Charles DeSue, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Etowah County Detention Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Charles DeSue +72 729 729 9878
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Dept. of Corrections

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Bartlett Brewster +1 850 717 3605
Lower Court District Court of Appeal of Florida, First District
Lower Court Case No(s). 1D12-3662
Lower Court Decision Date 10/12/2012
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 26, 2013.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 12, 2013)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?