District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Delaware District Court Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit United States Supreme Court

Leo E. Strine, Jr., et al., Petitioners v. Delaware Coalition For Open Government, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 13-869

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leo E. Strine, Jr., et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Finger & Slanina LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Finger +1 302 573 2525 +1 302 573 2524 dfinger@delawgroup.com
No Logo Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Business Roundtable, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Garre +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 gregory.garre@lw.com
No Logo NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., and NYSE Euronet, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William B. Chandler, III +1 302 856 4235
No Logo TechNet, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey B. Wall +1 202 956 7500 wallj@sullcrom.com
No Logo Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP, Other Party
Officially listed as "Wachtell,Lipton, Rosen, & Katz"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George T. Conway, III +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 gtconway@wlrk.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 12-3859
Lower Court Decision Date 10/23/2013
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
    Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Firms GRANTED.
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
      Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by TechNet GRANTED.
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
        Reply of petitioners Leo E. Strine, Jr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 21, 2014.
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
            Brief amici curiae of NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., and NYSE Euronet filed.
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
              Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Firms filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Business Roundtable filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                  Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by TechNet.
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                    Brief of respondent Delaware Coalition For Open Government, Inc. in opposition filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2014)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 70 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?