Beth Ann Muse, Petitioner v. Georgia
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 13-8734

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Beth Ann Muse, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
v.
No Logo Georgia, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula K. Smith +1 404 656 3351 psmith@law.ga.gov
Related Case 13A540
Lower Court Supreme Court of Georgia
Lower Court Case No(s). S13A1224
Lower Court Decision Date 9/23/2013
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Georgia to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 21, 2014)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
          Application (13A540) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 20, 2014.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
            Application (13A540) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2013 to February 20, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas.
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 591 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?