William Wallace, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 13-9111

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William, Wallace, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Wallace +1 973 373 4725
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Celia Ann Terenzio +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5099 Celia.Terenzio@myfloridalegal.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 13-12388
Lower Court Decision Date 9/19/2013
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2014.
    LREF
    Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
    Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
      LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
      Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2014)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 15 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?