Secure identification system

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10327919
Examiner Jamara Alzaida Franklin, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Jamara Alzaida Franklin
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Boyd, Jason Graeme, Applicant

Represented by Jason Boyd

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Boyd, Jason Graeme, Perth (AU)
Filing Date December 26, 2002
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number
Confirmation Number 7488
Group Art Unit 2876
Class / Sub-Class 235 / 380
Timeline
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.
Petition Entered (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (25 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - ADS
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?