Progressively functional stretch garments
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10334527
Examiner Melanie Jo Hand, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stevens, Robert Alan, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorrity & Manning, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Umesh Desai +1 512 372 5911
Space Samuel Dworetsky +1 845 352 5652
Space Susan Mcgahan +1 908 532 1996 sm1561@att.com
Space Stephen Pentlicki +1 908 532 1931
Space Thomas Restaino +1 908 532 1910
Space Alexander Silverman +1 425 580 8418
Space Geoff Sutcliffe +1 404 927 2780
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Stevens, Robert Alan, Menasha, WI (US)
Filing Date January 1, 2003
Status On Appeal -- Awaiting Decision by the Board of Appeals
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 14494
Confirmation Number 4965
Group Art Unit 3761
Class / Sub-Class 604 / 385
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Docketing Notice Mailed to Appellant
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
    Assignment of Appeal Number
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - AP_DK_M
      Appeal Docketing Notice (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
        Appeal Awaiting BPAI Docketing
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
          Mail Supplemental Examiner's Answer
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - APE2
            2nd or Subsequent Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief (5 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
              2nd or Subsequent Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Reply Brief Filed
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                    EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - APRB
                      Reply Brief Filed (6 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Mail Supplemental Examiner's Answer
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                          2nd or Subsequent Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - APE2
                            2nd or Subsequent Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief (4 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Mail Notice of Withdrawn Action
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - W/AC
                                Letter Withdrawing/Vacating Office Action (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Withdrawing/Vacating Office Action Letter
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Order Returning Undocketed Appeal to the Examiner
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - APRD
                                        Order Returning Undocketed Appeal to the examiner from BPAI (4 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Appeal Awaiting BPAI Docketing
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Mail Reply Brief Noted by Examiner
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - RBNE
                                              Reply Brief Noted - BPAI (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Reply Brief Noted by Examiner
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Reply Brief Filed
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                      EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - APRB
                                                        Reply Brief Filed (9 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Exam. Ans. Review Complete
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Mail Examiner's Answer
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - APEA
                                                              Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief (15 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Appeal Brief Review Complete
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Appeal Brief Filed
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                          EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                            Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.B
                                                                              Appeal Brief Filed (40 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                Mail Appeals conf. Proceed to BPAI
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.PRE.DEC
                                                                                  Pre-Brief Appeal Conference decision (2 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.PRE.DEC
                                                                                        Pre-Brief Appeal Conference decision (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Pre-Appeals Conference Decision - Proceed to BPAI
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                            Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                              Request for Pre-Appeal Conference Filed
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Notice of Appeal Filed
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                    Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                                                      EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                        Power of Attorney (7 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                          Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                            Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N/AP
                                                                                                              Notice of Appeal Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                                                                EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.PRE.REQ
                                                                                                                    Pre-Brief Conference request (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                      Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                        Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                          List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                            Final Rejection (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                              Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
                                                                                                                                    Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                                                                                        EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                            Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                    Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                        Non-Final Rejection (11 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                            Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                    Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - R3.73B
                                                                                                                                                                      Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                                                                                                                        EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                            Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                    Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                            Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final Rejection (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claims (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claims (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement considered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (68 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Reference (50 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Reference (42 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement considered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Reference (42 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Reference (40 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Reference (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Reference (21 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Reference (25 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (30 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Reference (27 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Application Filing Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Claims (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Specification (36 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?