Systems and methods for location dependent information download to a mobile telephone
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10334538
Examiner Matthew C Sams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Koster, Karl H., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karl H. Koster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Dawson +1 503 274 2215
Space Mark Meininger +1 503 224 2170
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Koster, Karl H., Atlanta, GA (US)
Filing Date January 1, 2003
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number KOSTK-2
Confirmation Number 4969
Group Art Unit 2617
Class / Sub-Class 455 / 456
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
    Petition Decision - Granted
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
      Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
        Petition Decision - Dismissed
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
          Fee Worksheet (SB06) (6 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
            Petition Decision (3 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
              Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N572
                      Response - Re: Informal Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Petition Entered
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
                          Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                            Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Workflow - Request for RCE - Finish
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Petition Entered
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                    Extension of Time (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                      Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                        Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
                                              Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (5 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
                                                  Abandonment (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                          Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                              Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                  Final Rejection (9 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Final Rejection
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/21/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                  Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                    Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                      Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                          Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                              Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                  List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                      Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                        Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                              IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                    Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                      Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                        Additional Application Filing Fees
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                          Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                            Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                                                                              Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                      Cleared by L&R (LARS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                            IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                              IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                    Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                      Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                        Drawings-only black and white line drawings (23 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                          Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                            Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                              Specification (42 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?