Access ramp having self-contained hydraulics and improved bushing assembly
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10334646
Examiner Gregory W Adams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Burney, Donald Joe, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley Achey +1 404 881 4930
Space David Alban +1 704 444 1174
Space Blas Arroyo +1 704 444 1012
Space William M Atkinson +1 704 377 1561
Space Dane Baltich +1 404 881 7000
Space Timothy Balts +1 704 444 1000
Space Kevin Belote +1 678 808 7780
Space David Ben-Meir +1 213 576 1000
Space Keith Broyles +1 404 881 7000
Space Brock Buck +1 919 862 2338
Space Rosemarie Celli +1 650 838 2000
Space Diana Chen +1 213 576 1000
Space Shengfeng Chen +1 650 493 9300
Space Janice Ann Christensen +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 janice.christensen@alston.com
Space Stephanie Chu +1 770 634 7577
Space Jeffrey Connor +1 303 571 4000
Space Michael S. Connor +1 704 377 1561
Space Jason Cook +1 214 992 3407
Space Jason Cooper +1 404 881 7000
Space Jeffrey Cooper +1 404 881 7000
Space Cory Davis +1 404 881 7258
Space Marissa Ducca +1 202 756 3369
Space Brian Ellsworth +1 704 444 1000
Space Matthew Ennis +1 980 345 6916
Space George Fox +1 650 383 2048
Space Christopher Gegg +1 704 444 1024
Space Zachary Gill +1 404 385 0421
Space Michele Glessner +1 704 444 1000
Space Wendy Gombert +1 919 862 2200
Space Guy Gosnell +1 704 444 1000
Space Gregory Gronholm +1 404 881 7000
Space CHRISTOPHER S. HAGGERTY. +1 404 881 7000
Space John Haynes +1 404 881 7000
Space Steven Hemminger +1 650 838 2000
Space Leslie Henry +1 919 862 2260
Space Todd Hess +1 980 213 6929
Space Donald Jr Hill +1 704 444 1000
Space Yitai Hu +1 650 838 2020
Space Daniel Le Huynh +7 040 444 1133 daniel.huynh@alston.com
Space Travis Iams +1 808 371 4690
Space John III Johnson +1 704 544 6828
Space Larry Jones +1 704 444 1019
Space Adam Kaplan +1 704 444 1000
Space Patrick Kartes +1 704 444 1000
Space Christopher Kelly +1 404 881 4416
Space Sang Kim +1 650 305 0514
Space Trent Kirk +1 704 752 6513
Space Ryan Koppelman +1 404 881 7000
Space Jessica Lewis +1 612 432 9540
Space Charles Leyes +1 704 444 1457
Space JOE LIEBESCHUETZ +1 650 838 2038
Space Christopher Lightner +1 404 881 7882
Space Hsin-Hsin Liu +1 510 687 1871
Space Jitendra Malik +1 704 444 1115 +1 704 444 1111 jitty.malik@alston.com
Space Todd McClelland +1 404 881 4789
Space Michael McCoy +1 704 444 1011
Space Richard McDermott +1 704 444 1045
Space Stephen McNiff +1 404 881 7452
Space Albert Minn +1 919 862 2200
Space Dwayne Norton +1 214 922 3437
Space Christopher Orders +1 704 331 4965
Space Thomas Parker +1 212 210 9529
Space S Pleune +1 704 444 1000
Space Edward Prince +1 202 239 3358
Space NATHANIEL T. QUIRK +1 704 444 1000
Space Bruce Rose +1 704 444 1000
Space David Saravitz +1 919 862 2200
Space Walter Scott +1 212 210 9400 wscott@alston.com
Space Andrea Sherk +1 919 862 2220
Space Jessica Sibley +1 704 338 6029
Space Benjamin Sidbury +1 704 444 1056
Space Bryan Skelton +1 919 862 2200
Space Miranda Sooter +1 704 364 6101
Space Victoria Spataro +1 212 210 9465
Space Andrew Tyler Spence +1 704 384 2667 +1 704 384 2928 andy.spence@smithmoorelaw.com
Space W. Spruill +1 919 862 2200
Space M. Stevens +1 704 444 1025
Space Robert Strean +1 704 444 1430
Space Jeffrey Sunman +1 919 862 2207
Space GEORGE M. TAULBEE. +1 704 444 1000
Space Lance Termes +1 650 838 2000
Space David Teske +1 404 881 7000
Space Jonathan Thomas +1 704 444 1446
Space Matthew Urbanawiz +1 404 881 4957
Space Xing Wang +1 650 838 2039
Space Veronica Weinstein +1 650 838 2000
Space Alan Whitehurst +1 202 756 3300
Space Kelly Williamson +1 919 862 2200
Space Jeffrey Young +1 404 872 4412
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Burney, Donald Joe, Weaver, AL (US)
Filing Date January 1, 2003
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 44479-255171
Confirmation Number 4603
Group Art Unit 3652
Class / Sub-Class 414 / 537
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
    Abandonment (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
      Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
        Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
          Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
            Index of Claims (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
              List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Final Rejection
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                    Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Response after Non-Final Action
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                            Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                              EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                  Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                      Claims (10 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                            Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
                                                  Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                    List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                      Non-Final Rejection (9 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Non-Final Rejection
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                          EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                            Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                              Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                                                EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                                                                  Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (2 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                      Claims (10 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                        Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (16 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                            Claims (16 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                              Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                    List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                      Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                        Final Rejection
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                          Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                            Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                              Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                  Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                    Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                      Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                        Claims (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                            Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                              Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                        Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                          Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                            Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                              Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                  Claims (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                    Specification (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                      Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                          Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                              List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                    Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Election / Restriction Filed
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                          Workflow incoming amendment IFW
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ELC.
                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Election / Restriction Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Restriction Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTRS
                                                                                                                                                                                Requirement for Restriction/Election (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                  Restriction/Election Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                      IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                            Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Payment of additional filing fee/Preexam
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Applicant has submitted new drawings to correct Corrected Papers problems
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Drawings-only black and white line drawings (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Claims (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Specification (23 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?