Polymerization Of Olefins Using A Ziegler-natta Catalyst System Having An External Electron Donor
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10335751
Examiner Ling Siu Choi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bauch, Christopher G., Applicant

Represented by JOSEPH A. WALKOWSKI, JR.

Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Bauch, Christopher G., Prairieville, LA (US)
Filing Date January 1, 2003
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number COS-758
Confirmation Number 7126
Group Art Unit 1713
Class / Sub-Class 526 / 142
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
      Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
        Issue Notification Mailed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
          Receipt into Pubs
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
            Dispatch to FDC
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
              Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                Receipt into Pubs
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Issue Fee Payment Verified
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Fee Payment Received
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                      Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Receipt into Pubs
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                              Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                  Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                    Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                      Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (5 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                        Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
                                                List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
                                                  Foreign Reference (21 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                    List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                      Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Non-Final Rejection
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Transfer Inquiry to GAU
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                              Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (8 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Application Is Now Complete
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Cleared by L&R (LARS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                    Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                      Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                        Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                          Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                            Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                              Specification (16 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                      Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                        Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                          Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                            Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                              Specification (16 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?