Process For Preparing Alpha-hydroxyamides And Alpha-ketoamides On A Solid Phase Support
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10335782
Examiner Shailendra Kumar, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chen, Jian, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY - CECOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Addington +1 513 983 9378
Space Amy Ahn-Roll +1 513 983 7592
Space Richard Alexander +1 513 983 7631
Space Jeffrey Bamber +1 513 983 9956
Space AMANDA T. BARRY +1 513 983 0778
Space Christian Best +1 513 983 5546
Space Brian Bolam +1 513 983 1571
Space Adam Borgman +1 513 983 7422
Space Roddy Bullock +1 513 983 6482
Space Jason Camp +4 906 196 8931
Space Kathleen Carter +1 513 983 2114
Space Mark Charles +1 513 983 6801
Space Steven Chuey +1 513 983 0095
Space Karen Clark +1 513 983 6950
Space CYNTHIA L. CLAY +1 513 983 9764
Space JOHN P. COLBERT +1 513 983 6678
Space Christopher Cook +1 513 983 1004
Space Brahm Corstanje +1 513 983 3193
Space John Dipre +1 513 369 4239
Space MARIANNE DRESSMAN +1 513 983 4642
Space THIBAULT FAYETTE +1 513 983 0974
Space Matthew Fitzpatrick +1 513 893 7598
Space Gary Foose +1 513 983 9450
Space Amy Foust +1 513 983 7992
Space William Gallagher +1 513 983 2522
Space Julia Glazer +1 513 983 7989
Space Laura Grunzinger +1 804 330 1055
Space Timothy Guffey +1 513 983 0268
Space Andrew Hagerty +1 513 983 3762
Space Angela Haughey +1 513 983 6815
Space Emelyn Hiland +1 513 983 2933
Space John Howell +1 707 666 2259
Space Eileen Hughett +1 513 983 7927
Space Larry Huston +1 513 983 8155
Space Megan Hymore +1 513 983 3279
Space Kevin Johnson +1 617 463 4136
Space Melody Jones +1 513 983 9860
Space Dara Kendall 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Melissa Krasovec +1 513 983 5228
Space Jay Krebs +1 513 983 7368
Space George Leal +1 513 983 0841
Space Leonard Lewis +1 513 983 7430
Space John Lipchitz +1 617 463 4096
Space Charles Matson +1 513 983 8579
Space David Mattheis +1 513 983 7065
Space James McBride +1 513 983 9213
Space Julie McConihay +1 513 651 6791
Space Kelly McDow +1 513 983 3798
Space Mary McMahon +1 513 983 0916
Space Peter Meyer +1 513 983 9084
Space Steven Miller +1 513 983 7327
Space Carrie Morgna +1 513 464 2057
Space Andrew Mueller +1 513 983 6851
Space Stephen Murphy +1 513 983 3968
Space BRIDGET D. MURRAY +1 304 738 4867
Space James Oehlenschlager +1 513 983 3820
Space Brenda Panichi +1 656 799 5214
Space Joanne Pappas +1 617 463 4097
Space Ken Patel +1 513 983 8901
Space Andrew Paul +1 513 983 9323
Space Brent Peebles +1 513 983 0400
Space John Powell +1 513 983 0523
Space Hilary Reinhardt +1 215 558 5732
Space Carl Roof +1 513 983 1246
Space Tara Rosnell +1 513 983 1322
Space Ronald Sia +1 617 463 4095
Space Linda Sivik +1 513 983 4639
Space Angela Stone +1 513 983 7418
Space Armina Stricklin +1 513 983 6154
Space David Upite +1 513 983 7598
Space James Vago +1 513 983 6654
Space VLADIMIR VITENBERG +1 513 626 1932
Space Austin Wang +1 781 999 7386
Space Charles Ware +1 513 983 0498
Space David Weirich +1 513 983 4514
Space Laura Whitmer +1 513 983 6431
Space Jerry Yetter +1 513 741 8516
Space Betty Zea +1 513 983 5737
Space Kim Zerby +1 513 983 4555
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Chen, Jian, Mason, OH (US)
Filing Date January 1, 2003
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 8875
Confirmation Number 7271
Group Art Unit 1621
Class / Sub-Class 564 / 124
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
      Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
        Issue Notification Mailed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
          Receipt into Pubs
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
            Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
              Receipt into Pubs
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                Issue Fee Payment Verified
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Issue Fee Payment Received
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Receipt into Pubs
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Dispatch to Publications
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Correction - Oath or Declaration NOT Required
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Mail Oath of Declaration Required
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Oath or Declaration Required
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Application Is Now Complete
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Initial Exam Team nn
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?