Electronic Message Delivery Using An Alternate Source Approach
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10347055
Examiner Victor D Lesniewski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Banister, Scott, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hickman Palermo Truong & Becker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Becker +1 408 414 1204
Space Marcel Bingham +1 408 414 1206
Space CHRISTOPHER J. BROKAW +1 408 402 5189
Space CHERYL A. EICHSTAEDT +1 408 377 0500
Space John Henkhaus 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Brian Hickman +1 408 414 1201
Space Craig Holmes +1 408 414 1207
Space Zurvan Mahamedi +1 408 236 6640
Space Christian Nicholes +1 408 414 1224
Space Christopher Palermo +1 408 414 1202
Space Meera Thakoor +1 408 414 1080
Space Bobby Truong +1 408 414 1234
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Banister, Scott, Pacifica, CA (US)
Filing Date January 16, 2003
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 60063-0021
Confirmation Number 5229
Group Art Unit 2152
Class / Sub-Class 709 / 206
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
    Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
        Issue Notification (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
          Receipt into Pubs
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
            Receipt into Pubs
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
              Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                Dispatch to FDC
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 3/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Issue Fee Payment Verified
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Issue Fee Payment Received
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                          Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Receipt into Pubs
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Receipt into Pubs
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Receipt into Pubs
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Receipt into Pubs
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Mail Notice of Allowance
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Mail Examiner's Amendment
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                        Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                          Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                            Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                              Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                  List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
                                                    List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                      Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (5 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                        Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Examiner's Amendment Communication
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement considered
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Reference capture on IDS
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                          Non Patent Literature (18 Pages)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                            Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                              Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                Foreign Reference (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (6 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                            Claims (20 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                  Claims (20 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                        List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                          Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                  Supplemental Response
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                    Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                      Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                        Specification (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SA..
                                                                                                                          Supplemental Response or Supplemental Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                    Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                                                                                                                        Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                            Claims (20 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                                                                              Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                                                                                                                                  Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                    Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                      Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                        Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                          Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                            List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                              Final Rejection (17 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                  Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
                                                                                                                                                                    Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (20 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
                                                                                                                                                                                  Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                    Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement considered
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ARTIFACT
                                                                                                                                                                                            Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement considered
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non-Final Rejection (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (44 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ARTIFACT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (18 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Claims (18 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final Rejection (22 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non Patent Literature (19 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Workflow incoming amendment IFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Claims (21 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Specification (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection (20 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rescind Nonpublication Request for Pre Grant Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - RESC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rescind Nonpublication Request for Pre Grant Pub (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Reference (17 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Claims (19 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Specification (54 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PG.NONPUB.RQ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Nonpublication request from applicant. (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (19 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Specification (54 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Pacr - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?