USA v. Lee
Criminal Case Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:12-cr-00073
District Judge Deborah M. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kyong Cha Lee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
Sealed Statement of Reasons as to Kyong Cha Lee. cc: USM, USPO, Finance (BMM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to Kyong Cha Lee (1), Count 1: 3 years probation; $10.00 special assessment. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/13/2012. cc:USM, USPO, Finance (BMM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith:Proposed Change of Plea/Imposition of Sentence Hearing as to Kyong Cha Lee held on 11/2/2012. Defendant plead guilty on Count 1 of the Indictment. Count 1: 3 years probation; $10.00 special assessment. Court ordered defendant's passport released and returned to defendant. Defendant to mail payment to U.S. District Court of Alaska at 222 W. 7th Avenue, box #4, Anchorage, AK 99513. cc: USM, USPO. (BMM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
        DMS ORDER: as to Kyong Cha Lee, Change of Plea Hearing/Sentencing is hereby reset for 11/2/2012 03:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
          DMS ORDER as to Kyong Cha Lee: Due to the unavailability of the defendant, the Change of Plea and Sentencing set for 10/29/2012 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and will be rescheduled. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) CC: USM, USPO (Entered: 10/29/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
            DMS ORDER: as to Kyong Cha Lee Setting Change of Plea and Sentence set for 10/29/2012 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Defendant and Interpreter (Esther Cho) to participate telephonically from United States District Court in Oahu, Hawaii. cc: USM, USPO. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER as to Kyong Cha Lee, Interpreter Esther Cho appointed in case as to Kyong Cha Lee. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 10/23/12. cc: Finance, FPD (CJA Clerk). (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: The parties are advised that the minute entry as to Kyong Cha Lee: 26 Status Conference (Change of Plea Hearing) is amended as follows: PDF AMENDED ONLY: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith:Status Conference (Change of Plea Hearing) as to Kyong Cha Lee held on 10/15/2012. Court ordered case manager to contact the clerk's office in the U.S. District Court of Honolu lu, Hawaii and make arrangements for the defendant to participate in a Change of Plea/Imposition of Sentence Hearing, in a courtroom with a Korean Interpreter, tentatively set for October 29. Time of hearing to be announced. Change of Plea Hearing tentatively set for 10/29/2012 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Sentencing tentatively set for 10/29/2012 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. A minute order to be sent out to all parties once a date and time have be an established with the court of Hawaii. Court appointed Korean Interpreter for all future hearings. Court ordered that the probation officer will not have to prepare a pre sentence report for the defendant prior to the Change of Plea/Imposition of Sentence Hearing. cc: USM, USPO (BMM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith:Status Conference (Change of Plea Hearing) as to Kyong Cha Lee held on 10/15/2012. Court ordered case manager to contact the clerk's office in the U.S. District Court of Honolulu, Hawaii and make arrangements for the defendant to participate in a Change of Plea/Imposition of Sentence Hearing, in a courtroom with a Korean Interpreter, tentatively set for October 29. Time of hearing to be announced. Change of Plea Hearing tentatively set for 10/29/2012 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Sentencing tentatively set for 10/29/2012 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. A minute order to be sent out to all parties once a date and time have been established with the court of Hawaii. Court appointed Korean Interpreter for all future hearings. Court ordered that the probation officer will not have to prepare a pre sentence report for the defendant prior to the Change of Plea/Imposition of Sentence Hearing. cc: USM, USPO (BMM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                    SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to Kyong Cha Lee (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Kyong Cha Lee (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                        DMS ORDER as to Kyong Cha Lee : After due consideration of defendant's Unopposed Motion for Defendant to Appear Telephonically at Change of Plea Hearing 22 , the court GRANTS the motion. Ms. Lee is to call the Court at (907) 677-6230 at 2:00 p.m., Alaska Standard Time, on October 15, 2012 to attend the proceedings. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) CC: USM, USPO (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Defendant to Appear Telephonically at Change of Plea Hearing by Kyong Cha Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                            SEALED PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM as to Kyong Cha Lee (French, Kyle) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kyong Cha Lee (French, Kyle) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                DMS ORDER as to Kyong Cha Lee re 18 Notice of Intent to Change Plea: A Change of Plea Hearing is scheduled for October 15, 2012 at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5. The trial set for October 9, 2012 is VACATED. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) CC: USM, USPO (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA as to Kyong Cha Lee (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF FILING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE CERTIFICATION by USA as to Kyong Cha Lee (French, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                      Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to Kyong Cha Lee issued by USA. (Attachments: # 1 USDC Hawaii Notice and Receipt of Passport) cc: Finance(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/24/12 in case as to Kyong Cha Lee. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          RRB ORDER as to Kyong Cha Lee; Defendant Kyong Cha Lee has been indicted on a Class B Misdemeanor charge. Under FRCrP 58(b)(2)(F), the defendant does not have a right to proceed before an Article III judge. This case is no longer assigned to Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline. All proceedings in this case shall be before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: The parties are advised that the PDF DOCUMENT as to Kyong Cha Lee: 6 Arraignment is amended as follows: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Arraignment on Indictment as to Kyong Cha Lee (1) held on 8/24/2012. Cara McNamara appointed. $5,000.00 Unsecured Bond. Defendant plead not guilty to count 1 of the Indictment. Trial by Court set for 10/9/2012 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Court ordered parties to meet and confer by 8/31/2012. Court ordered defendant to surrender U.S. Passport to the Clerk of Court in Honolulu, HI in one week. cc: USM, USPO, FPD(CJA Clerk). (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER of Release as to Kyong Cha Lee Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/24/2012. cc: orig plus 1 cy to USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                Bail Information Sheet re 10 Order Setting Conditions of Release and 9 Appearance Bond by Kyong Cha Lee. cc: USM, USPO (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kyong Cha Lee Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/24/2012. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Appearance Bond set as to Kyong Cha Lee in amount of $ 5,000.00 Unsecured. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF PROGRESSION OF A CRIMINAL CASE as to Kyong Cha Lee: Pretrial Motions due by 9/14/2012. Trial by Court set for 10/9/2012 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/24/2012. cc: USM, USPO, Jury Clerk. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kyong Cha Lee. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Arraignment on Indictment as to Kyong Cha Lee (1) held on 8/24/2012. Cara McNamara appointed. $5,000.00 Unsecured Bond. Defendant plead not guilty to count 1 of the Indictment. Trial by Court set for 10/9/2012 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Court ordered parties to meet and confer by 8/31/2012. Court ordered defendant to surrender U.S. Passport to the Clerk of Court in Honolulu, HI in one week. cc: USM, USPO, FPD(CJA Clerk). (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                            DMS ORDER: as to Kyong Cha Lee re 2 Indictment, Arraignment previously set for 8/27/12 at 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RESET for 8/24/2012 04:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO and FPD (CJA Clerk). (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                              DMS ORDER: as to Kyong Cha Lee re 2 Indictment, Arraignment set for 8/27/2012 10:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO and FPD (CJA Clerk). (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF INTERPRETER; def requires Korean interpreter by USA as to Kyong Cha Lee. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Kyong Cha Lee. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    INDICTMENT COVER SHEET(S) AND SIGNATURES as to Kyong Cha Lee (1) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Lee) (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?