Bao v. SolarCity Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-01435
District Judge Beth Labson Freeman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 13, 2019 at 11:46 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tai Jan Bao, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
Space Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Space Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@pomlaw.com
v.
No Logo Lyndon R. Rive, Defendant
No Logo Robert D. Kelly, Defendant
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ignacio Evaristo Salceda +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 isalceda@wsgr.com
No Logo Fred Lepage, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
No Logo JAMES WEBB, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Marc Goldberg +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mmgoldberg@glancylaw.com
No Logo John Collins, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Punzalan Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Punzalan +1 650 362 4150 +1 650 362 4151 mark@chanpunzalan.com
No Logo Robert C. Hamilton, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eli Greenstein +1 415 400 3000 +1 415 400 3001 egreenstein@ktmc.com
No Logo Wenkai Zeng, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Bright +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 tbright@gbclaw.com
Space Solomon Benjamin Cera +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 scera@gbcslaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA as to 89 Notice of Appeal filed by James Webb (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION of USCA. For the foregoing reasons, we affirm the district courts dismissal of the TAC. Plaintiff-Appellants pending motion for judicial notice is granted. Plaintiff-Appellant shall bear the costs on appeal. AFFIRMED. Judge: MDS Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER DENYING 91 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/17/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING 101 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
            STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING filed by Tai Jan Bao, James Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
              ORDER of USCA as to 89 Notice of Appeal filed by James Webb. The courts records reflect that appellant timely filed a motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), which is still pending. The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellees shall notify this court in writing of the ruling. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, the appealing party must file a notice of appeal or an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. Appellees streamlined request for an extension of time to file the answering brief (Docket Entry No. 20 ) is denied as unnecessary. Briefing is suspended pending the district courts resolution of the post-judgment motion. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                REPLY (re 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Judgment by Conducting the PSLRA's Mandatory Rule 11 Inquiry and Imposing Sanctions ) filed byRobert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tesla Motors Inc. for SolarCity Corporation. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    DECLARATION of Emma Gilmore in Opposition to 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Judgment by Conducting the PSLRA's Mandatory Rule 11 Inquiry and Imposing Sanctions filed byJames Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Gilmore, Emma) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Opposition to 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Judgment by Conducting the PSLRA's Mandatory Rule 11 Inquiry and Imposing Sanctions filed byJames Webb. (Related document(s) 91 ) (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Judgment by Conducting the PSLRA's Mandatory Rule 11 Inquiry and Imposing Sanctions ) filed byJames Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Transcript Designation Form (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING 92 STIPULATION RE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/8/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Judgment by Conducting the PSLRA's Mandatory Rule 11 Inquiry and Imposing Sanctions filed by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ignacio E. Salceda with Exhibits 1-2, # 2 Proposed Order)(Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    USCA Scheduling Order for USCA Case Number 16-16440 US Court of Appeals for 89 Notice of Appeal filed by James Webb. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by James Webb. Appeal of Judgment 88, Order on Motion to Dismiss 87 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10690456 paid.) (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/9/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING 81 MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/9/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Pafiti (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/5/2016) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                REPLY (re 81 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byRobert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/6/2016) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                  LEAD PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 81 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereoffiled by James Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/15/2016) Modified on 4/18/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 81 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byRobert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/15/2016. Replies due by 5/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 7, # 3 Proposed Order)(Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER GRANTING 79 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Filed byTai Jan Bao, James Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING 69 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/29/2015, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 75 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016. (Related documents(s) 75 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Robert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Seite, Evan) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2015 re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, Robert D. Kelly, SolarCity Corporation. The Court takes the matter under submission. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 11:26 - 12:19. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeremy Lieberman. Defendant Attorney: Ignacio Salceda. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY (re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byRobert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE (re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byJames Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 70 Declaration in Support,, filed byRobert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Related document(s) 69, 70 ) (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson in Support of 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byRobert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/18/2015. Replies due by 10/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ORDER APPROVING 67 STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULE. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/8/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order filed by Robert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Robert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Filed byTai Jan Bao, James Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint due no later than 6/19/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/27/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE by Tai Jan Bao NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF FRANCIS P. MCCONVILLE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR LEAD PLAINTIFF (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/16/2015, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 62 Transcript Order - CJA ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2015. (Related documents(s) 62 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER - CJA for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2015. re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, Robert D. Kelly, SolarCity Corporation. The Court will issue a further order. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeremy Lieberman. Defendant Attorney: Igancio Salcceda, Ben Crosson. Time in Court 9:57 - 10:28 AM. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2015) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY (re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byRobert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re 58 filed by James Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/10/2015) Text nodified on 2/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert D. Kelly, Elon Musk, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 2/10/2015. Replies due by 3/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration with Exhibits A-L, # 3 Proposed Order)(Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed as to defendant Elon Musk. Service waiver sent on 10/23/2014, answer due 12/22/2014 filed by James Webb (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byTai Jan Bao, James Webb. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Order granting 54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Emma Gilmore. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Emma Gilmore ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8862848.) filed by James Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Gilmore, Emma) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified text to add attorney's name on 8/22/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Order granting 52 Stipulation Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings. Amended Complaint due by 10/13/2014. Response to Amended Complaint due by 12/12/2014. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/21/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings filed by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL re 14, 35 . James Webb is appointed as lead plaintiff. Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a stipulated schedule setting forth deadlines for lead plaintiff to file an amended complaint, for Defendants to respond to the amended complaint, and for the parties to brief Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2014 before Beth Labson Freeman (Date Filed: 8/7/2014). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2014) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Michael Goldberg in Support of 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Movant Certification, # 2 Exhibit B - Amended Loss Chart)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byJames Webb. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Francis P. McConville. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Tai Jan Bao ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8691419.) filed by Tai Jan Bao. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified text to add attorney's name on 6/13/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byJames Webb. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of ( 18 ) Motion of John Collins for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified to add linkage on 6/11/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byRobert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson with Exhibits 1 - 6)(Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ignacio Evaristo Salceda (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of ( 23 ) Motion of Robert C. Hamilton for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Lead Counsel (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 6/9/2014) Modified text to add linkage on 6/10/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) (Response of Wenkai Zeng to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel) filed byWenkai Zeng. (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified on 6/4/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE - Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by James Webb. Motion Hearing set for 08/07/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to L.R. 3-7(d) by Michael M. Goldberg on behalf of James Webb (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michael Goldberg in Support of 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B: Certification, # 3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D: Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit E: Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by James Webb. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Wenkai Zeng Pursuant to Local Rule 3-15 (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Thomas C. Bright on behalf of Wenkai Zeng (Bright, Thomas) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel Steven J. Toll Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Solomon B. Cera on behalf of Wenkai Zeng (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel Daniel S. Sommers Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Solomon B. Cera on behalf of Wenkai Zeng (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Solomon B. Cera on behalf of Wenkai Zeng (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byWenkai Zeng. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Wenkai Zeng. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert C. Hamilton Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel Eli R. Greenstein Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Eli Greenstein on behalf of Robert C. Hamilton (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel Naumon A. Amjed Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Eli Greenstein on behalf of Robert C. Hamilton (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Eli R. Greenstein in Support of 23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byRobert C. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Robert C. Hamilton. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Eli Greenstein (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 20 Certificate of Counsel, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, 19 Declaration in Support, Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) of Nicholas Porritt by Mark Punzalan on behalf of John Collins (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, 19 Declaration in Support, Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) of Mark Punzalan by Mark Punzalan on behalf of John Collins (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Mark Punzalan in Support of 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed byJohn Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by John Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel LR 3-7(d) by Laurence M. Rosen on behalf of Fred Lepage (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Fred Lepage No interest to report. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byFred Lepage. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 14 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Fred Lepage. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting 12 Stipulated Request to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference is vacated. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Tai Jan Bao. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 5/16/2014) Text modified on 5/16/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy A. Lieberman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/12/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission of Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman Pro Hac Vice; and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8600447.) filed by Tai Jan Bao. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. In recognition of the pending issues in this case, the Court has scheduled an early Case Management Conference for May 21, 2014, at 11:00 A.M., in order to address case status and reset vacated hearing dates. The Case Management Conference will be held in Courtroom 3 on the 5th Floor of the United States Courthouse, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California, 95113. For this Case Management Conference only, the Court approves telephonic appearances without further application. Parties present at this Case Management Conference must be prepared to agree on dates for further proceedings, to the extent not already addressed in the parties Joint Case Management Statement. The Court requests that the parties engage in good-faith negotiations regarding dates and scheduling before their appearances. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tai Jan Bao. Service waived by Robert D. Kelly waiver sent on 3/31/2014, answer due 5/30/2014; Lyndon R. Rive waiver sent on 3/31/2014, answer due 5/30/2014; SolarCity Corporation waiver sent on 3/31/2014, answer due 5/30/2014. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 1 Complaint, [Certification of Lionel Z. Glancy Pursuant to Northern District Civil Local Rule 3-7(d)] by Tai Jan Bao. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Tai Jan Bao (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT [Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws] against Robert D. Kelly, Lyndon R. Rive, SolarCity Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8488624.). Filed byTai Jan Bao. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing re 13 Order on Stipulation. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for May 21, 2014 is vacated. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/blf-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/blf-order.pdf (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 332 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?