Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03014
District Judge Christopher C. Conner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 2:08 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Frederick Banks"

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK BANKS
v.
No Logo 100 Unknown named CIA Agents, Defendant
No Logo 911 Commission, Defendant
No Logo All U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Defendant
No Logo Angelina Jolie, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Haynes, Defendant
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Apple"
No Logo AR, Defendant
No Logo Arkansas Democrat, Defendant
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Defendant
Officially listed as "Associated Press"
No Logo Australian Embassy, Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America"
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Bershire Hathaway, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Boeing"
No Logo Canada Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Catholic Charities, Defendant
No Logo Catholic Diosese of Pittsburgh, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Central News Network (CNN), Defendant
No Logo Charles Samuels, Defendant
No Logo Chief Justice John Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Chinese Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Clearchannel, Defendant
No Logo Coast to Coast AM, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo Complete U.S. District Judges and Courts for all Districts and Appeals Judges and Courts for all Circuits, Defendant
No Logo Correctional Corporation of America, Defendant
No Logo Country of Israel, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of the Interior"
No Logo Director of Central Intelligence, Defendant
No Logo Director, NSA, Defendant
No Logo District Attorney Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo Entire & Complete Obama Administration, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo European Symposium on Non-Lethal Weapons, Defendant
No Logo European Union, Defendant
No Logo Executive Office of the Vice President, Defendant
No Logo Executive Office of the White House, Defendant
No Logo FCC Forest City, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
No Logo Federal Grand Jury District of Columbia, Defendant
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Reserve Board"
No Logo Financial Crimes Network, Defendant
Fox News Network LLC Fox News Network LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Fox News"
No Logo French Embassy, Defendant
No Logo German Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Goodwill, Defendant
No Logo Inspector General, Defendant
No Logo Italian Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Japanese Embassy, Defendant
No Logo JC Penny, Defendant
No Logo Judge Nora Barry Fisher, Defendant
No Logo Justice Clarence Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Ken Salizar, Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lockheed-Martin"
No Logo Mexico Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Michael Keller, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Obama, Defendant
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Microsoft"
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
No Logo Mike Doyle, Defendant
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"
No Logo New York Times, Defendant
No Logo NPR News, Defendant
No Logo OMB, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Post Gazette, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Tribune Review, Defendant
No Logo Russian Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Salvation Army, Defendant
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sears"
No Logo Secret Service, Defendant
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Defendant
Officially listed as "Securities & Exchange Commission"
No Logo Sentencing Commission, Defendant
No Logo South Africa Embassy, Defendant
No Logo South Korea Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Surgeon General, Defendant
No Logo Sweden Embassy, Defendant
No Logo Switzerland Embassy, Defendant
No Logo The Hague Criminal Court, Defendant
No Logo The Pope, Defendant
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
Officially listed as "The U.S. House of Representatives"
No Logo The U.S. Senate, Defendant
No Logo Transcor, Defendant
No Logo U.K. Embassy, Defendant
No Logo United States Attorney's Office For The Western District Of Pennsylvania, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Attorneys Office Western District of Pennsylvania"
No Logo U.S. Federal Claims Courts, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Intelligence Court, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Marshal, Defendant
No Logo U.s. Postal Inspection Service, Defendant
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Supreme Court, Defendant
United Nations United Nations, Defendant
No Logo US District Court Western District of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo USA Today, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Vice President Joe Biden"
No Logo Wall Street Journal, Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Walmart"
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp
No Logo The Washington Post Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Washington Post"
Officer/Director, Cable One, Inc.
Officer/Director, Educational Medical Inc
Officer/Director, Smartpros Ltd
No Logo XM Radio, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying pltf's Rule 60(b)(4) motion 11 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/31/18. (ki)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER of USCA as to 7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Frederick Banks, 9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Frederick Banks. dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to file Motion Demonstrating Imminent Danger. Case terminated on 03/12/2014. (Reyes, Maria) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRISONER Case as to 8 Order on Motion for Reconsideration FILED by Frederick Banks. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (pjr) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 6 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/30/14. (ki) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRISONER Case as to 5 Order Dismissing Case filed by Frederick Banks. Filing Fee and Docket Fee not paid. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (pjr) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order Dismissing Case filed by Frederick Banks.(pjr) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motion to proceed IFP 2 is DENIED.; Pltf's complaint 1 is DISMISSED w/out prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1915(g).; 3. Clrk of Ct is directed to close case.; 4. Any appeal from this order is DEEMED frivolous & not in good faith. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/15/14. (ki) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/13. (pjr) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                  PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (pjr) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick Banks.(pjr) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick Banks.(pjr) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 89 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?