Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02664
District Judge Christopher C. Conner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 10:49 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Frederick Banks"

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK BANKS
v.
No Logo Al Tarasiuk, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Hallman, Defendant
No Logo Ann S. Syrett, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Haynes, Defendant
No Logo Arnold A. Chacon, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Bradley R. Wride, Defendant
No Logo Bureau of Indian Affairs, Defendant
No Logo Captain Wise, Defendant
No Logo Caryn McClelland, Defendant
No Logo Central Intellegence Agency (CIA), Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Charles Samuels, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Murray, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Hagel, Defendant
No Logo Cinnamon N. Dornsife, Defendant
No Logo Colin M. Cleary, Defendant
No Logo Craig Hall, Defendant
No Logo Dan Butler, Defendant
No Logo David C. Gompert, Defendant
No Logo David J. Corbin, Defendant
No Logo David Shedd, Defendant
No Logo Dawn Meyerriecks, Defendant
No Logo Debra Kircher, Defendant
No Logo Dennis C. Blair, Defendant
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department Of The Interior"
No Logo Desaix Meyers, Defendant
No Logo Dictorate, Science and Technology Center (CIA), Defendant
No Logo Dirk Dijkerman, Defendant
No Logo Donald Kerr, Defendant
No Logo Douglas A. Silliman, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Cuccio, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Daniel T. Nellor, Defendant
No Logo Dr. L. Roger Mason, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Dr. Phylis Lynn Boules, Defendant
No Logo E. Mattingly, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD JONES, Defendant
No Logo Emely Jeffers, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
No Logo Fred Stolper, Defendant
No Logo Frederick B. Cook, Defendant
No Logo G. P. Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Gary R Weber, Defendant
No Logo Gayleatha B. Brown, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Gen Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Gene A. Cretz, Defendant
No Logo George, Frederick, Defendant
No Logo George N. Tietjen, Defendant
No Logo Georgeanne Ranzino, Defendant
No Logo Gordon A. Sjue, Defendant
No Logo Graig Buck, Defendant
No Logo Haskin, Defendant
No Logo Heather M. Hodges, Defendant
No Logo Hoberman, Defendant
No Logo I. Charles McCullough, III, Defendant
No Logo Jacob Wohlman, Defendant
No Logo James Goggin, Defendant
No Logo James R. Clapper, Defendant
No Logo James R. Sporn, Defendant
No Logo James Smith, Defendant
No Logo Janice L. Elmore, Defendant
No Logo Janice Mastorio Worth, Defendant
No Logo John Frese, Defendant
No Logo John H. Frese, Defendant
No Logo John Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo JOHN JONES, Defendant
No Logo John M. Davis, Defendant
No Logo John Schilling, Defendant
No Logo Johnnie Brown, Defendant
No Logo Johns, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Kirkpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Josef J. Koza, Defendant
No Logo Joseph E. Evans, Defendant
No Logo Ken Salizar, Defendant
No Logo Kim T. Starke, Defendant
No Logo Lance Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Leslie R. Hickman, Defendant
No Logo Liam Humphreys, Defendant
No Logo Lisa M. Carle, Defendant
No Logo LTG John F. Kimmons, Defendant
No Logo LTG Ronald L. Burgess, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Malissa Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Marc J. Meznar, Defendant
No Logo Maria D. Guillory, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn A. Vacca, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn Wanner, Defendant
No Logo Mark E. Kelton, Defendant
No Logo Mark Ewing, Defendant
No Logo Martin Nolan, Defendant
No Logo Mary B. Leonard, Defendant
No Logo Mary Sue Conway, Defendant
No Logo Mathew Chin, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL BUTLER, Defendant
No Logo Michael F. Walker, Defendant
No Logo Michael H. Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Rishling, Defendant
No Logo Michael K. Winograd, Defendant
No Logo Michael Metrinko, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Wingo, Defendant
No Logo Mike Doyle, Defendant
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"
No Logo Norman T. Roule, Defendant
No Logo NSA: 10,000 or more unknown Named agents of the National Security Agency, Defendant
No Logo Pam Butler, Defendant
No Logo Parker F. Schofield, Defendant
No Logo Patricia K. Buckles, Defendant
No Logo Paula Husky, Defendant
No Logo Peter C. McDevitt, Defendant
No Logo Peter Lavoy, Defendant
No Logo Philip F. Reilly, Defendant
No Logo Philo L. Dibble, Defendant
No Logo Phyllis Coven, Defendant
No Logo Psychotherapy Center, Defendant
No Logo Richard Ingram, Defendant
No Logo Richard W. Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Rick L. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Ricky Foreman, Defendant
No Logo Robert Cardillo, Defendant
No Logo Robert Carnahan, Defendant
No Logo Robert Ford, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gorelick, Defendant
No Logo Robert Pollard, Defendant
No Logo Robert Weisberg, Defendant
No Logo Roberto Powers, Defendant
No Logo Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Roger Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Ronald J. Czarnetzky, Defendant
No Logo Scott M. Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Spike Stephenson, Defendant
No Logo Stanley J. Joseph, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie O'Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Mull, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Weed, Defendant
No Logo Steven E. Zate, Defendant
No Logo Steven Montgomery, Defendant
No Logo Tedd Archabal, Defendant
No Logo Terry Norvel, Defendant
No Logo The Obama Administration, Defendant
No Logo John S. Beulick, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas"
No Logo Thomas, Colin, Defendant
No Logo Thomas E. Ochiltree, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Pivnichny, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Pounds, Defendant
No Logo Todd J. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Tracie Fenner, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo United States Postal Inspection Service, Defendant
No Logo Willard Pearson, Defendant
No Logo William Center, Defendant
No Logo William D. Murray, Defendant
No Logo William Francisco, Defendant
No Logo Yvette Torres, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 3 Report and Recommendations. (ts) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
    Mail (Doc. 4) sent to Frederick Banks returned as Undeliverable. (pjr) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
      Mail (Doc. 3) sent to Frederick Banks returned as Undeliverable. (pjr) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER adopting report of Chief Magistrate Judge Carlson 3 , GRANTNG pltf leave to proceed IFP, DISMISSING pltf's complaint 1 with prejudice, noting any appeal from this order deemed to be frivolous & not taken in good faith, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/05/13. (ki) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED (Doc. 2), but IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the Court dismiss this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) and (ii). Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 12, 2013. (kjn) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Banks.(aaa) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick Banks.(aaa) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 206 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?