TCYK, LLC v. Longway
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01343

Tags
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 1:37 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Copyright Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Motion to Extend Time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order transferring case to another division
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Interested persons order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Related case order and track 2 notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Copyright Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?