TCYK, LLC v. Doe 9
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01348

Tags
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 2:47 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Copyright Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 113 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?