Tina Andrade
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-20488
District Judge Ronald H. Sargis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Tina Andrade, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of C. Anthony Hughes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, C. Anthony +1 916 485 1111
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of Order as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 30 Order Granting 25 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding for Failure to Make Plan Payments [DPC-1] (mgas) (mgas) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
    Order Granting 25 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding for Failure to Make Plan Payments [DPC-1] (mgas) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
      Declaration of Karen Crise in support of Proposed Order Re: 25 Notice of Default and Motion/Application to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments [DPC-1] as transmitted to BNC for service. (wmim) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
        Certificate/Proof of Service of 27 Change of Address (jtis) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
          Change of Address for Tina Andrade (jtis) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
            Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Default and Motion/Application to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
              Notice of Default and Motion/Application to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments [DPC-1] as transmitted to BNC for service. (Crise, Karen) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                Certificate of Service of Notice of Filed Claims. (Hughes, Anne) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filed Claims Filed by Chapter 13 Trustee. (Hughes, Anne) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                    Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. (shbs) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                      Civil Minute Order Granting 8 Motion/Application To Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                        Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 8 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1] GRANTED (jlas) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Mailing of Copy of Chapter 13 Plan as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/20/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                              Certificate of Mailing of Chapter 13 Meeting Notice as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/20/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 01/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Commencement of Case Under Chapter 13, Meeting of Creditors and Deadlines as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/14/2013 at 09:00 AM at Meeting Room 7-A. Proofs of Claim due by 5/15/2013. (LeMaster, Billie) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                    Copy of Chapter 13 Plan as transmitted to BNC for service. (LeMaster, Billie) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 8 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1], 9 Notice of Hearing, 10 Declaration, 11 Exhibit(s) (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        Exhibit(s) Re: 8 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Tina Andrade in support of 8 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 8 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1] to be held on 2/12/2013 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E. (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                              Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Santander Consumer USA Inc [CAH-1] Filed by Debtor Tina Andrade (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and their Attorneys (auto) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Order Re: Chapter 13 Plan Payments, Adequate Protection Payments, and Employer Payment Advices (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Chapter 13 Plan (auto) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Statement of Social Security Number(s) (msws) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Designation of Trustee (auto) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. All Schedules and Statements filed. (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?