TCYK, LLC v. David Sloms, aka Doe 7
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01344
District Judge Anne C. Conway, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 4:47 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Fly Yant +1 813 229 8008 cyant@feejeffries.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 20 Related case/interested persons/ECF by David Sloms. (Tamaroff, David) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David Sloms. Related case(s): No (Tamaroff, David) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by David Sloms. On or before May 23, 2014, Defendant shall file a response to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/1/2014. (PAB) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by David Sloms. (Tamaroff, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 04/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
          RETURN of service executed on April 11, 2014 by TCYK, LLC as to David Sloms. (Yant, Catherine) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing directed to DEFENDANT. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2014. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/23/2014. (SR) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                  Second MOTION to extend time to serve Defendant by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Yant, Catherine) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/16/2014 Order no pdfCourt Filing
                    ORDER: The document at [Doc. 15] is stricken. The deadline for service was March 31, 2014. See [Doc. 12]. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/16/2014. (Conway, Anne) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN of service executed on April 11, 2014 by TCYK, LLC as to David Sloms. (Yant, Catherine) (STRICKEN BY #16 ORDER) (RDO). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS issued as to David Sloms. (RDO) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Amended Complaint
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Sloms, a/k/a Doe 7 with Jury Demand. filed by TCYK, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copyright Registration)(Fee, Richard) Modified on 3/25/2014 (MAA). (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting in part 11 Motion to extend time. Time to serve Defendant is extended to March 31, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/27/2014. (Conway, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                              MOTION to extend time to 5-31-14 to serve defendant by TCYK, LLC. (Yant, Catherine) Modified on 1/27/2014 (MAA). (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Non-party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/3/2013. (MDH) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                                    NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Case reassigned to Chief Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 6:13-cv-1344-Orl-22GJK. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (LAK) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER directing the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to Chief Judge Anne C. Conway for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/5/2013. (BGS) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Interested persons orderCourt Filing
                                          INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/30/2013. (NBL) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
                                            RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/30/2013. (NBL) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Copyright Report
                                              Copyright Report sent to Washington. (mailed with copy of complaint) (LAK) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (LAK) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against Doe 7 with Jury Demand. Injunctive relief sought. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-27767) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAK) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?