Leroy Howell, et al v. United States Department of th, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-35331

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 2:34 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Syrena C. Hargrove for Appellee United States Department of the Interior. Date of service: 04/24/2014. [9070516] (SCH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/29/2014. Appellants Katherine M. Howell and Leroy Howell opening brief due 07/31/2014. Appellees Nez Perce Tribe, Ken Salazar and United States Department of the Interior answering brief due 09/02/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9068160] (IV)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 31 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?