Pueblo of Jemez v. United States
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 13-2181

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 2:49 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009247043 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
[10174740] Amicus Curiae brief filed by Americans for Indian Opportunity, Indian Land Tenure Foundation and Native Lands Institute. 7 paper copies provided to the court. Served on 05/07/2014. Manner of Service: email. [13-2181]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009246538 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
    [10174445] Amicus Curiae brief filed by The Association on American Indian Affairs and The National Congress of American Indians. Original and 7 copies. Served on 05/07/2014. Manner of Service: email. [13-2181]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009242516 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
      [10171745] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Pueblo of Jemez. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/30/2014 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [13-2181] RHB
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009147679 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
        [10119844] Notice received from Pueblo of Jemez that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 10/25/2013. Manner of Service: US mail, email [13-2181] RHB
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009147674 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
          [10119843] Docketing statement filed by Pueblo of Jemez. Served on 10/25/2013. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [13-2181] RHB
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 01009147659 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
            [10119838] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Randolph Henry Barnhouse for Pueblo of Jemez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. (the names listed are attorneys previously listed in this case). Served on 10/25/2013. Manner of Service: email and US mail [13-2181]
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009141788 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
              [10116562] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/15/2013. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/29/2013 for Pueblo of Jemez. Notice of appearance due on 10/29/2013 for United States of America. [13-2181]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009214085 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                [10155708] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 04/30/2014 for Pueblo of Jemez. [13-2181]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009199412 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                  [10147956] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 03/31/2014 for Pueblo of Jemez. [13-2181]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009174747 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                    [10134584] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by clerk extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 02/28/2014 for Pueblo of Jemez [13-2181]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009168824 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                      [10131232] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by clerk extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 01/22/2014 for Pueblo of Jemez [13-2181]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009155550 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                        [10124144] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Parke Stockman, Esq. for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/12/2013. Manner of Service: email [13-2181]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009155246 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                          [10124013] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/12/2013. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/23/2013 for Pueblo of Jemez. [13-2181]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009149630 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                            [10120871] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Case is referred for mediation conferencing; conference scheduled for 11/13/2013 at 2:00 pm (MST). Please review the attached Notice for additional information. [13-2181]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009149509 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                              [10120820] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 11/12/2013 for counsel for United States of America. [13-2181]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?