USA v. Insolia et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10251
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 8:16 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gloria Melo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Allison D. Burroughs +1 617 439 2784 aburroughs@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Alexa H. O'Keefe +1 617 439 2274 +1 617 310 9274 aokeefe@nutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2007, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Page Kelley +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 page_kelley@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum regarding Request For Payment in Excess of Maximum Compensation as to Gloria Melo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: CJA 20 as to Gloria Melo: Appointment of Attorney Allison D. Burroughs for Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Support by Gloria Melo re 52 SEALED MOTION for Request for Payment in Excess of Maximum Compensation (Burroughs, Allison) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Gloria Melo (3), Count(s) 1, 2, Dismissed Upon Government's Motion; Count(s) 1s, Defendant sentenced to time served. $500 Fine. $10 Special Assessment. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM as to Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Offense and Relevant Conduct as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Transcript of Motion Hearing as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo held on March 20, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter Diane Molas at dmolas1@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Motion Hearing as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo held on March 12, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter Diane Molas at dmolas1@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Gloria Melo: Sentencing set for 1/20/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Gloria Melo. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Gloria Melo. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                          SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Gloria Melo (3) count(s) 1s. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gloria Melo: Rule 11 Hearing set for 10/24/2008 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                              SEALED MOTION: Second Assented to motion for extension of time for parties to file trial related pleadings and for the government to respond to defendants' request as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File trial pleadings and respond to outstanding motions as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING 78 Joint MOTION to Compel Disclosures Regarding Confidential Informant as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                      Assented SEALED MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/5/08 to File Response/Reply as to 104 SEALED MOTION as to Dilia Costa, Gloria Melo by USA. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                        SEALED MOTION for a special order under LR 83.2B as to Dilia Costa, Gloria Melo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Seal as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Dilia Costa, Gloria Melo. (King, Denis) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. AMENDED ORDER SETTING CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo: Final Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 10/20/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial reset for 11/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) Modified text on 6/5/2008 (Lovett, Jarrett). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SECOND ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR DISCOVERY; The Motion for Exculpatory Evidence (Docket #89) is ALLOWED IN PART ANDDENIED IN PART. The Motion for Depositions (Docket #91) is DENIED. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Release from Custody filed by Luis Torres. (Espinosa, Jose) Modified text on 5/23/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 91 MOTION for Order, 89 MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Assented to MOTION to Continue status conference as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Travel Outside the United states as to Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION ex-parte filed under seal as to Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) Modified text on 4/28/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MEMORANDUM in Support by Francesco Insolia as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 91 MOTION for Order Permitting Depositions of Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agents (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Joint MOTION for Order Permitting Depositions of Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agents as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Francesco Insolia. (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 89 MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Ex Parte Motion as to Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter (non-motion) from Asst. U.S. Attorney regarding Mr. Torres as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Opposition by USA as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 85 MOTION to Compel production of PSR of Luis Torres (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of U.S. Probation Department Pre-Sentence Report as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Francesco Insolia. (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Francesco Insolia. (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay to as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. AMENDED ORDER SETTING CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/28/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial reset for 11/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Time excluded from 10/6/08 until 11/3/08. (Lovett, Jarrett) ). (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered pursuant to Local Rule 83.2B directing compliance with Local Rule 83.2A by certain persons within the Department of Homeland Security. (Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MEMORANDUM in Support by Francesco Insolia as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 78 MOTION to Compel Disclosures Regarding Confidential Informant (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Compel Disclosures Regarding Confidential Informant as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Francesco Insolia. (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Response (letter) by USA as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo regarding letter 72 . (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE B. Stephanie Siegmann appearing for USA. (Siegmann, B.) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Dilia Costa as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 74 MOTION for Sanctions Short of Dismissal for Misconduct Alleged in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 3)(King, Denis) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions Short of Dismissal for Misconduct Alleged in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Dilia Costa. (King, Denis) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              ADDENDUM to defendants' reply to Government's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 66 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-7)(King, Denis) Modified text & link on 3/18/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Letter (non-motion) regarding letter written by ICE Special Agent in Charge Bruce Foucart as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Memorandum re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Dilia Costa. (King, Denis) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin; Reason for referral: Intial Appearance in connection warrant for arrest of Material Witness, detention hearing and appointment of counsel, if appropriate as to Luis Torres. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SETTING CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo: Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Time excluded from 3/12/08 until 10/6/08. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Alathea E. Brush by Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo 55 Joint MOTION for Application for Material Witness Warrant for Luis Torres filed by Francesco Insolia (Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          UnSealed Document (per order of 3/12/08): Reply memorandum regarding defendants' motion to dismiss filed by all defendants. Related documents 58 , 59 , 65 . (Seelye, Terri). Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            UNSEALED (per order of 3/12/08) MOTION for leave to file reply memorandum regarding defendants' motion to dismiss as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2008: # 1 Exhibit A) (Seelye, Terri). Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION (DOCKET #52); Accordingly, it is Ordered that Allison D. Burroughs of the law firm of Nutter McClennen & Fish is appointed to represent the defendant Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) Modified text on 2/27/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in support by Allison Burroughs as to Gloria Melo re 52 SEALED MOTION filed by Gloria Melo (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  UnSealed Document (per order of 3/12/08): Opposition to defendants' joint motion to dismiss. Related document 58 . (Seelye, Terri) Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    UNSEALED (per order of 3/12/08) JOINT MOTION to dismiss as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 thru 26)(Seelye, Terri) Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      UnSealed Document (per order of 3/12/08): Opposition to defendants' motion to seal. Related Document 49 . (Seelye, Terri) Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 55 MOTION for Application for Material Witness Warrant (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 02/16/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Application for Material Witness Warrant for Luis Torres as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby Francesco Insolia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Libby, Frank) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            UNSEALED (per order of 3/12/08) MOTION for extension of time as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Seelye, Terri). Modified text on 3/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY; For the foregoing reasons and in light of the Courts understanding of the status ofdiscovery, the Motion is DENIED except that the government shall undertake the reviewdescribed above by February 15, 2008. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION as to Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Ex Parte Motion as to Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File documents under seal as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 45 MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to discovery motion, and to continue status conference as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Joint MEMORANDUM in Support by Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo re 45 Joint MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Libby, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Libby, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2007 to File Discovery Motions as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : REPORT AND ORDER and ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 116.5 by Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo , filed separately by government (Cabell, Donald) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gloria Melo (Summons) (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT as to Gloria Melo (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Travel Outside of Massachusetts as to Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: PRETRIAL as to Dilia Costa, Francesco Insolia, Gloria Melo (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Francesco Insolia (1) count(s) 1, 2, Dilia Costa (2) count(s) 1, 2, Gloria Melo (3) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Continue to 7/27/2007 to probable cause hearing as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Continue to June 8, 2007 to probable cause hearing as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Travel Outside of the United States as to Gloria Melo. (O'Keefe, Alexa) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue probable cause hearing as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexa H. O'Keefe appearing for Gloria Melo (O'Keefe, Alexa) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Page Kelley. as to Gloria Melo. (Kelley, Page) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Continue Probable Cause hearing as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Cabell, Donald) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gloria Melo. (Simeone, Maria) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal as to Francesco Insolia, Ana Figueroa, Dilia Costa, Gloria Meloby USA. (Simeone, Maria) [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT as to Francesco Insolia (1), Ana Figueroa (2), Dilia Costa (3), Gloria Melo (4). (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 3/8/2007 (Simeone, Maria). [1:07-mj-00108-LTS] (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 381 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?