JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00724
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 12:58 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason B. Aldrich +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 jaldrich@judicialwatch.org
v.
No Logo United States Office Of Special Counsel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Answer filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Answer by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/05/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 4/30/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS (3) ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice of Consent, # 4 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3696432) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons OSC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?