In re: Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., et al v. Robert Gaudet, Jr.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-15757

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (159) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009025052598 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
Lodged in camera and UNDER SEAL per 11/8/2012 order [38] Appellee USA in 10-50072 five copies of sealed district court records that the May 14, 2012 motion seeks to unseal. (to Records for merits panel) [8670377] [10-50029, 10-50052, 10-50058, 10-50059, 10-50062, 10-50064, 10-50072, 10-50076, 10-50113, 10-50115] (LA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009024519725 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
    Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on December 18, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [8443727] (WL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009020507731 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [36] filed by Chinese Daily News, Inc. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [08-55483, 08-56740] (GLS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
        Filed Order for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH)The stay in the above matter is dissolved effective immediately. [8686084] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
          Received copy of Supreme Court opinion dated 06/26/2013. The judgment or mandate of this Court will not issue for at least twenty-five days pursuant to Rule 45. Should a petition for rehearing be filed timely, the judgment or mandate will be further stayed pending this Court's action on the petition for rehearing. Supreme Court No: 12-144. [8682306] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973540] (TLB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellee Brian E. Sandoval Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Brief]. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973022] (CWH)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [141] submitted by Liberty Counsel is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8961048] (LA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [144] submitted by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence and 27 Scholars of Federalism and Judicial Restraint is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960254] (LA)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [143] submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960247] (LA)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [140] submitted by Doctor Paul McHugh, M.D. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960242] (LA)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [139] submitted by Professors of Social Science is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960237] (LA)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [138] submitted by the States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Idaho, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Utah is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960231] (LA)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [137] submitted by Alliance Defending Freedom is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960204] (LA)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [135] submitted by Concerned Women for America is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960201] (LA)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The court has received appellee Alan Glover’s notice of nonopposition to the opening brief and motion for leave to withdraw his previously filed answering brief. The motion to withdraw the answering brief is granted. [8958653] (WL)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and 27 Scholars of Federalism and Judicial Restraint. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956713] (JCE)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 143 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al.. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956691] (AD)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Answering Brief; and Notice of Nonopposition to Appellants' Opening Brief]. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956630] (RRM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Liberty Counsel. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956532]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Edited docket text to reflect brief submitted with consent. Resent NDA. 01/31/2014 by RY] (MEM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Dr. Paul McHugh. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956177] (GVB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 139 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors of Social Science. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956076] (AJP)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by STATES OF INDIANA, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, IDAHO, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA AND UTAH. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956058] (TMF)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Alliance Defending Freedom. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956032] (BJB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8955149] (MNS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Concerned Women for America. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8955118] (HC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8954430] (RRM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [123] submitted by Pacific Justice Institute is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954419] (LA)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [121] submitted by Helen M. Alvare is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954408] (LA)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [120] submitted by Institute for Marriage and Public Policy is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954405] (LA)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [119] submitted by Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George and Sherif Girgis is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954399] (LA)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [118] submitted by Marriage Law Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954388] (LA)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [112] submitted by Alan Glover is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954379] (LA)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Filed clerk order: The answering brief [110] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [110] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8954371] (LA)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483, Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740 petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/04/2013 opinion). Date of service: 03/18/2013. [8555485] [08-55483, 08-56740] (RR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed (ECF) - Chingfang Chang, Shiang L. Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Shieh-Sheng Wei, Chenyang Yan and Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740, Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483 Correspondence: Re: Error in Counsel Listing. Date of service: 03/11/2013 [8546896] [08-56740, 08-55483] (RR)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Pacific Justice Institute in Support of Defendants-Appellees and Affirmance. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8953258] (KTS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motions of appellees Coalition for the Protection of Marriage and Alan Glover, Carson City Clerk-Recorder, for leave to file oversized answering briefs are granted. The Clerk shall file the briefs. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the date of this order. (Pro Mo) [8953171] (WL)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Helen M. Alvare. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8952903] (DRB)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Brief of Amicus Curiae Institute for Marriage and Public Policy in Support of Defendants-Appellees and Affirmance. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8952641] (RHT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis, and Ryan T. Anderson. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8952585] (CSL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Marriage Law Foundation. Date of service: 01/24/2014. [8952215] (WCD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JAY S. BYBEE) The district court’s judgment is REVERSED. The district court’s March 8, 2012, order approving the settlement agreement and attorneys’ fee award; its May 29, 2012, order requiring the objectors to post appeal bonds; and its August 22, 2012, order striking Gaudet’s objection are VACATED. The case is REMANDED for proceedings consistent with this memorandum. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9070985] [12-15757, 12-15782] (PH)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [115] submitted by appellants Aakash Desai, Reginald Ento, Elizabeth Aida Haskell and Jeffrey Patrick Lyons, Jr. on July 1, 2013 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8689677] (RR)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Wendy Sabina Dowse for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman and Tracey Hackwith in 12-15757, 12-15782. [9047624] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WSD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by CENTER FOR URBAN RENEWAL AND EDUCATION, THE COALITION OF AFRICAN-AMERICAN PASTORS USA, AND THE FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION, INC.. Date of service: 01/22/2014. [8946656] (SKE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Wendy S. Dowse for Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 04/07/2014. [9047043] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WSD)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/05/2014. [9046018] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. in 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/03/2014. [9043935] [12-15757, 12-15782] (ACA)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): Appellant Marie E. Newhouse’s motion to allocate oral argument time is GRANTED IN PART. Oral argument time shall be allocated as follows. Appellant Newhouse’s appeal (No. 12-15782) will be heard first. Appellant Newhouse will be allowed ten minutes of oral argument time, including time reserved for rebuttal. Appellees will then be permitted ten minutes to respond to Appellant Newhouse’s argument. Appellant Robert J. Gaudet, Jr.’s appeal (No. 12-15757) will be heard second. Appellant Gaudet will be allowed ten minutes of oral argument time, including time reserved for rebuttal. Appellees will then be permitted ten minutes to respond to Appellant Gaudet’s argument. These cases shall remain consolidated for all other purposes. [9027537] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies),motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 03/19/2014. [9023176]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 03/19/2014 by RY] (HIZ)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757 response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies),motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9016387] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757, Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Motion for miscellaneous relief [to Allocate Oral Argument Time; or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Appeal No. 12-15757; or in the Alternative, to Sever Appeal No. 12-15757 for Oral Argument], Motion for summary disposition. Date of service: 03/10/2014. [9010015] [12-15757, 12-15782] (THF)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse reply to response (,motion for sanctions, ). Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973426]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757. Resent NDA. 02/11/2014 by RY] (THF)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782. [8969578] [12-15757, 12-15782] (THF)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Helen I. Zeldes, Esquire for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman, Tracey Hackwith and Maxx Scholten. [8969515]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 12-15782, resent notice. 02/06/2014 by ASW] (HIZ)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Angela Christine Agrusa, Esquire for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman and Tracey Hackwith in 12-15757. [8969252] [12-15757, 12-15782] (ACA)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782. Date of service: 10/29/2012. [8969049] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 response opposing motion (,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 02/06/2014. [8968787] [12-15782, 12-15757] (CLB)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Deanne Maynard for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. [8968030] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Party Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. [8968004]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread to cons case 12-15782, resent notice. 02/06/2014 by ASW] (RJG)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 01/31/2014. [8961067] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740. Date of service: 12/09/2011. [7995687] [08-55483, 08-56740] (MMB)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Filed order (STEPHEN S. TROTT, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and CHARLES R. BREYER): Appellant’s motion for additional briefing is hereby GRANTED. The parties are ordered to file supplemental briefs in light of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes, 564 U.S. ____ (2011). Appellant’s brief shall be filed no later than 30 days from the filing of this order. Appellees’ brief shall be filed within 21 days thereafter. Appellant may file a reply brief within 14 days after the filing of Appellee’s brief. Principal briefs may not exceed 7,000 words, and the optional reply brief may not exceed 3,500 words. Oral argument, if necessary, will be scheduled at a later date. [7960630] [08-55483, 08-56740] (AF)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740 Motion for miscellaneous relief [MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND ORAL ARGUMENT FOLLOWING SUPREME COURT REMAND]. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7958494] [08-55483, 08-56740] (MMB)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8936365] [12-15757, 12-15782] (SS)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/25/2013. [8837234]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757. Resent NDA. 10/25/2013 by RY] (DM)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/23/2013. [8833181] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 10/23/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/17/2013. [8824582] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/04/2013. [8767276] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Marie Newhouse, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/16/2013. [8746051] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers (Appellees only). Resent NDA. 08/16/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah E. Piepmeier for Amicus Curiae Gary Gates. Date of service: 11/04/2013. [8848971] (SEP)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [86] submitted by Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Optional cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8727949] [12-15757, 12-15782] (LA)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 07/31/2013. [8724869]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 08/01/2013 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: lbs): Appellant Gaudet’s motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief consisting of 12,440 words is granted in part. Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellant Gaudet may file a reply brief that does not exceed 8,400 words. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [8707143] [12-15757, 12-15782] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 05/28/2013. [8645310] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740 response opposing motion (,motion for attorney fees). Date of service: 12/10/2010. [7576914] [08-55483, 08-56740] (BGS)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [81] submitted by Marie Newhouse is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8606298] [12-15757, 12-15782] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757. Date of service: 04/24/2013. [8606026] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant Gaudet’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief for appellant Gaudet is due May 28, 2013. The reply brief for appellant Newhouse remains due April 26, 2013. (Pro Mo) [8574682] [12-15757, 12-15782] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 03/26/2013. [8570131] [12-15757, 12-15782] (HIZ)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 05/28/2013 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 03/28/2013. [8569055]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 03/29/2013 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483, Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740 response to petition for panel and en banc rehearing. Date of service: 11/03/2010. [7533874] [08-55483, 08-56740]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text and event to reflect content of filing (response to PFR, not motion). Resent notice. 11/03/2010 by RY] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Netflix, Inc. response to motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 04/23/2014. [9070150]--[Edited: Spread docket text to 13-15754, 13-15751, 13-15733, 13-15723. Resent NDA. 04/23/2014 by RY] (KEE)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [67] submitted by Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [67] submitted by Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8561107] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellees Timothy J. Broad, et al.’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the answering brief submitted on March 14, 2013 by appellees Timothy J. Broad, et al. Appellant Newhouse’s request for an extension of time to file the reply brief, as stated in the response of appellant Newhouse, is granted. The reply brief is due April 26, 2013. (Pro Mo) [8560545] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Tracey Cox Klinge in 13-15759 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 04/21/2014. [9065822] [13-15759, 13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15751, 13-15754] (TLC)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-56740, 08-55483 Correspondence: Correspondence to West Publishing to Correct Counsel Listing in 9/27/2010 Published Opinion. Date of service: 10/01/2010 [7494655] [08-56740, 08-55483] (BGS)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The answering brief [70] submitted by Apple, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [70] submitted by Apple, Inc. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8554287] [12-15757, 12-15782] (JB)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/15/2013. [8552959] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 03/18/2013 by RY] (DM)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Peter Comstock, Jeff Milans and The Settlement Class in 13-15723 Correspondence: Attorney Removal from Service List. Date of service: 03/25/2014 [9031382] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (JDL)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Natalie R. Ram for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/15/2013. [8552484] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NR)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/14/2013. [8551492] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 03/15/2013 by RY] (HIZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 response to motion (,motion to extend time to file response). Date of service: 03/10/2012. [8544184] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782 Motion to extend time to file a response until 03/15/2013. Date of service: 03/01/2013. [8532976] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NSM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief for appellee Apple, Inc. is now due March 15, 2013. The reply brief for appellant Gaudet is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. The reply brief for appellant Newhouse remains due April 12, 2013. [8531876] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file a response until 03/15/2013. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8530546] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Matthew Tanner. Date of service: 11/06/2013. [8853839]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Spread docket text to 13-15754, 13-15751, 13-15759, 13-15723, 13-15734. Resent NDA. 11/08/2013 by RY] (CAK)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8530344] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [59] submitted by Matthew Tanner is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8857377] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (CT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Matthew Tanner. Date of service: 11/06/2013. [8853839]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Spread docket text to 13-15754, 13-15751, 13-15759, 13-15723, 13-15734. Resent NDA. 11/08/2013 by RY] (CAK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [57] submitted by Bradley Schulz in 13-15751 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8853880] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Bradley Schulz in 13-15751. Date of service: 11/06/2013. [8853820] [13-15751, 13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15754, 13-15759] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Douglas D. Winter for Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Marie Newhouse, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, Appellant Marie Newhouse and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8457659] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DDW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s and appellees Broad, et al.’s opposed motions for an extension of time to file their answering briefs are granted. The answering briefs for appellee Apple, Inc. and appellees Broad, et al. are now due March 1, 2013. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. [8456568] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/01/2013. Date of service: 12/17/2012. [8442157] [12-15757, 12-15782] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/01/2013. Date of service: 12/13/2012. [8438538] [12-15757, 12-15782] (PAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [8834177-2] submitted by Netflix, Inc is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8834362] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [50] submitted by Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8421145] [12-15757, 12-15782] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8420494]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 11/30/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [47] submitted by Netflix, Inc is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8834362] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees Peter Comstock, Jeff Milans and The Settlement Class in 13-15723. Date of service: 10/23/2013. [8834297] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (JDL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [45] submitted by Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellant is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8379396] [12-15757, 12-15782] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellant Gaudet’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief for appellant Gaudet is now due November 29, 2012. The opening brief for appellant Newhouse remains due October 29, 2012. The answering brief is due January 2, 2013. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8379067] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757. Date of service: 10/29/2012. [8378941] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. reply to response (,motion to extend time to file brief, ). Date of service: 10/18/2012. [8365890]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 12-15782, resent notice. 10/18/2012 by ASW] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Correspondence: grant of 9th Cir. R. 31 oral motion (correcting inadvertently erroneous correspondence of October 17). Date of service: 10/17/2012 [8364614] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Correspondence: grant of 9th Cir. R. 31 oral motion. Date of service: 10/17/2012 [8364583] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 10/11/2012. [8356225] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NSM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Gary J. Gates. Date of service: 10/25/2013. [8838198] (ELD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/29/2012 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 10/07/2012. [8351103]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 10/10/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Oral Argument on NOVEMBER Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8317577] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 Correspondence: name change of Appellant Marie Gryphon to Marie E. Newhouse due to marriage. Date of service: 09/12/2012 [8319955] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and CARLOS T. BEA) The court’s September 5, 2012 order is amended as follows: Appellant Marie Gryphon’s motion to vacate the appeal bond order is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the opening brief. See Azizian v. Federated Dept. Stores, Inc., 499 F.3d 950 (9th Cir. 2007). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [8312320] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and CARLOS T. BEA) Plaintiffs - appellees’ motion to file an oversized reply to the motion to dismiss appeal No. 12-15782 is granted. The motion to strike is denied. Plaintiffs - appellees’ motion to dismiss appeal No. 12-15782 is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Nat’l Indus. v. Republic Nat’l Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (stating that merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). Appellant Marie Gryphon’s motion to vacate the appeal bond order is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Azizian v. Federated Dept. Stores, Inc., 499 F.3d 950 (9th Cir. 2007). The following briefing schedule shall govern these consolidated appeals: the opening briefs are due October 15, 2012; the consolidated answering brief is due November 14, 2012; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8311291] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Received copy of District Court order filed on 08/22/2012Order granting motion to holder objector Robert J. Gaudet Jr. in contempt of court; striking objector Gaudet's objection. [8300811] [12-15757, 12-15782] (JFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal no. 12-16053 is granted. Appeal no. 12-16053 is severed from these consolidated appeals and dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal no. 12-16053 only. [8278524] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney in 12-16053 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263824] [12-16053, 12-15757, 12-15782] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AKT): Appellant Jeremy Lee’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15816 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15816 is severed from these consolidated petitions and dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All other pending motions in these consolidated cases shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15816. [8257934] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/13/2012. [8250470] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8248718] [12-15816, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Roger Joshua Perlstadt for Appellees Peter Comstock, Jeff Milans and The Settlement Class in 13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759. Date of service: 08/29/2013. [8761261] [13-15723, 13-15733, 13-15734, 13-15751, 13-15754, 13-15759] (RJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239963] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239960] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238644] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238217] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 Motion to strike whole of Class Counsel's "Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal" filed in violation of Fed. R. App. Proc. 27(d)(2), Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237371] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (, ). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8234627] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227530] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227529] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): Appellant Dale Funk’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15740 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15740 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The court sua sponte consolidates appeal No. 12-16053 with appeal Nos. 12- 15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816. The pending motion to vacate or modify the appeal bond and motion to dismiss filed in appeal No. 12-15782 shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15740. [8220145] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816, 12-16053] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8218788] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (HIZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/15/2012. [8216413] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Tracey Cox Klinge Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 04/21/2014. [9065833] (TLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nick S. Movaghar for - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Date of service: 06/14/2012. [8215215] [12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816] (NSM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816. Date of service: 06/13/2012. [8213442] [12-15816, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman Joint Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8209941]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (ACA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon Motion for miscellaneous relief [Vacate or modify appeal bond (Dkt. No. 161)]. Date of service: 06/08/2012. [8207780]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15816, 12-15757. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY and MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS) Appellant Gaudet’s motion, filed in appeal No. 12-15757, to stay the district court’s May 29, 2012 order is denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). The briefing schedule established previously in these consolidated appeals shall remain in effect. [8206637] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (KD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8206579] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (JFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 06/07/2012. [8205823]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/07/2012 by RY] (ACA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 06/05/2012. [8203410]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/06/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s motions to consolidate case Nos. 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816 are granted. The following consolidated briefing schedule shall govern: The opening briefs are due July 16, 2012. The consolidated answering brief is due August 15, 2012. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The parties are reminded of the court’s preference for joint briefing. 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [8167660] [12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Motion to consolidate cases 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816. Date of service: 05/02/2012. [8162525] (PAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Peter Comstock, Jeff Milans and The Settlement Class Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2013. [8602417] (JDL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of entry of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $455.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. [8138206] (CKP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order MEDIATION: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire...dismiss the appeal voluntarily... or show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [8926178] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Correspondence: Request for removal of attorney from docket. Date of service: 04/06/2012 [8130924] (ADM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PROSE APPELLANT.The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/03/2012. Transcript due 06/04/2012. Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet Jr. opening brief due 07/12/2012. Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Marie Gryphon, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten answering brief due 08/13/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8128361] (GR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?