Princeton Digital Image Corporation v. Ubisoft Entertainment SA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00335
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 24, 2021 at 3:47 PM EST (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey I. Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Giovannoli kgiovannoli@kbsolaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY I. KAPLAN +1 732 839 0400 +1 732 393 1901 jkaplan@kbsolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly, Ernst, & Bielli, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Patrick Murray +1 302 778 4000 dmurray@oeblegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T O'Kelly +1 302 778 4000 +1 302 295 2873 sokelly@oeblegal.com
v.
No Logo Ubisoft Entertainment S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (455) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/24/2021, Entered: None Taxation of Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Response to Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Order - -Memorandum and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Objections
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Brief - Opening Brief in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - non-dispositive
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - non-dispositive
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA - Federal Circuit
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    [UNSEALED] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Ubisoft Inc. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/11/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (mlc) Modified on 12/18/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Ubisoft Inc. re 338 Objections, to 337 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 338 Objections, to the Report and Recommendation that its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Should be Denied by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation to 337 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Please not . (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            [UNSEALED] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING D.I. 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/7/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (mlc) Modified on 12/11/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              [UNSEALED] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING D.I. 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/7/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (mlc) Modified on 12/11/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING AS MOOT D.I. 256 MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/7/2018. (mlc) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Letter to Magistrate Judge Burke from The Parties regarding the time allocated for the November 9, 2018 hearing. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REDACTED VERSION Sheehan Declaration re 318 iso Princeton's Reply to Mtn for SJ Marking by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REDACTED VERSION Princeton's Reply 248 iso Motion to Exclude Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        REDACTED VERSION Princeton Digital's Reply Brief 256 iso its Motion to Further Construe Virtual Environment by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          DECLARATION re 325 Declaration, (Ryan Sheehan, Redacted) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) (Redacted) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute (Redacted) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj (Declaration of Michael Turner) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  [SEALED] STATEMENT re 318 Reply Brief, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 324 Reply Brief DECLARATION OF RYAN JOSEPH SHEEHAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO FURTHER CONSTRUE VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 256 MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        [SEALED] STATEMENT re 322 Reply Brief CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 320 Reply Brief (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 318 Reply Brief, DECLARATION OF RYAN JOSEPH SHEEHAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT DAMAGES ARE NOT LIMITED BY THE PATENT-MARKING STATUTE by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 316 Reply Brief (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 313 Reply Brief (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/26/2018 (ntl). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews filed by Ubisoft Inc. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/26/2018 (ntl). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER re 223 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED and 143 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Ubisoft Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/18. (ntl) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 284 Declaration, -- Declaration of Michelle L. Marriott in Support of Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Opposition to PDI's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj -- by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of (404 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 283 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Declaration,, -- Declaration of Michelle L. Marriott in Support of Defendants' Answering Brief in Opposition to PDI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Damages are Not Limited By the Patent-Marking Statute -- by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 279 Answering Brief in Opposition, re 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 281 Answering Brief in Opposition, re 248 MOTION to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 280 Answering Brief in Opposition, re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Letter to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke from Joint Letter from Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corp., Defendant Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., and Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA regarding Letter to advise which motions the parties plan to argue at hearing. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 295 Declaration, DECLARATION OF SCOTT ANDREWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 294 Appendix Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 292 Answering Brief in Opposition, PLAINTIFF PRINCETON DIGITAL IMAGE CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 293 Declaration OF RYAN JOSEPH SHEEHAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TURNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT OF OMID KIA AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF SCOTT ANDREWS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 287 Answering Brief in Opposition, PLAINTIFFS ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT OF OMID KIA AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF SCOTT ANDREWS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 289 Appendix Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 288 Declaration OF MICHAEL TURNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID YURKERWICH by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 286 Answering Brief in Opposition, PLAINTIFFS ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID YURKERWICH by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 292 Answering Brief in Opposition OF SCOTT ANDREWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] APPENDIX Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION OF RYAN JOSEPH SHEEHAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/22/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Main Document 292 replaced on 10/16/2018) (dlb). (Entered: 10/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] APPENDIX Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TURNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO UBISOFT, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT OF OMID KIA AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF SCOTT ANDREWS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] APPENDIX Exhibits by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION of Michael Turner in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Ubisoft, Inc.s Motion to Strike Expert Report of David Yurkerwich by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews to Ubisoft Inc.'s Motion to Strike Expert Report of Omid Kia and Exclude Testimony of Scott Andrews filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Main Document 286 replaced on 10/16/2018) (dlb). (Main Document 286 replaced on 11/9/2018) (nmg). (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX -- Appendix of Authorities for Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Estoppel by 35 U.S.C., Section 315(E)(2) -- by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 281 Answering Brief in Opposition, -- Declaration of Michelle L. Marriott in Support of Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Opposition to PDI's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj -- by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re (280 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Answering Brief in Opposition, (400 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Answering Brief in Opposition, -- Declaration of Michelle L. Marriott in Support of Defendants' Answering Brief in Opposition to PDI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Damages are Not Limited By the Patent-Marking Statute -- by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 256 MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Defendants to file their Answering Brief(s) in response to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Motion to Further Construe "Virtual Environment", and (2) for Plaintiff to file its Reply Brief in support of the Motion to October 12, 2018 and October 26, 2018, respectively - filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 250 Declaration of Michael Turner in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 251 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 249 Appendix to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 255 Appendix, in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment that Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C. § 315(e)(2) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 254 Declaration, of Ryan Joseph Sheehan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 253 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315 (e)(2) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 241 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 242 Declaration, of Ryan Joseph Sheehan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 244 Appendix, in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 247 Declaration by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 246 Declaration, by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 245 Declaration by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 243 Declaration by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 240 Opening Brief in Support by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 238 Opening Brief in Support by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 236 Opening Brief in Support by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (256 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 379 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment -- Declaration of Ryan J. Sheehan -- by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 256 MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/9/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to FURTHER CONSTRUE the Term Virtual Environment - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] APPENDIX re 253 Opening Brief in Support, 254 Declaration, 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Main Document 255 replaced on 9/25/2018) (ntl). (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 253 Opening Brief in Support, 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) Declaration of Ryan Joseph Sheehan by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 252 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment Sa, and Ubisoft Inc. are Estopped by 35 U.S.C.§ 315(e)(2) - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj, 249 Appendix by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] APPENDIX re 248 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Chandrajit Bajaj - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich, 240 Opening Brief in Support (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews, 238 Opening Brief in Support (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Michelle L. Marriott) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-14)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] APPENDIX re 241 Opening Brief in Support, 242 Declaration, 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Marking Statute by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Frederic Siess) by Ubisoft Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 241 Opening Brief in Support, 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Ubisoft Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich - filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews filed by Ubisoft Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews - filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Ubisoft Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement - filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Michael J. Jeffords filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Deposition of Scott Andrews; and (2) Notice of Deposition of Omid Kia filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Case Dispostive Briefing - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Michael J. Jeffords filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Expert Report of Scott Andrews on Validity of U.S. Patent No. 5,513,129 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to SUBMIT Supplemental Expert Reports to July 5, 2018 for Plaintiff and July 12, 2018 for Defendant - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Order Setting Mediation ConferencesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/3/2018. (lih)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Report of Chandrajit Bajaj Regarding U.S. Patent 5,513,129 filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of (338 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 220 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Exhibit to a Document, by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (219 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 337 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Letter by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING D.I. 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Please note that when filing Obj ections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/25/2018. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action for Visual Audio, LLC; and (2) Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action for Technoview IP, LLC, filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of (333 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 217 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter, by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] EXHIBIT re (219 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 337 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Letter -- Exhibits A-F -- by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding PDIC's June 15, 2018 Letter - re (336 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Letter, (218 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to Judge Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Response to Defendants' June 12 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Kelly, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 217 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Princeton Digital Image Corporation's June 6, 2018 letter - re (327 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) Modified on 6/12/2018 (rwc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's (1) Expert Report of Omid Kia on Source of Accused Products, (2) Expert Report of David E. Yurkerwich, and (3) Expert Report of Scott Andrews on Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,513,129 to Defendant Ubisoft Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Chandrajit Bajaj Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,513,129 filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Initial Infringement Contentions to Defendant Ubisoft Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Order Setting TeleconferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/30/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(lih)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the Parties Mediation Referral Request. (Smith, Rodger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [UNSEALED] MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding discovery disputes relating to Plaintiff's infringement contentions (D.I. (159 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 227 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc., (280 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Conference filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/14/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc) Modified on 5/18/2018 (mlc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s First, Third and Fourth Sets of Interrogatories and Supplemental Initial Infringement Contentions to Defendant Ubisoft Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s First and Fourth Sets of Interrogatories and Supplemental Infringement Contentions to Defendant Ubisoft Inc. -- CORRECTED -- re 207 Notice of Service, filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION relating to Representative Just Dance Games by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s First, Second, Third, and Fourth Sets of Interrogatories and Supplemental Infringement Contentions to Defendant Ubisoft Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the Court's Oral Order of May 1, 2018 and documents for in camera inspection - re Oral Order,,. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Third Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1); (2) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories; and (3) Ubisoft, Inc.'s '129 Invalidity Chart, filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to SUBMIT Joint Stipulation regarding Technical Document Production to May 7, 2018 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the Court's April 16, 2018 Order and enclosing Defendants' Joint Privilege Log - re (285 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 196 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Memorandum and Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Joint Privilege Log)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 72 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Mediation Conference is set for 7/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/26/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM ORDER resolving the remaining discovery disputes from the arguments made during the 2/21/18 teleconference. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/24/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding discovery disputes, (D.I. 159 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc., D.I. 177 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/20/2018. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael N. Zachary and Michael Loughnane as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer with Firm. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Infringement Contentions to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [UNSEALED] MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding certain of Plaintiff's discovery disputes, (D.I. 227, D.I. 249 .. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/16/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc) Modified on 4/20/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Turner - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ksenia Takhistova - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Main Document 194 replaced on 4/16/2018) (sar). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Chapman - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Princeton Digital Image Corporation (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 14, 2018 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (bpg) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Fifth Set of Requests for Production (No. 62) and Third Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 16-25), and Objections and Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-15) and Third set of Interrogatories (No. 20) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Conduct Fact Discovery, Expert Reports and Case Despositive Briefing to the Dates Set Forth in the Stipulation - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ubisoft, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production, filed by Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Subpoenas - Technoview & Visual Audio by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission, Fourth Set of Interrogatories, and Third adn Fourth Set of Reqeusts for Production; and Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections to Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of (253 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 178 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-22)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendant Ubisoft Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission and Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to Christian Greuel by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 21, 2018 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone No. (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2018. (bpg) Modified on 3/12/2018 (dlb). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Harmonix, Electronics Arts, and Ubisoft's response to PDI's supplemental discovery dispute letter dated March 8, 2018 - re (253 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 178 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-22)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Ubisoft, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 58-59) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 17-19) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Princeton Digital Image Corporation on March 22, 2018 filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Meagher on March 22, 2018 filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Admission to Princeton Digital Image Corporation; and (2) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 62), filed by Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER -- Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Governing the Production of Source Code -- by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 60); (2) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Princeton Digital Image Corporation; (3) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission to Princeton Digital Image Corporation; and (4) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 61), filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (233 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 165 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter, by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-8)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 162 Letter, by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-13)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of (161 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-S)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Defendants' February 14, 2018 Discovery Dispute Letter - re (161 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 228 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Discovery Dispute - re 162 Letter,. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Supplemental Repones to Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA's and Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 15) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Discovery Disputes - re 159 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-13, # 2 Certificate of Service)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Discovery Disputes - re Order Setting Teleconference,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-S)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1), filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Non-Party Jakob Parks; (2) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Timothy W. Lohse; and (3) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition of Ubisoft, Inc. filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories [No. 20] to Princeton Digital Image Corporation and (2) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Princeton Digital Image Corporation filed by Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Objection of Non-Party Christian Greuel to Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc.; Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.; Electronic Arts, Inc.; and Ubisoft, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas to Mark Bolas, Michael Bolas, Fakespace Labs, Inc. and Ian E. McDowall by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Mark Bolas, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Michael Bolas, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Fakespace, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Ian McDowall)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 152 Answering Brief in Opposition, -- Declaration of Ryan Joseph Sheehan in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Altnerative, Transfer to the Northern District of California Based on Improper Venue -- by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2018. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 58-59); and (2) Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories [Nos. 16 - 18] to Princeton Digital Image Corporation, filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences A Telephone Conference is set for 2/26/2018 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/24/2018. (dlb) Modified on 1/25/2018 (dlb). (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notices of Subpoenas to Jakob Parks and Timothy W. Lohse filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition of Ubisoft Inc. and Laurent Detoc filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Infringement Contentions and Corrected Supplemental Initial Infringement Contentions upon Defendant Ubisoft Inc. filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena (Christian Greuel) by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Laurent Detoc -- by Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Ubisoft Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative,, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint to January 17, 2018 - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2018. A Motion Hearing is set for 11/9/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. A Conference regarding the order and scheduling of trials is set for 2/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/8/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Jury Trial is set for 4/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER re (135 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 199 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Stipulation by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER: Report and Recommendation (D.I. 183) in case 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB and D.I. 123 in case 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) is ADOPTED; and Report and Recommendation (D.I. 193 in case 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB and D.I. 129 in case 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) is ADOPTED in part and MODIFIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/17. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM ORDER re 121 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED; and 76 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/12/17. (ntl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT re 136 Notice (Other), -- Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. and Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Statement in Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority -- by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Supporting Plaintiff's November 21, 2016 Objections (D.I. 122) to the Report and Recommendation Finding that Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Should Be Granted (D.I. 121) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation re (195 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 131 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Objections, . (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. re (132 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 196 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Objections, . (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation to (193 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 129 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten . (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. to (193 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 129 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten . (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 7/17/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/21/2017. (mlc) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Rodger D. Smith II regarding courtesy copies of dockets items associated with defendants objections to the Report & Recommendation regarding Claim Construction - re (126 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 185 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Objections,. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Princeton Digital Image Corporation re (126 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 185 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Objections, . (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. to (123 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 183 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten . (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' Rule 72 objections to the Report and Recommendation (D.I. 183) to December 23, 2016 - filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. re 122 Objection to Report and Recommendations . (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/2/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to 121 Report and Recommendations by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. 76 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. Pl ease note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/4/2016. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on August 31, 2016 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (bpg) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendatns Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Sheehan - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Loughnane - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John R. Hutchins - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-15) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Parties' Proposals for Order of Claim Terms At August 31, 2016 Markman Hearing. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF re 110 Claim Construction Reply Brief filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections of Non-Party Michael Bolas to Defendants' Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF re 92 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Main Document 110 replaced on 8/2/2016) (dlk). (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT re (136 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 104 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Letter, -- Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Technology Tutorial -- by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena (Mark Bolas) by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas (Alfred A. Equitz, Girard & Equitz, LLP and Crockett & Crockett, P.C.) by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections of Non-Parties Fakespace Labs, Inc., Ian E. McDowell, and Michael Bolas to Defendants' Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Plaintiff's Technology Tutorial for U.S. Patent No. 5,513,129. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Technology Tutorial for U.S. Patent No. 5,513,129)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Defendants' Technology Tutorial. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Princeton Digital Image Corporation filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT and Submission Regarding August 31, 2016 Markman Hearing by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for various submissions as outlined in stipulation to dates indicated in stipulation - filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re (130 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Claim Construction Opening Brief -- Declaration of Vijay K. Madisetti -- by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4, # 2 Exhibits 5-7)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Letter Concerning Testimony During Markman Hearing and Amount of Time Requested During Markman Hearing to July 19, 2016 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Subpoena to Fakespace Labs, Inc., Ian E. McDowell, Mark Bolas, and Michael Bolas filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena (Fakespace Labs, Inc.) by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production; and (2) Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) the deadline for the parties to submit technology tutorials; and (2) the deadline for the parties to submit comments on the technology tutorials to July 22, 2016 and July 29, 2016, respectively - filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM Construction Chart by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 9, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 9, Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 9, Part 4, # 13 Exhibit 9, Part 5, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their Joint Claim Construction Statement to June 2, 2016 - filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their Joint Claim Construction Statement to May 31, 2016 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Identifcation of Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re 76 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/28/2016. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ubisoft Entertainment, S.A. for Ubisoft Inc. filed by Ubisoft Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 76 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2016. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect and Willful Infringement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Production of Core Technical Documents filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ubisoft Inc. served on 3/16/2016, answer due 4/6/2016. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond toThird Amended Complaint to April 1, 2016 - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.- filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(dlk) (Main Document 72 replaced on 3/14/2016) (rwc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2016: # 1 EX 1, # 2 EX 2, # 3 EX 3) (rwc). (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Amended Identification of Accused Products filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 7.1.1 Certification)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2016. Discovery due by 10/15/2016. A Trial Sequencing Conference is set for 9/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark A Markman Hearing is set for 8/31/2016 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/6/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Jury Trial is set for 11/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (Please see order for further details and deadlines). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint PROPOSED ORDER Amended Scheduling Order by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to January 19, 2016 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT -- Joint Notice of Status of the Inter Partes Review Proceedings -- by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Status of Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Princeton Digital Image Corporation re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susan A. Smith - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael N. Zachary - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Lennon - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffrey Kaplan and Keith Giovannoli of Kaplan Breyer Schwarz & Ottesen, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: Withdrawal of their appearances as counsel for Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (D.I. 75 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 56 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB (aer) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Lift Stay re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,, filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 56 MOTION to Lift Stay re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,, filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Lift Stay re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,, - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Status Update Pursuant to Court's Order of January 15, 2014 - re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions are DENIED AS MOOT in light of the fact that this action is STAYED (see D.I. 52 ): D.I. 26 and D.I. 46 . ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/14. (ntl) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Institution of Petition for Inter Partes Review and Notice of Filing of Petition for Inter Partes Review by Ubisoft by Ubisoft Entertainment SA re 52 Order on Motion to Stay,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM ORDER granting D.I. (66) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB; and D.I. (42) Motion to Stay in case 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB. The proceedings are STAYED from the date of this order until further notice. The parties shall timely advise the Court of the PTO's decision as to whether to grant review of the '129 Patent. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/15/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporations Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Extend Certain Deadlines by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on December 11, 2013 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/17/2014. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 39 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke regarding Princeton's Preliminary Infringement Contention deficiencies by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For the Parties to File a Joint Letter Setting Out the New Agreed-Upon Deadline for Plaintiff's Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Contentions and All Other Related Deadlines to January 6, 2014 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER regarding D.I. 38 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. See Order for detatils. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/20/2013. (mlc) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly regarding Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Preliminary Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Letter - Proposed New Time is 5:00 p.m. on December 18, 2013 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Rule 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Princeton's Preliminary Infringement Contention deficiencies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting D.I. 32 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/7/2013. (dlk) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 12/16/2013 at 09:45 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/5/2013. (dlk) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Oral Argument by Princeton Digital Image Corporation re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint -. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2013. (Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith Giovannoli - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murray, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/21/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint - - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order - re Oral Order, by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporations Identification of Asserted Patents and Accused Products by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporations Disclosures Pursuant to Default Discovery Standard Paragraph 3 by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ubisoft Entertainment SA- filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(dlk) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order - by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Amended Complaint - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Rule 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Protective Order to September 13, 2013 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) by Princeton Digital Image Corporation.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2013. Discovery due by 4/30/2014. Status Reports due by 1/24/2014 and 5/16/14. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2015; Hearing on Claim Construction will be held on 5/28/2014 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom to be determined); Pretrial Conference and Trial dates are to be determined (See Order for further details and deadlines). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/19/2013. (dlk) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey I. Kaplan - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric A. Buresh, Michelle L. Marriott and Mark C. Lang - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order - re 11 Proposed Order. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/13. Motion referred to Judge Christopher J. Burke. (ntl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ubisoft Entertainment SA- filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to May 31, 2013 - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (O'Kelly, Sean) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Ubisoft Entertainment SA.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Partial Motion to Dismiss - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/24/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Partial Motion to Dismiss - - filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,513,129;. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ubisoft Entertainment SA - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1238580.) - filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1)(cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document Unsealed -- D.I. 341 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Ubisoft Inc. No redactions requested. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document Unsealed -- D.I. 336 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 237 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of Omid Kia and Testimony of Scott Andrews filed by Ubisoft Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing c unsealed. No redactions requested. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Document Unsealed -- D.I. 337 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Damages are not Limited by the Patent-Making Statute filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. No redactions requested. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2018 regarding D.I. 239 MOTION to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich filed by Ubisoft Inc., D.I. 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Ubisoft Inc. The Court took the motions under advisement and will issue written decision(s). (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll (Hawkins). Clerk: M. Crawford) Appearances: S. OKelly, M. Lennon, R. Sheehan for Plaintiff; R. Smith, M. Marriott, E. Buresh for Ubisoft. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER Setting Hearings: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the hearing regarding Ubisoft Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, (D.I. 234), and Motion to Preclude Expert Report of David Yurkerwich, (D.I. 239), is rescheduled for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/15/2018. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that it will allocate 2 hours and 30 minutes for the November 9, 2018 hearing, to be split evenly between the parties. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/6/2018. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: In light of the Joint Motion to Stay Case Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed yesterday in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB, which appears to reduce the number of motions being argued at the November 9, 2018 hearing from four to two, (see D.I. 306), the Court is contemplating reducing the time it has allocated for the hearing from two hours per side to 1 hour and 15 minutes per side. By no later than November 5, 2018, the parties shall submit a joint letter indicating whether they have any objection to that. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/1/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' October 19, 2018 letter, (D.I. 306 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB), HEREBY ORDERS that: (1) the Court agrees to hear argument during the November 9, 2018 hearing on the motions that the parties indicated that they intend to argue at the hearing; (2) the Court will allocate four hours for the hearing, to be split evenly between the parties; and (3) prior to the hearing, the parties shall meet and confer and determine the order in which the motions will be argued. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/22/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: In light of the upcoming November 9, 2018 hearing regarding the parties' case-dispositive and Daubert Motions, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that by no later than October 19, 2018, the parties shall submit a joint letter that advises: (a) whether any of the pending summary judgment and/or Daubert motions shall be submitted on the papers, or alternatively, whether the parties intend to present argument as to each such pending motion during the November 9, 2018 hearing; and (b) how much time the parties suggest be allocated for the November 9, 2018 hearing. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTING ENTRY: PDF's found at D.I. 292 and 286 have been replaced with corrected versions at request of filer. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SO ORDERED D.I. (278 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 398 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Defendants to file their Answering Brief(s) in response to Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporation's Motion to Further Construe "Virtual Environment", and (2) for Plaintiff to file its Reply Brie filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTING ENTRY: DI#'s 266 & 267 were removed from the docket as having been filed incorrectly using the wrong event code. DI'S 266 & 267 NO LONGER EXIST. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 255 per request of counsel. (ntl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED D.I. (352 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 231 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Case Dispostive Briefing filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/24/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SO ORDERED D.I. 228 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to SUBMIT Supplemental Expert Reports to July 5, 2018 for Plaintiff and July 12, 2018 for Defendant filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/9/2018. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Document Unsealed -- no redactions requested. D.I. (318 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 211 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Memorandum Order. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed documents submitted by Defendants for in camera inspection, (D.I. 301, Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; D.I. 206, Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB), concludes that the documents clearly fall within the scope of the common interest doctrine. The documents constitute attorney work product, and each are "communications... made by separate parties in the course of a matter of common legal interest" that "are designed to further that common legal interest[,]" in that they relate to discussion of shared strategy on issues (such as infringement/non-infringement and damages) that affect the respective Defendants in similar ways. INVISTA N. Am. S.a.r.l. v. M&G USA Corp., Civil Action No. 11-1007-SLR-CJB, 2013 WL 12171721, at *5 (D. Del. June 25, 2013). There is no indication that the privilege has been waived. Therefore, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's request that certain Defendants produce certain communications between the parties, (D.I. 285 at 1-3, Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; D.I. 196 at 1-3, Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB), is DENIED. See, e.g., Khoday v. Symantec Corp., Civil No. 11-180 (JRT/TNL), 2013 WL 12140484, at *3 (D. Minn. Sept. 24, 2013) (denying plaintiffs' motion to compel communications between counsel for different defendants where such documents related to the co-defendants' legal strategy and were thus protected under the common interest doctrine).. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SO ORDERED D.I. 208 Stipulation relating to Representative Just Dance Games filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/8/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED D.I. 204 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to SUBMIT Joint Stipulation regarding Technical Document Production to May 7, 2018 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED D.I. (195 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Turner filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, (193 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Chapman filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, (267 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas D. Petrella filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., (283 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Chapman filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, (284 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Turner filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, (265 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ksenia Takhistova filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, (275 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Raleigh O'Donnell filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., (194 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ksenia Takhistova filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the Defendants' April 30, 2018 letter and privilege log relating to Plaintiff's request for certain communications among Defendants, (D.I. 296 in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; D.I. 203 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB), HEREBY ORDERS that by no later than May 8, 2018, Defendants shall submit the five e-mails listed on the privilege log to the Court for in camera review.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ksenia Takhistova for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(crb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Document Unsealed - D.I. 196 Memorandum Order. No redactions requested. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED D.I. 189 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Conduct Fact Discovery, Expert Reports and Case Despositive Briefing to the Dates Set Forth in the Stipulation filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/12/2018. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: With regard to Plaintiffs request that the Court extend the deadline for the close of fact discovery by 45 days from the current deadline of March 30, 2018, (Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB, D.I. 253 at 3; Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB, D.I. 178 at 3), the Court hereby GRANTS-IN-PART Plaintiffs request, and HEREBY ORDERS that the deadline for the close of fact discovery be extended until April 30, 2018. It is not disputed that despite diligent efforts, there are some outstanding depositions that will need to take place beyond the current discovery deadline, and that there are some outstanding documents that still need to be produced. The Court therefore agrees with Plaintiff that an extension is warranted, although the Court is not persuaded that an additional 45 days are needed to tie up these loose ends. To the extent that this extension necessitates shifting deadlines for expert discovery and the briefing schedule for case-dispositive motions, the parties shall meet and confer and propose a revised schedule by no later than March 30, 2018. The dates for the case-dispositive motions hearing, trial scheduling conference, pretrial conference, and trial on first case shall not change. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/23/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke: Discovery Teleconference held on 3/14/2018. The Court heard argument regarding Plaintiff's discovery disputes (D.I. 249 in C.A. No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; D.I. 177 in C.A. No. 13-335-LPS-CJB). The Court will take the disputes under advisement. (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll (Hawkins). Clerk: M. Crawford) Appearances: D. Murray, M. Lennon, R. Sheehan for Plaintiff; R. Smith, B. Fox, R. Malloy for Konami; R. Smith, L. Thayer, P. Coyne for Harmonix; R. Smith, M. Marriott, M. Lang for Ubisoft. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: The Court has been advised by phone and by Plaintiff's and Defendant Konami Digital Enterainment Inc.'s March 1, 2018 letter, (D.I. 243 in C.A. No. 12-1461) that the parties have a total of four additional outstanding discovery disputes. It hereby ORDERS that the procedures for resolving a discovery dispute set out in the Court's February 9, 2016 scheduling order will be altered as follows with regard to these disputes: (1) The parties shall file a joint "Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute," the text of which can be found in the "Forms" tab of Judge Burke's page on the District Court's website.; (2) A discovery dispute teleconference will be held on Wednesday, March 14, 2018 at 1:00 p.m.; (3) Not less than ninety-six (96) hours prior to the teleconference, excluding weekends and holidays, the party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed four (4) pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not less than forty-eight (48) hours prior to the teleconference, excluding weekends and holidays, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed four (4) pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining that party(s) reasons for its opposition.; and (4) Two courtesy copies of the letters are to be hand delivered to the Clerks Office within one hour of e-filing.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that any future discovery disputes between the parties in this case shall be argued in person before Judge Burke in Courtroom 2A.This does not include the disputes to be argued telephonically on March 14, 2018. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED D.I. (170 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 240 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Governing the Production of Source Code filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Discovery Teleconference held on 2/21/2018. The Court heard argument regarding the parties' discovery disputes (D.I. 227 in C.A. No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; D.I. 159 in C.A. No. 13-335-LPS-CJB). The Court resolved Plaintiff's dispute relating to marketing, advertising, and customer support documents from Defendant Ubisoft (the transcript will serve as the Court's order) and will take the remaining disputes under advisement. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan. Clerk: M. Crawford) Appearances: D. Murray, M. Lennon, R. Sheehan for Plaintiff; R. Smith, B. Fox, R. Malloy for Konami; R. Smith, L. Thayer, R. Emsley for Harmonix; R. Smith, M. Marriott for Ubisoft. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: The Court has been advised by phone that the parties have discovery disputes. It hereby ORDERS that the procedures for resolving a discovery dispute set out in the Court's February 9, 2016 scheduling order will be altered as follows with regard to this dispute: (1) The parties shall file a joint "Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute," the text of which can be found in the "Forms" tab of Judge Burke's page on the District Court's website.; (2) A discovery dispute teleconference will be held on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 at 1:00 p.m.; (3) Not less than ninety-six (96) hours prior to the conference, excluding weekends and holidays, the party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed four (4) pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not less than forty-eight (48) hours prior to the conference, excluding weekends and holidays, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed four (4) pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining that party(s) reasons for its opposition.; and (4) Courtesy copies of the letters are to be hand delivered to the Clerks Office within one hour of e-filing. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED D.I. 142 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint to January 17, 2018 filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/22/2017. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: In light of the parties' August 15, 2017 Joint Stipulation and Amended Scheduling Order (the "Joint Stipulation"), (D.I. 199 in Civil Action No. 12-1461; D.I. 135 in Civil Action No. 13-335), and Chief Judge Stark's recent Memorandum Orders regarding claim construction, (D.I. 207 in Civil Action No. 12-1461; D.I. 139 in Civil Action No. 13-335), and Defendants Ubisoft Entertainment SA and Ubisoft Inc.'s motion to dismiss, (D.I. 138 in Civil Action No. 13-335), the Court HEREBY ORDERS that by no later than December 21, 2017, the parties shall submit a proposed revised Scheduling Order that includes specific dates related to the proposals they made in the Joint Stipulation, and otherwise leaves the following dates blank so that the Court may fill them in based on the Court's availability: (1) hearing on case-dispositive and Daubert motions; (2) trial scheduling conference; (3) pretrial conference; and (4) trial on first case. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/14/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SO ORDERED D.I. (135 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 199 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED D.I. (184 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 125 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' Rule 72 objections to the Report and Recommendation (D.I. 183) to December 23, 2016 filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: The Court hereby advises the parties that it will be unable to meet its aspirational goal of issuing the claim construction Report and Recommendation within 60 days after the August 31, 2016 Markman hearing. The Court expects to issue the decision by December 2, 2016. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED (178 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 119 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED D.I. (117 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Sheehan filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, and D.I. (175 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Sheehan filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Markman Hearing held on 8/31/2016. Written decision to follow. (Court Reporter: Taneha Carroll (Hawkins). (Clerk: Crawford) Appearances: S. Kelly, M. Lennon, M. Loughnane, J. Hutchins, R. Sheehan for Plaintiff; R. Smith, R. Malloy, L. Thayer, M. Marriott, M. Lang for Defendants. (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll (Hawkins)) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED D.I. (172 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John R. Hutchins filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, D.I. (116 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Loughnane filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, D.I. (173 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Loughnane filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, and D.I. (115 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John R. Hutchins filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' August 12, 2016 letter, (D.I. (164 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 113 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB), the Court hereby accepts the parties' proposals regarding the August 31, 2016 hearing on claim construction.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTING ENTRY: PDF found at D.I. 110 has been replaced at the request of the filer. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that by no later than August 12, 2016, the parties shall file a joint letter informing the Court as to their decisions with respect to the directive in the Court's July 21, 2016 Oral Order requiring the parties to agree on the order for the presentation of the claim terms at issue for the August 31, 2016 Markman hearing, including which side will present first for each term. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' July 20, 2016 letter, (D.I. 134 in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB, D.I. 101 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB), the Court hereby accepts the parties' proposal regarding the August 31, 2016 hearing on claim construction. The Court will allocate 4 hours for the hearing. Prior to the hearing, the parties should agree on: (1) how the 4 hours will be allocated among the parties; and (2) the order for the presentation of the claim terms at issue, including which side will present first for each term. With respect to the other issues raised in the parties' letter, if the parties have any discovery disputes that cannot be resolved, they should follow the guidelines set out in Section 3(g) of the Scheduling Order with respect to the resolution of such discovery disputes. (D.I. 90 in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB, D.I. 69 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB)Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/21/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED D.I. (100 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 133 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for various submissions as outlined in stipulation to dates indicated in stipulation filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED D.I. (97 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 129 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Letter Concerning Testimony During Markman Hearing and Amount of Time Requested During Markman Hearing to July 19, 2016 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/18/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SO ORDERED D.I. 90 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) the deadline for the parties to submit technology tutorials; and (2) the deadline for the parties to submit comments on the technology tutorials to July 22, 2016 and July 29, 2016, respectively filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/9/2016. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED D.I. (114 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their Joint Claim Construction Statement to May 31, 2016 filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., and D.I. (86 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their Joint Claim Construction Statement to May 31, 2016 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED D.I. (87 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 115 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their Joint Claim Construction Statement to June 2, 2016 filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SO ORDERED D.I. 73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond toThird Amended Complaint to April 1, 2016 filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/15/2016. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ubisoft Inc. on 3/15/2016. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTING ENTRY: The CM/ECF Help Desk re-docketed DI# 72, separating the pdf exhibits and attaching them separately. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER granting D.I. 70 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/4/2016. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: The Scheduling Teleconference set per oral order dated 1/21/16 for February 22, 2016 at 1:30 is canceled. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the joint status report provided by the parties, D.I.(88 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 67 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB), ), hereby ORDERS as follows: (1) The stay of proceedings in this case issued in favor of IPR proceedings, (D.I. 70, 78 in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB and D.I. 52, 59 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB) is hereby lifted.; (2) The parties shall submit a joint revised proposed Scheduling Order, along with a joint letter of no more than 3 single-spaced pages summarizing the parties' positions as to any disputes relating to that Order, by no later than February 5, 2016.; (3) The parties' joint revised proposed Scheduling Order shall take into account the following: (a) The Court will hold an additional Markman hearing, in which it will hear further argument as to the two claim terms that were previously addressed at the prior early Markman hearing, as well as any other terms that require construction; (see D.I. 88 at 10 in Civil Action No. 12-1461-LPS-CJB; and D.I. 67 at 10 in Civil Action No. 13-335-LPS-CJB); and (b) The Order shall not include a provision that discovery be stayed pending resolution of claim construction disputes, as Defendants requested in the status report.; and (4) The Court will hold a teleconference with the parties to resolve disputes regarding scheduling, if any, on Monday, February 22, 2016 at 1:30 PM. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/21/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(Jacobs, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED (66 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 87 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to January 19, 2016 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice Attorney Susan A. Smith for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Lennon for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael N. Zachary for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED D.I. 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susan A. Smith filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, D.I. 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Lennon filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, and D.I. 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael N. Zachary filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/17/2015. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: In light of the Court's Memorandum Order issued today, the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of the ongoing inter partes review proceedings every six months from the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(aer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTING ENTRY: Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sean T. O'Kelly removed from the docket per counsel's request. Letter to be re-docketed. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB(rbe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the letter filed by Plaintiff on 10/24/2014 (D.I. 73 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, D.I. 55 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB), hereby ORDERS as follows: To the extent that Plaintiff wishes to seek relief in the form of a Court order lifting the stay in this case, such a request must be presented to the Court by motion, pursuant to the terms of Local Rule 7.1.2. To the extent such a motion is later filed, briefing will proceed according to the provisions of the Local Rules. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB (aer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED D.I. 49 Stipulation to extend certain deadlines filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Status Report due by 5/19/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2015., A Markman Hearing is set for 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/7/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED D.I. 44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For the Parties to File a Joint Letter Setting Out the New Agreed-Upon Deadline for Plaintiff's Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Contentions and All Other Related Deadlines to January 6, 2014 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/30/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: In light of the joint Stipulation filed by the parties on December 23, 2013 (D.I. 44), the deadlines set in paragraphs 2 and 3 of the Court's December 20, 2013 Order (D.I. 43) are hereby VACATED. The parties' January 6, 2014 joint letter shall include revised deadlines for those events set forth in paragraphs 2 and 3 of the Court's December 20, 2013 Order. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/30/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Discovery Dispute Teleconference held on 12/20/2013. Order to be issued (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll (Hawkins)) (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED granting D.I. 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Letter - Proposed New Time is 5:00 p.m. on December 18, 2013 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/18/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: The Motion Hearing set for 12/10/13 has been rescheduled due to weather related issues and is now set for 12/11/2013 at 12:30 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Remark: Today's hearing will be held in Courtroom 2B with Judge Burke. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2013 re 26 Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Motion to Dismiss the Section 271(g) Claim in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER Resetting Hearing: Due to courtroom unavailabilty, the time for the Motion Hearing re D.I. 26 set for 12/10/2013 has been changed to commence at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/22/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric A. Buresh,Michelle L. Marriott,Mark C. Lang for Ubisoft Entertainment SA added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearing: A Motion Hearing re D.I. 26 is set for 12/10/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice Attorney Keith Giovannoli for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. (els)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey I. Kaplan for Princeton Digital Image Corporation,Jeffrey I. Kaplan for Princeton Digital Image Corporation added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(els)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED D.I. 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith Giovannoli filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/24/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED D.I. 25 Joint Proposed Protective Order filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/27/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: The Order of September 25, 2013 has been removed from the docket in this matter, as it relates only to Civil Action No. 12-1461.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 09/26/2013. (mlc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER re 20 Proposed Order filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation: Parties shall submit, by no later than September 24, 2013, a revised version of the 20 Proposed Protecive Order that contains the paragraph listed in Section 4 of Judge Burke's form of Scheduling Order entered in this case.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/17/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Princeton Digital Image Corporations Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED re 19 . Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/16/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SO ORDERED D.I. 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Protective Order to September 13, 2013 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation, Ubisoft Entertainment SA. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/5/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Scheduling Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2013 to discuss the parties disputes in their proposed scheduling order. Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter Sydney Crawford(Hawkins)) (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED D.I. 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric A. Buresh, Michelle L. Marriott and Mark C. Lang filed by Ubisoft Entertainment SA, and D.I. 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey I. Kaplan filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/15/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) TELECONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on August 16, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to Chambers of Christopher J. Burke by dialing 302-573-4595. (2) For the purpose of being prepared the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than August 13, 2013. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Burke, Forms). (3) If there are disputed issues between the parties regarding the content of the Scheduling Order, the parties should note those areas of dispute in the Proposed Order, along with their proposals for the language the Court should adopt as to that issue. In addition, the parties may each separately file a letter (of no more than two single-spaced pages) setting forth their position as to these disputed issues. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/30/2013. (dlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SO ORDERED, re 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendant Ubisoft Entertainment SA's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to May 31, 2013 filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/23/13. (ntl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ubisoft Entertainment SA on 3/19/2013. (mdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No Summons Issued (cla, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?