Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC v. General Electric Capital Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00529

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 12:52 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joao Bock Transaction Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen V. Abbey maureen@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Jacqueline K. Burt +1 404 996 0861 +1 205 547 5502 jburt@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Joseph J. Gleason jgleason@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Jonathan Robert Miller +1 404 996 0863 +1 205 547 5506 jmiller@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stamatios Stamoulis +1 302 999 1540 +1 302 762 1688 stamoulis@swdelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Charles Weinblatt +1 302 999 1540 weinblatt@swdelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting (19) Motion to Stay in case 1:14-cv-00425-SLR; granting (15) Motion to Stay in case 1:14-cv-00529-SLR; granting (12) Motion to Stay in case 1:14-cv-00530-SLR. The cases are stayed pending a final determination by the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in Joao Bock Transaction Systems, LLC v. Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., Appeal No. 15-1245 (Civ. No. 12-1138-SLR) as to the patentability of U.S. Patent No. 7,096,003. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00425-SLR, 1:14-cv-00529-SLR, 1:14-cv-00530-SLR(nmfn) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation's Rule 3 and Rule 26 Disclosures filed by General Electric Capital Corporation.(Rostocki, Brian) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/12/2014) (fms). (Entered: 12/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/29/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/10/2014. (lih) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Stay / Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation's Joinder in Capital One and TradeKing Defendants' Motions to Stay filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
            Joint PROPOSED ORDER PATENT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER Submitted By Parties by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 17 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Jonathan R. Miller by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay / Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation's Joinder in Capital One and TradeKing Defendants' Motions to Stay filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/1/2014. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Scheduling by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Stay / Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation's Joinder in Capital One and TradeKing Defendants' Motions to Stay - filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Counsel 7.1.1 Statement, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Order Setting In-Person Patent Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/12/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00425-SLR, 1:14-cv-00529-SLR, 1:14-cv-00530-SLR(nmfn) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Roche - filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David T. Pollock - filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirin K. Gill - filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Order Setting In-Person Patent Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/7/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/17/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Ritcheson, Maureen Abbey, Jonathan Miller, Joseph Gleason and Jacqueline Burt of the law firm HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC - filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric Capital Corporation filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by General Electric Capital Corporation.(Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 5, 2014 - filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                          Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. General Electric Capital Corporation served on 8/1/2014, answer due 8/22/2014. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,096,003;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against General Electric Capital Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1503752.) - filed by Joao Bock Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?