iMTX Strategic LLC v. Hulu LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00548

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 2:17 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Imtx Strategic, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara T. Jeffries +1 404 996 0867 +1 205 547 5502 dara@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stamatios Stamoulis +1 302 999 1540 +1 302 762 1688 stamoulis@swdelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Charles Weinblatt +1 302 999 1540 weinblatt@swdelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (mdb) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER - The moving defendants' motions to transfer venue are GRANTED. The cases captioned within the order are transferred to the Northern District of California. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01940-GMS et al.(mdb) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join filed by Hulu LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STATUS REPORT by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for submitting Parties' Joint Status Report to January 22, 2015 - filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
            DECLARATION re (14 in 1:14-cv-00550-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (23 in 1:14-cv-00551-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (16 in 1:13-cv-01940-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (13 in 1:14-cv-00548-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (15 in 1:14-cv-00325-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (20 in 1:14-cv-00549-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, [DECLARATION OF RENE A. VAZQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF iMTX STRATEGIC, LLC'S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE] by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join PLAINTIFF iMTX STRATEGIC, LLC'S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE] filed by iMTX Strategic LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                SO ORDERED - re (14 in 1:13-cv-01940-GMS, 12 in 1:14-cv-00550-GMS, 21 in 1:14-cv-00551-GMS, 11 in 1:14-cv-00548-GMS, 18 in 1:14-cv-00549-GMS, 13 in 1:14-cv-00325-GMS) Stipulation filed by iMTX Strategic LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re(13 in 1:13-cv-01940-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join, (11 in 1:14-cv-00549-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, (12 in 1:14-cv-00325-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join, (10 in 1:14-cv-00548-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join, (13 in 1:14-cv-00551-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, (11 in 1:14-cv-00550-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Venue / Defendant Verizon Communications Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) . (Answering Brief due 1/16/2015., Reply Brief due 2/2/2015.). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00551-GMS et al.(mdb) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STIPULATION re BRIEFING SCHEDULE by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to Join - filed by Hulu LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stefani E. Shanberg, Michael J. Guo and Jennifer J. Schmidt - filed by Hulu LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The Walt Disney Company, Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate News Corporation for Hulu LLC filed by Hulu LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hulu LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Ritcheson, Renee Vazquez and Dara Jeffries of the law firm HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC - filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to October 9, 2014 - filed by Hulu LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (cla, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,269,854 B2;. (cla, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Hulu LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1505548.) - filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?