McCaffrey v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01636
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 3:26 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William McCaffrey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irving Cohen +1 212 964 2544 +1 212 732 1339 icohenlaw@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A. Garber, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Andrew Garber +1 212 965 9370 +1 212 965 9375 ggarber@glenngarber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angharad Antonina Vaughan +1 212 965 9370 +1 212 965 9375 avaughan@glenngarber.com
v.
No Logo David Diaz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vicki Becker Zgodny +1 212 788 8084 +1 212 788 0987 vzgodny@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Evan Krutoy, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe Nos. 11 Through 20, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Nos. 11 Through 20, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Officers Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10, Defendant
No Logo Officers John Doe Nos. 1 Through 10, Defendant
No Logo Officers John Doe Nos.1 Through10, Defendant
No Logo Robert Arbuiso, Defendant
No Logo Dist Atty, NY County, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Morgenthau"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Jean Bailey +1 212 335 4362 +1 212 335 4390 baileyp@dany.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Theresa. O'Connor +1 212 335 4364 +1 212 335 4390 o'connorm@dany.nyc.gov
No Logo Shanda Strain, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (184) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: 183 Letter re: The writ transferring filed by William McCaffrey. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the writ producing and transferring Mr. McCaffrey from New York State to federal custody is satisfied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT arrangements be made as soon as possible to transfer Mr. McCaffrey from federal custody at MCC back to New York State custody. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/26/2015) (kko) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 3/26/15 re: The writ transferring. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 1/29/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 1/29/2015 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 1/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 1/28/2015 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 1/26/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 1/26/2015 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: During today's trial, the parties informed the Court that they have reached a settlement, the terms of which were recited and acknowledged on the record. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this case is dismissed with prejudice but without costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511 U.S. 375, 381 (1994). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/29/2015) (mro) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated January 15, 2015 re: Retrial. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                        Exhibit List . Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                          WITNESS LIST. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                            WITNESS LIST. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: Due to unforeseen circumstances, the Court must reschedule trial, which is presently scheduled to commence on February 2, 2015. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT trial is rescheduled to January 26, 2015, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the final pretrial conference is rescheduled to January 22, 2015 at 4:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit updated exhibit and witness lists by January 15, 2015. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/1/2014) (mro) Modified on 12/2/2014 (mro). (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Due to unforeseen circumstances, the Court must adjourn trial, which is presently scheduled to commence on November 10, 2014. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT trial is ADJOURNED to February 2, 2015, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the final pretrial conference is ADJOURNED to January 29, 2015 at 4:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit updated exhibit and witness lists by January 22, 2015. The Court regrets the inconvenience to the parties. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/29/2014) (mro) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 167 Letter filed by William McCaffrey. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT trial is adjourned to November 10, 2014. The parties shall appear for the previously scheduled settlement conference at 9:30 a.m. on September 9, 2014 in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. ( Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/4/2014) (mro) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 9/4/14 re: an update about Ms. Pujolss schedule.. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Vicki B. Zgodny dated September 4, 2014 re: trial schedule. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER TO PRODUCE: The Warden of Orleans Correctional Facility shall transfer custody of William McCaffrey to the U.S. Marshals at the Metropolitan Correctional Center (MCC) located at 150 Park Row, New York, NY 10007, prior to September 3, 2014. The U.S. Marshals shall accept custody of William McCaffrey prior to September 3, 2014 and lodge him at the MCC and produce him in Court for the September 3, 2014 pre-trial conference and for the September 8, 2014 trial. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. After trial is complete, the U.S. Marshals shall promptly transfer William McCaffrey back to New York custody. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/27/2014) (tro) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion in Limine. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' motions in limine and supporting memorandum of law (Doc. Nos. 152, 158), as well as Plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to Defendants' motions (Doc. No. 161 ). Having considered the parties' briefs, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' motion in limine seeking to offset any compensatory damages that Plaintiff may receive at trial by the amount of Plaintiff's $425,000 settlement with the State of New York is GRANTED; however, no set-off shall apply to any punitive damages that Plaintiff may receive at trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' motions in limine in every other respect are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear at the previously scheduled pre-trial conference on September 3, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. and be prepared to discuss the status of settlement negotiations, as well as the pending request for an adjournment of the trial date set forth in Plaintiff's August 20, 2014 letter. (Doc. No. 162.) Unless otherwise notified to the contrary, the parties shall be prepared to proceed with trial on September 8, 2014 as previously ordered. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket number 152. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/27/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber and Arthur Larkin dated August 25, 2014 re: Parties' position and availability for rescheduling retrial. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 8/20/2014 re: Request to adjourn trial to later date. ENDORSEMENT: Although the Court is sympathetic to Ms. Pujols's situation, the Court is reluctant to adjourn trial. Nevertheless, to determine whether there is a workable compromise that can accommodate the interest of Ms. Pujols and the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a joint letter by August 25, 2014, apprising the Court of the parties' respective availability for trial in October and November and Defendants' position regarding Plaintiff's adjournment request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/21/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 152 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and to limit plaintiff's damages at re-trial. . Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/17/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 159 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Nothwithstanding Plaintiff's failure to comply with Rule l.D of the Court's Individual Practices, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall file their respective briefs in opposition to any motions in limine by August 18, 2014. Responses to Brief due by 8/18/2014. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/14/2014) (cd) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion in Limine addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated August 14, 2014. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and to limit plaintiff's damages at re-trial. (With non-substantive correction on page one). Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                        WITNESS LIST. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit List . Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List I, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit List II)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                            WITNESS LIST. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                              WITNESS LIST. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and to limit plaintiff's damages at re-trial. with attachments. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and to limit plaintiff's damages at re-trial. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). Return Date set for 9/3/2014 at 02:00 PM.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: Accordingly, for the same reasons set forth in the Court's January 27, 2014 Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's letter motion seeking reconsideration of the Court's Order barring Dr. Jessica Pearson, Rose Muncey, and Sally Salgado from testifying at trial is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 148. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/15/2014) (cd) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Vicki B. Zgodny dated July 11, 2014 re: 148 THIRD MOTION for Reconsideration of Preclusion of Witnesses. . Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated June 27, 2014 re: Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law, pursuant to Rule 50. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - THIRD MOTION for Reconsideration of Preclusion of Witnesses. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ldi). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 146 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to 6/27/2014 to submit Defendants' brief in support of their pending Rule 50 motions. Plaintiff has requested, with consent, a one week extension for his letter motion regarding additional witnesses. Defendants request, with plaintiff's consent, that the parties' oppositions to these submissions be due on Friday, July 11. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/20/2014) (cd) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File letter motion addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Vicki B. Zgodny dated June 20, 2014. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Defendants shall file any brief in support of their pending Rule 50 motion, and Plaintiff shall file its letter motion regarding the Court's earlier Order excluding certain witnesses from testifying at trial. The parties shall file any papers in opposition to those filed on June 20, 2014. ( Briefs due by 6/20/2014. Motions in limine, exhibit and witness lists, due by 8/4/2014. Responses to motions in limine due by 8/14/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/30/2014) (cd) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/7/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 5/7/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 5/6/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/5/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 5/5/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 5/2/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/1/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 5/1/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 4/30/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 4/30/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 4/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 4/29/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 4/28/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 4/28/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 5/12/2014 re: Request to adjourn the 5/14/2014 conference to 5/16/2014. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the conference is adjourned to 3:00 p.m. on Friday, May 16, 2014. ( Status Conference reset for 5/16/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/12/2014) (cd) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/23/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/23/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/14/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/8/2014) (cd) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court has received, via e-mail, the parties' proposed amendments and additions to the jury charge, and as further set forth in this document. Therefore, the Court declines to include these proposed special interrogatories on the verdict form. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/2/2014) (cd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/17/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/17/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: ORDERED that the listed attorney is authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER: that the listed attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/27/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the U.S. Marshals shall provide clothing for William McCaffrey to wear on April 28, 2014 for trial upon receiving clothing from his attorney, Glenn A. Garber, in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Mr. Garber shall be permitted to provide clothing to Mr. McCaffrey at MCC New York for Mr. McCaffrey's use during trial from April 29, 2014 until the end of trial. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/25/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: As stated on the record at today's pre-trial conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT by 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 22, 2014, (1) Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs letter dated April 16, 2014, (2) Plaintiff shall summarize his anticipated testimony regarding his experiences during incarceration, and (3) the parties shall produce their proposed exhibits, provide detailed objections to those exhibits, present a joint plan for the handling of trial and sentencing transcripts from Plaintiffs earlier criminal trial, and submit the final joint request to charge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a pre-trial conference on Wednesday, April 23, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/17/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated April 16, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Conviction of CPW-2 in July, 2013. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Pretrial Conference reset for 4/17/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: In the parties' joint letter, dated April 3, 2014 (Doc. No. 108), Plaintiff states his intention to respond to Defendants' arguments regarding causation and the exclusion of evidence based on the Second Circuit's recent en banc decision in Poventud v. City of New York, 2014 WL 182313 (2d Cir. Jan. 16, 2014). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff shall make any responsive submission on or before Friday, April 11, 2014. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/7/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber and Arthur Larkin dated April 3, 2014 re: Joint Letter on in Limine issues. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Jury Charge Excerpt)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO PRODUCE: Jury Trial set for 4/28/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. The pre-trial conference and the trial are to be held before the Honorable Richard J. Sullivan located at 40 Foley Square in lower Manhattan, Courtroom 905. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Warden of Orleans Correctional Facility transfer custody of William McCaffrey to the U.S. Marshal Service at the Metropolitan Correctional Center (MCC) located at 150 Park Row, New York, NY 10007, prior to April 16, 2014, and as further set forth in this document. (COPY FORWARDED TO THE US MARSHAL) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/4/2014) (cd) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - FIRST MOTION to Produce Plaintiff for PTC and Trial. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garber, Glenn) Modified on 4/7/2014 (db). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - SECOND MOTION in Limine. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Garber, Glenn) Modified on 4/4/2014 (db). (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated April 2, 2014. Document filed by William McCaffrey. Return Date set for 4/2/2014 at 11:00 PM.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs renewed request to permit these three witnesses to testify is denied. The parties shall continue to comply with the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order dated January 13, 2014. (Doc. No. 102.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/27/2014) (cd) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated January 17, 2014 re: Reply to Opposition to Reconsideration. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated January 14, 2014 re: Reconsideration. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Expert Report Part 1, # 2 Appendix Expert Report Part 2)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated Jan. 16, 2014 re: Plaintiff's letter request for reconsideration. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT jury selection in this matter shall commence on Monday, April 28, 2014. The joint letter ordered by the Court's January 7 Order shall be filed no later than April 2, 2014, and the pretrial conference shall be held on Wednesday, April 16, 2014 at 3:30p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/13/2014) (ama) Modified on 1/14/2014 (ama). (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court, on or before January 14, 2014, in compliance with the Court's instructions below. The Court must also adjourn the presently scheduled dates for both trial and the pretrial conference, as explained herein. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall confer as to how this issue should be handled and, in their joint letter, shall address the following: As set forth herein. A final pretrial conference in this matter was previously scheduled for January 17, 2014 and trial was set to commence on January 27, 2014. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, these dates must be changed. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT trial in this matter shall commence on Tuesday, February 18, 2014. The parties shall appear for a pretrial conference on Wednesday, February 5, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. SO ORDERED. ( Ready for Trial by 2/18/2014., Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/07/2014) (ama) Modified on 1/7/2014 (ama). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR VOIR DIRE. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), William McCaffrey.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), William McCaffrey.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: As an initial matter, the jury trial in this case is scheduled to begin on January 27, 2014, and the Court is not changing this date. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall file a joint proposed jury charge, voir dire, and verdict sheet on or before Friday, January 3, 2014. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Dr. Pearson shall be precluded from testifying at trial. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Salgado and Muncey shall be precluded from testifying at trial. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's request for the production of these materials as part of his motions in limine is denied. In conclusion, trial will commence on January 27,2014. The parties shall file a joint proposed jury charge, voir dire, and verdict sheet on or before January 3, 2014. Dr. Pearson, Sally Salgado, and Rose Muncey are precluded from testifying. Plaintiff's request for materials relating to past complaints against Defendants is denied. The parties shall beprepared to discuss all other motions in limine and any other outstanding issues at the final pretrial conference on Friday, January 17, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. SO ORDERED. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/23/2013) (ama) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 93 FIRST MOTION in Limine. (with corrected caption and title, without attachments). Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SECOND MOTION in Limine. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Garber, Glenn) Modified on 12/17/2013 (db). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 93 FIRST MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST MOTION in Limine. Document filed by William McCaffrey. Return Date set for 12/16/2013 at 05:00 PM.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Verdict Sheet for Damages)(Zgodny, Vicki) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ka). (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Vicki B. Zgodny dated 12/10/2013 re: letter concerning pre-trial submissions. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - FIRST MOTION in Limine. Document filed by William McCaffrey. Return Date set for 12/16/2013 at 05:00 PM.(Garber, Glenn) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 83 MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and for other relief.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to exclude certain evidence and for other relief. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). Return Date set for 1/17/2014 at 03:00 PM.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by William McCaffrey.(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 11/29/2013 re: I am writing to request an extension of time to file pre-trial submissions in the above referenced matter. Trial is scheduled to commence on January 27, 2014. The requested changed schedule, which is with the consent of Defendants, maintains the December 16, 2013 date for final pre-trial submissions. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is GRANTED. The parties shall appear for a pre-trial conference on Friday, January 17, 2014 at 3:00p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. SO ORDERED., ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/02/2013) (ama) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vicki Becker Zgodny on behalf of Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 78 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File for pretrial submissions. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/19/2013) (js) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-trial submissions (from Nov. 25, to Dec. 2, 2013) addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated Nov. 19, 2013. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT trial in this matter shall begin on January 27, 2014. In light of this, the parties shall make all pre-trial submissions required by the Court's Individual Practices, including a joint pre-trial order, joint proposed voir dire, verdict form and jury instructions, and any motions in limine on or before November 25, 2013. Opposition papers to any motion in limine shall be filed on or before December 9, 2013, and any reply shall be filed on or before December 16, 2013. The parties shall appear for a pre-trial conference on Friday, January 17, 2014 at 3:00p.m. in Courtroom 905 at 40 Foley Square. Oral argument on the parties' motions in limine, if necessary, shall also take place at the January 17 conference, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. SO ORDERED.( Motions due by 11/25/2013., Responses due by 12/9/2013, Replies due by 12/16/2013., Ready for Trial by 1/27/2014., Oral Argument set for 1/17/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan., Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/21/2013) (ama) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: In light of this, the parties shall be prepared to begin trial on September 9, 2013. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall make all pre-trial submissions required by the Court's Individual Practices,including a joint pre-trial order, joint proposed voir dire, verdict form and jury instructions, and any motions in limine on or before July 8, 2013. Opposition papers to any motion in limine shall be filed on or before July 22, 2013, and any reply shall be filed on or before August 2, 2013. The parties shall appear for a pre-trial conference on August 28, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 905 at 40 Foley Square. Oral argument on the parties' motions in limine, if necessary, shall also take place at the August 28 conference. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/8/2013., Responses due by 7/22/2013, Replies due by 8/2/2013., Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/17/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 5/2/13 re: Counsel writes to request an extension of two weeks, from 5/6/13 to 5/20/13, in which to submit a joint status report concerning settlement. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/2/2013) (mro) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Because of a conflict on the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference originally scheduled for 4:30 p.m. on Wednesday, April 3,2013, shall be held at 3:00 p.m. on that day in Courtroom 905 at 40 Foley Square. SO ORDERED.( Status Conference set for 4/3/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/28/2013) (ama) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Glenn Andrew Garber on behalf of William McCaffrey. New Address: Glenn A. Garber, P.C., 233 Broadway, Suite 2370, New York, NY, 10279, (212) 965-9370. (Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Angharad Antonina Vaughan on behalf of William McCaffrey. New Address: Glenn A. Garber, P.C., 233 Broadway, Suite 2370, New York, NY, 10279, (212) 965-9370. (Vaughan, Angharad) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's malicious prosecution claims but denies their motion as to Plaintiff's fair trial claim against Diaz and Arbuiso. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion located at Doc. No. 56. Accordingly, in light of the Court's ruling, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties appear for a status conference in this matter on April 3, 2013 at 4:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/7/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Arthur G. Larkin in Support re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually). (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 11/7/2012 re: Request for a one day extension to reply from 11/8 to 11/9/2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims. ( Reply due by 11/9/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/7/2012) (cd) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin, dated 11/7/2012, re: Counsel writes: In accordance with the court's Individual Rules, we request a brief extension of one day, from tomorrow, Nov. 8, to Friday, Nov. 9, 2012, of the deadline by which defendants must file their reply papers in further support of their motion for summary judgment. This request is made without plaintiff's consent. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/7/2012) (lnl) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims. Rule 56.1(b) Statement. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Garber, Glenn) Modified on 10/19/2012 (db). (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Glenn A. Garber in Opposition re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Pujols deposition excerpt, # 2 McCaffrey grand jury testimony excerpt, # 3 McCaffrey trial testimony excerpt, # 4 Sosa deposition excerpt, # 5 DNA report 9/30/08, # 6 DNA report 8/20/09, # 7 Gilson grand jury testimony excerpt, # 8 Krutoy affirmation excerpt, # 9 Diaz deposition excerpt, # 10 Arbuiso deposition excerpt, # 11 Pujols grand jury testimony excerpt, # 12 McCaffrey DD5, # 13 Delacruz trial testimony excerpt, # 14 People's trial summation excerpt, # 15 Diaz trial testimony excerpt, # 16 Judge Carruthers's decision, # 17 March 12, 2012 Email)(Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J Sullivan from Glenn A Garber dated 10/12/2012 re: Request for an extension of the briefing schedule as follows. ENDORSEMENT: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request. In light of the revised briefing schedule above, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Defendants' motion is adjourned until 12/7/2012 at 11:15 am. ( Responses due by 10/18/2012, Replies due by 11/1/2012. Oral Argument reset for 12/7/2012 at 11:15 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/12/2012) (cd) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J Sullivan from Glenn A Garber dated 10/4/2012 re: Request for the following briefing schedule. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims. ( Responses due by 10/12/2012, Replies due by 10/26/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/4/2012) (cd) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a settlement conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action on TUESDAY, OCTOBER 2, 2012, at 2:00 P.M. at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 1312. SO ORDERED. ( Settlement Conference set for 10/2/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 9/12/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Arthur G. Larkin in Support re: 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims.. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit)(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment dismissing all remaining claims. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), The City of New York. Responses due by 10/9/2012 Return Date set for 11/30/2012 at 02:30 PM.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following revised briefing schedule for Defendants' contemplated motion for summary judgment: As set forth in this Order.( Motions due by 9/6/2012., Responses due by 10/9/2012, Replies due by 10/23/2012., Oral Argument set for 11/30/2012 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.)SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/28/2012) (ama) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: It is hereby ordered that a settlement conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action on Friday, September 14, 2012, at 2:00 P.M. at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain consent of those parties. The parties are to take note of the following requirements for settlement conferences before the undersigned. 1. the parties are expected to have spoken with each other about their respective settlement positions prior to the settlement conference. 2. The parties are directed to bring with them any documents (including any deposition transcripts) that they consider pertinent to their position on the settlement value of the case. 3. Clients are expected to either attend the conference or be available via telephone during the conference. ( Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 8/16/2012) Copies mailed by Chambers. (ago) Modified on 8/21/2012 (ago). (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. As stated on the record at the July 26, 2012 conference, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing and oral argument schedule for Defendants' contemplated motion for summary judgment: 8/30/2012: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment and accompanying brief; 10/1/2012: Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants' motion; 10/15/2012: Defendants shall submit their reply to Plaintiffs' response: and 11/16/2012: The parties shall appear for oral argument at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21C. (Motions due by 8/30/2012. Responses due by 10/1/2012. Replies due by 10/15/2012.), (Oral Argument set for 11/16/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/26/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: 7/25/2012 Pre-Motion Conference reset for Tuesday, 7/26/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/23/2012) (cd) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 6/14/2012 re: Counsel for defendant requests an adjournment of the pre motion conference now scheduled for July 2, 2012. Plaintiff consents to this request. All counsel are available on the following dates and times: June 26 (after 3:00 p.m.), July 24-25 (after 3:00 p.m.), or July 31, 2012 (anytime). Second counsel requests an opportunity to respond to plaintiff's "reply" letter of June 13, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby order that the conference scheduled for July 2, 2012 is adjourned until July 25, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/25/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/14/2012) (js) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until June 13, 2012 to reply to Defendants' June 6, 2012 response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a pre-motion conference on July 2, 2012, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21C. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/2/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/8/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: As stated on the record at the May 2, 2012 conference, Plaintiff shall submit a pre-motion letter by June 1, 2012 regarding his contemplated motion to amend his First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach the proposed Second Amended Complaint to the letter and highlight the portions that are altered from the First Amended Complaint. In accordance with the Court's Individual Practices, Defendants shall submit a pre-motion letter response to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter and proposed Second Amended Complaint no later than June 6, 2012. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/2/2012) (mro) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 4/13/2012 re: I am writing with the consent of defendants to request a short extension of the fact discovery deadline from April 16 to April 27. This request is being made due to ADA Evan Kmtoy's trial schedule. It was expectedthat he would be deposed this week. However, we are now informed that he is unavailable until the week of April 23. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED.( Fact Discovery due by 4/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/13/2012) (djc) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re the joint letter dated 3/26/2012, from Plaintiff and NY County District Attorney's Office: the Court GRANTS DANY'S motion to quash, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/26/2012) (cd) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 3/6/2012 re: Counsels jointly request a one-month extension to complete fact discovery from March 15 to April 16. If their request is granted, the April 6 conference and pre-conference submissions should also be adjusted. Thus, in addition to April 16, 2012 as the new proposed discovery deadline it is further requested that the conference be adjourned until the week of April 30, 2012 and that pre-conference submissions be due no later than April 23, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff and Defendants' joint request is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the post discovery conference scheduled for April 6, 2012 be rescheduled for May 2, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. Pre-conference submissions shall be due no later than April 23, 2012. (Status Conference set for 5/2/2012 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Deposition due by 3/27/2012, Fact Discovery due by 4/16/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/6/2012) (ft) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall attend a post-discovery conference on Friday, April 6, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event any party intends to make a post-discovery motion, pre-motion letters shall be submitted by Thursday, March 15, 2012. ( Status Conference set for 4/6/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/21/2012) (mro) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/18/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/18/2011 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angharad Antonina Vaughan on behalf of William McCaffrey (Vaughan, Angharad) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss. The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff dated November 16, 2011, stating that Plaintiff has withdrawn his claims against the individually-named Defendants who are present and/or former employees of the Office of the District Attorney of New York City (the "DA Defendants"). Accordingly, the DA Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Additionally, for the reasons stated on the record at the November 18, 2011 conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of New York's motion for judgment on the pleadings as to Count Three is granted. In the event that Plaintiff wishes to file a motion to amend the complaint as to Count Three, he shall attach with his motion a proposed amended complaint. Finally, Defendants' request to extend the discovery deadline is granted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all discovery in this matter shall be completed by March 15, 2012. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions located at Doc. Nos. 18 and 24. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate Robert Morgenthau, Nancy Ryan, Evan Krutoy, and Shandra Strain as Defendants in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/19/2011) (mro) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Glenn A. Garber dated 9/29/11 re: We are writing on behalf of Plaintiff William McCaffrey to request an opportunity to file a brief sur-reply on the pending Rule 12 motions and for oral argument on the motions. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request to file a sur-reply is denied. The parties shall appear for oral argument on Friday, November 18, 2011, at 3:00 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 11/18/2011 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/29/11) (rjm) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice.. Document filed by Shanda Strain(Individually). (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part).. Document filed by The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Arthur G. Larkin in Support re: 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part).. Document filed by The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 18 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice., 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part).. Document filed by William McCaffrey. (Garber, Glenn) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Jean Bailey on behalf of Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County) (Bailey, Patricia) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Jean Bailey on behalf of Nancy Ryan(Individually) (Bailey, Patricia) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Jean Bailey on behalf of Evan Krutoy(Individually) (Bailey, Patricia) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Jean Bailey on behalf of Robert M. Morgenthau (Bailey, Patricia) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re defendants motions for various relief: Responses due by 8/5/2011, Replies due by 8/26/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/1/11) (cd) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Irving Cohen dated 7/19/11 re: We ask that Plaintiff's response be filed by August 1, 2011; and that Defendants' reply be filed by August 19, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 8/1/2011. Replies due by 8/19/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/19/11) (rjm) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department).(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 6/30/2011 re: Counsel for Defendant Robert Arbuiso writes to request an extension of two weeks to answer the Amended Complaint, from today to 7/14/2011. Plaintiff consents to this request. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/30/2011) (ab) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part).. Document filed by The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Arthur G. Larkin in Support re: 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part).. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Delacruz trial testimony), # 2 Exhibit B (Trial excerpt), # 3 Exhibit C (Trial excerpt), # 4 Exhibit D (motion for DNA testing), # 5 Exhibit E (Peguero cross examination), # 6 Exhibit F (5/6/11 conf. excerpt), # 7 Exhibit G (Notice of Claim))(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part). Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 7/20/2011(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part). Document filed by The City of New York. (Larkin, Arthur) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Arthur G. Larkin in Support re: 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part). Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Delacruz trial testimony), # 2 Exhibit B (Trial excerpt), # 3 Exhibit C (Trial excerpt), # 4 Exhibit D (Defendant's motion for DNA testing), # 5 Exhibit F (5/6/11 conf. excerpt), # 6 Exhibit G (Notice of Claim))(Larkin, Arthur) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (in part). Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 7/20/2011(Larkin, Arthur) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Maureen O'Connor in Support re: 18 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice.. Document filed by Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau, Nancy Ryan(Individually), Nancy Ryan(In Her Official Capacity as Assistant District Attorney of New York County), Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice. Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6). Document filed by Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau, Nancy Ryan(Individually), Nancy Ryan(In Her Official Capacity as Assistant District Attorney of New York County), Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually). (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice. Document filed by Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau, Nancy Ryan(Individually), Nancy Ryan(In Her Official Capacity as Assistant District Attorney of New York County), Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually). Responses due by 6/15/2011(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Theresa. O'Connor on behalf of Nancy Ryan(Individually), Nancy Ryan(In Her Official Capacity as Assistant District Attorney of New York County) (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Theresa. O'Connor on behalf of Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City of New York.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss shall be modified as follows: June 15, 2011 Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss and accompanying papers; July 20, 2011 Plaintiff shall file his opposition papers; July 29, 2011 Defendants shall file their reply papers. (Motions due by 6/15/2011. Responses due by 7/20/2011. Replies due by 7/29/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/9/11) (rjm) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: As stated on the record at the May 6, 2011 conference, briefing on Defendants' motions to dismiss shall adhere to the following schedule: June 10, 2011, July 15, 2011, July 25, 2011, Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss and accompanying papers; Plaintiff shall file his opposition papers; Defendants shall file their reply papers. SO ORDERED. (See ORDER as set forth) (Motions due by 6/10/2011. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 7/25/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/6/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REFERRAL ORDER. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement: the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Dolinger by August 30, 2011, in order to schedule a settlement conference. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/6/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to disposition of this case by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. No additional parties may be joined except with leave of the Court. Amended pleadings may not be filed except with leave of the Court. Initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l)shall be completed no later than 5/20/2011. All fact discovery is to be completed no later than 11/1/2011. Initial requests for production of documents shall be served by 6/1/2011. Interrogatories shall be served by 6/1/2011. Depositions shall be completed by 11/1/2011. Requests to Adroit shall be served no later than 10/1/2011. All expert disclosures, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed pursuant to the following deadlines: a. Expert(s) of Plaintiff(s) Dec 15, 2011. b. Expert(s) of Defendant(s) Jan 30, 2012. All discovery shall be completed no later than 1/30/2012. The Court will conduct a post-discovery conference on 2/17/2012 at 2 pm. Pre-motion letters are to be submitted by 1/30/2012. Referral to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions. The parties are to contact Magistrate Judge Dolinger by 8/1/2011. Parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 weeks. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 11/1/2011. Discovery due by 1/30/2012. Status Conference set for 2/17/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/6/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,,,, against Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), Jane Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(Individually), Jane Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(in their Official Capacities, Assistant District Attorneys Of New York County), John Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(in their Official Capacities, being unknown Assistant District Attorneys Of New York County), John Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(Individually), Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau, Officers Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10(Individually), Officers Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10(in their official capacities, being unknown officers of the New York City Police Department), Officers John Doe Nos. 1 Through 10, Officers John Doe Nos.1 Through10, Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually), The City of New York, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by William McCaffrey. Related document: 1 Complaint,,,, filed by William McCaffrey.(ama) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Accordingly, Plaintiff shall submit a letter response to Defendants' pre-motion letters by Monday, May 2, 2011. In the alternative, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by May 2, 2011. The Court will address all scheduling issues at the May 6, 2011 conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/28/11) (djc) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 4/14/2011 re: Counsel for defendant request two additional days, to Wednesday, April 27, to submit their pre-motion conference letter. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/14/2011) (js) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Arthur G. Larkin dated 4/11/11 re: counsel for defendants request that their time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint be extended for a period of sixty (60) days from the current due date of April 11, 2011, to June 10, 2011. We understand that Your Honor's individual rules require a pre-motion conference letter prior to filing a Rule 12 motion. We are also aware of the court's scheduling order entered on March 22, 2011, and the status conference scheduled for May 6, 2011. We anticipate making a firm decision on which claims will be subject to defendants' Rule 12 motion sufficiently in advance of the May 6th conference date, so that we may submit our pre-motion letter to the court and that plaintiff may respond before the conference takes place. At the conference, with Your Honor's permission, we would take up the question whether discovery should be stayed in part or in its entirety pending any motion by defendants. ENDORSEMENT: This request is granted. The parties shall submit pre-motion letter, if any, by Monday, April 25, 2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/11/11) (pl) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III on behalf of The City of New York (Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Theresa. O'Connor on behalf of Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually) (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Theresa. O'Connor on behalf of Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County) (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Theresa. O'Connor on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr (O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on Friday, May 6, 2011, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. It is further ordered that, by Wednesday, April 27, 2011, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the information as set forth in this order. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/22/2011) (js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Robert Arbuiso(Individually), Robert Arbuiso(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(in his official capacity as a detective of the New York City Police Department), David Diaz(Individually), Jane Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(Individually), Jane Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(in their Official Capacities, Assistant District Attorneys Of New York County), John Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(in their Official Capacities, being unknown Assistant District Attorneys Of New York County), John Doe Nos. 11 Through 20(Individually), Evan Krutoy(Individually), Evan Krutoy(in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Robert M. Morgenthau, Robert M. Morgenthau, Officers Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10(Individually), Officers Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10(in their official capacities, being unknown officers of the New York City Police Department), Officers John Doe Nos. 1 Through 10, Officers John Doe Nos.1 Through10, Shanda Strain(in her official capacity as Assistant District Attorney Of New York County), Shanda Strain(Individually), The City of New York, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 931615)Document filed by William McCaffrey.(ama) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,059 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?