Antonio Hernandez
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-26989
District Judge Thomas Holman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2022 at 6:50 PM EST (4.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Antonio Hernandez, Debtor

Represented by Law Offices of C. Anthony Hughes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, C. Anthony +1 916 485 1111
No Logo Maria Luisa Hernandez, Joint Debtor
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 99 Filed: 1/21/2022, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
    Order Closing Case where Case has been Dismissed (awys) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
      Order Approving Final Report and Discharging Trustee (awys) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
        Certificate of Mailing of Trustee's Final Report and Account as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
          Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account and of Order Fixing Deadline for Objecting Thereto as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
            Notice of Filing Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account and of Order Fixing Deadline for Objecting Thereto as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
              Trustee's Final Report and Account as transmitted to BNC for service. (Smith, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                Amended Summary of Schedules Statistical Summary Schedule A Schedule F Statement of Financial Affairs (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (wlos) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 71 Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                    Notice of Entry of Order as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 70 Order Granting 66 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [CAH-4] (msws) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 70 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                      Order Granting 66 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [CAH-4] (msws) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 68 Notice of Filed Claims (msws) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                          Notice of Filed Claims (msws) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 66 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [CAH-4] (wlos) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 66 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                              Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [CAH-4] Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez (wlos) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1]. (msws) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                  Civil Minute Order Granting 28 Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 51 Counter Motion to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [CAH-1]. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (sars) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/28/2012, Entered: None
                                      Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (msws) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 60 Response/Reply [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                          Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez Re: 51 Opposition/Objection, 51 Counter Motion to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            Civil Minute Order Granting 39 Motion/Application To Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2] (msws) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                              Civil Minute Order Granting 35 Motion/Application To Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Joint Debtor (msws) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Debtor (msws) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 39 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2] GRANTED (sars) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 35 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1] GRANTED (sars) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 51 Opposition/Objection, 51 Counter Motion to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [CAH-1], 52 Exhibit(s) (msws) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 51 Opposition/Objection, 51 Counter Motion to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Counter Motion to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [CAH-1] Filed by Trustee Jan P. Johnson to be held on 7/31/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (msws) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Intent to Close Chapter 13 Case Without Entry of Discharge Due to Failure to File Financial Management Course Certificate as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 07/04/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Intent to Close Chapter 13 Case Without Entry of Discharge Due to Failure to File Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Civil Minute Order Dismissing 21 Objection to Confirmation of Plan [MBB-1] (jtis) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Civil Minute Order Dismissing 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan [JPJ-1] (jtis) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 21 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [MBB-1] DISMISSED (sars) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Jan P. Johnson [JPJ-1], 18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [JPJ-1] DISMISSED (sars) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 43 Response/Reply [JPJ-1] (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez Re: 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Jan P. Johnson [JPJ-1], 18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [JPJ-1] (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 39 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2], 40 Notice of Hearing, 41 Declaration (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration of Antonio Hernandez and Maria Luisa Hernandez in support of 39 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2] (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 39 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2] to be held on 7/17/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-2] Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 35 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1], 36 Notice of Hearing, 37 Declaration (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Antonio Hernandez and Maria Luisa Hernandez in support of 35 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Re: 35 Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1] to be held on 7/17/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Motion/Application to Value Collateral of Tri Counties Bank [CAH-1] Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez (msws) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Amended Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Amended Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtor(s) and their Attorney (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 26 Amended/Modified Plan, 28 Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1], 29 Notice of Hearing, 30 Declaration, 31 Exhibit(s) (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) in support of 28 Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Declaration of Antonio Hernandez and Maria Luisa Hernandez in support of 28 Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1] (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Re: 28 Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1] to be held on 7/31/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion/Application to Confirm Chapter 13 Plan [CAH-1] Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Amended Summary of Schedules Statistical Summary Schedule J (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Amended/Modified 5 Plan Filed by Debtor Antonio Hernandez, Joint Debtor Maria Luisa Hernandez (msws) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing of Transfer of Claim as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 21 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [MBB-1], 22 Notice of Hearing, 23 Exhibit(s) (rlos) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) in support of 21 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [MBB-1] (rlos) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 21 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [MBB-1] to be held on 6/19/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (rlos) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Objection to Confirmation of Plan by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [MBB-1] Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (rlos) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Jan P. Johnson [JPJ-1], 18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [JPJ-1], 19 Notice of Hearing (msws) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Jan P. Johnson [JPJ-1], 18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [JPJ-1] to be held on 6/19/2012 at 09:32 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (msws) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [JPJ-1] Filed by Trustee Jan P. Johnson (msws) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Transfer of Claim(s) Transferor: FIA Card Services, N.A. as successor to (Claim No.2); To FIA Card Services, N.A. as successor in Filed by Beckett & Lee User. (Beckett & Lee User) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (msws) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC (msws) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (msws) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Copy of Chapter 13 Plan as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing of Chapter 13 Meeting Notice as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Commencement of Case Under Chapter 13, Meeting of Creditors and Deadlines as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/17/2012 at 11:30 AM at Meeting Room 7-B. Proofs of Claim due by 8/15/2012. (Padilla, Angelina) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Copy of Chapter 13 Plan as transmitted to BNC for service. (Padilla, Angelina) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and their Attorneys (auto) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order Re: Chapter 13 Plan Payments, Adequate Protection Payments, and Employer Payment Advices (mgrs) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 13 Plan (auto) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Social Security Number(s) (mgrs) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Designation of Trustee (auto) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. All Schedules and Statements filed. (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?