Lennon Image Technologies LLC v. Mattel Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00901
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 4:34 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 888 6855 +1 302 571 1750 kdorsney@morrisjames.com
v.
Mattel, Inc. Mattel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Horwitz +1 302 984 6000 rhorwitz@potteranderson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ellis Moore +1 302 984 6000 dmoore@potteranderson.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(fms) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Mattel Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Mattel Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
      Joint STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation to Stay All Deadlines Between Lennon Image Technologies, LLC and Defendant Mattel Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Lennon Image Technologies LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard D. Kirk. Attorney Kenneth L. Dorsney terminated. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures; (ii) Plaintiff's Section 4(a) Disclosures; and (iii) Plaintiff's Section 3 Disclosures by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
            REPLY BRIEF re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mattel Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/17/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2012. (lih) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Mattel (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Mattel by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                  PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/4/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                      PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order re (10 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR) Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Boucheron Joaillerie USA Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mattel Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mattel Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/24/2012. (Moore, David) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Mattel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding coordinated discovery and Markman proceedings - re (10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR) Order, Set Deadlines,,. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER, Counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/29/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/15/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 6, 2012 - filed by Mattel Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Joe and Attorney Niky Bukovcan - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Mattel Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Mattel Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1106656.) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?