W.P. v. PRINCETON UNIVERSITY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01893
District Judge Joel A. Pisano, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2018 at 11:28 AM EDT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo W.P., Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W.P. jon.doe5654@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo ANITA MCLEAN, Defendant
No Logo COLE CRITTENDEN, Defendant
No Logo CYNTHIA CHERREY, Defendant
No Logo DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN KOLLIGAN, Defendant
No Logo KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL OLIN, Defendant
No Logo Princeton University, Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM F. MADERER +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 wfm@saiber.com
Space RYAN E. SAN GEORGE +1 973 622 3333 rsangeorge@saiber.com
No Logo SHIRLEY TILGHMAN, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Opinion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY re 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Complaint by THEODORE A HOWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Brief)(CICCONE, MARY) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mary A. Ciccone, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Brief)(CICCONE, MARY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefingof the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CICCONE, MARY) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Emily Baver Slavin, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/5/2016. (mps) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Plaintiff shall initiate the call; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/19/2017; Fact Discovery due by 7/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/4/2016. (kas, ) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily Baver Slavin, Esq. for by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily Baver Slavin, Esq. in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, Plaintiff to initiate the call; Any Motion to Amend the Pleadings or Join New Parties due by 1/19/2017; Fact Discovery due by 7/24/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/3/2016. (eaj) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by MARY A. CICCONE on behalf of MICHAEL J GRIDLEY, THEODORE A HOWARD (CICCONE, MARY) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RUTH ANN LOWENKRON terminated. Attorney MARY A. CICCONE for THEODORE A HOWARD added.. (CICCONE, MARY) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole Audet Richardson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/22/2016. (km) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Pltf's Motion to reconsider and/or amend the Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 7/13/2016. (gxh) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 7/13/2016. (gxh) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Letter from William F. Maderer to Judge Sheridan concerning Paragraph 3 of the Confidentiality Order re 82 Motion Hearing,, Motions Taken Under Advisement, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2016 re 70 MOTION to Amend/Correct Confidentiality Order filed by THEODORE A HOWARD, Motions Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE by KAREN S. VLADECK of Her Withdrawal as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Defendants (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER TO MODIFY PROCEDURAL SCHEDULE, No later than 6/17/2016, Plaintiff is to provide Defendants with a settlement proposal; no later than 7/18/2016, Defendants are to submit their counterproposal. Status Conference via telephone set for 7/27/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be Plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as to initiate the call.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/14/2016. (km) Modified on 6/16/2016 (km, ). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              TEXT ORDER No later than 6/10/2016, Plaintiff is to provide Defendant with a settlement proposal; no later than 7/11/2016, Defendant is to submit its counter-proposal. Status Conference via telephone set for 7/27/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiffs responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference as, well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Karen A. Bower, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/6/2016. (km) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for May 19, 2016 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiffs responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference as, well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for April 14, 2016 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiffs responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference as, well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER The Plaintiff shall submit to the court a confidential settlement memo, not to exceed 5 pages, with their respective settlement position by March 28, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER ORDER that formal discovery is hereby stayed pending settlement discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/23/2016. (kas, ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN re 70 MOTION to Amend/Correct Confidentiality Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Excerpts of 12/8/15 Hearing Transcript)(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Confidentiality Order by THEODORE A HOWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit to Brief, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REDACTION to 68 Declaration, of William F. Maderer, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Complaint (Previously Filed as [12-2]) and Filed Under Seal Pursuant to 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order, Paragraph 13 by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of William F. Maderer, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Complaint (Previously Filed as [12-2]) re 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order and Filed Under Seal Pursuant to 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order, Paragraph 13 by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REDACTION to 66 Declaration, of William F. Maderer, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Amended Complaint (Previously Filed as [21-2]) and Filed Under Seal Pursuant to 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order, Paragraph 13 by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of William F. Maderer, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Amended Complaint (Previously Filed as [21-2]) re 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order and Filed Under Seal Pursuant to 64 Discovery Confidentiality Order, Paragraph 13 by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 31 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/8/2016. (kas, ) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/8/2016. (kas, ) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Consent ORDER continuing the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference until 2/23/2016 at 10:00AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/29/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Response to Court's Inquiries at December 8, 2015 Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12/8/15 Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 10/14/15 Hearing Transcript)(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Amended/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Confidentiality hearing held on 12/8/2015. Parties shall confer and negotiate a proposed confidentiality form of Order. Plaintiff's papers on the form of Order is due on or before 12/15/2015. Defendant's papers on the form of Order is due on or before 12/22/2015. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 12/8/2015. Parties shall confer and negotiate a proposed confidentiality form of Order. Defendants papers on the form of Order is due on or before 12/15/2015. Plaintiff's papers on the form of Order is due on or before 12/22/15. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Support filed by W.P. re 31 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by W.P. re 30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Supplemental Brief (LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2016 at 12:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/7/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN.(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter from William F. Maderer and Henry Morris, Jr. re 53 Order, 46 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Letter from Theodore A. Howard. (LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Letter ORDER granting adjournment request of hearing scheduled for November 23, 2015 to resolve the parties' dispute over the terms of a confidentiality order for this case.. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/20/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Letter from William F. Maderer to Judge Sheridan re 46 Order,. (MADERER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER extending the deadline within which Defendants may answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint until 12/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/30/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED that President Tilghman is dismissed from the action. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/23/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Original Writ sent to USMS (kas, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2015. Ordered that Magistrate Judge Bongiovanni's Order is stayed. Ordered that the parties shall confer and negotiate a proposed form of Order by 11/4/2015. Ordered in the event no proposed form of order is submitted, a hearing shall be conducted on 11/23/15 at 1:00 pm. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that Magistrate Judge Bongiovanni's Order is stayed until such time as a reasonable confidentiality order is entered; ORDERED that the parties shall confer and negotiate a proposed form of Order by November 4, 2015; and it is further ORDERED that in the event no proposed form of order is submitted, a hearing shall be conducted on November 23, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. to resolve same. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/14/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Attorneys to Receive Electronic Notification for by W.P.. (LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2015 re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Various Causes of Action filed by KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, COLE CRITTENDEN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, CYNTHIA CHERREY, DOES 1-10, 34 MOTION for an order calling for resolution on written submissions or in the alternative Postponement of oral arguments filed by W.P., 31 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by W.P. re 30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by W.P., Motions Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore A. Howard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/26/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Howard Declaration, # 2 Declaration Gridley Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LOWENKRON, RUTH) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER ORDER rescheduling the 34 motion for an order calling for resolution to 9/1/2015 at 2:00. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/3/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Response (NOT Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Peter G. Sheridan for all further proceedings. Judge Joel A. Pisano no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/10/15. (mem, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Gina Hernandez-Buckley* (gxh) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Orders Granting Leave to Proceed Anonymously and Otherwise Protecting the Identity of the Plaintiff from Public Disclosure, by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 2 Brief, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(gxh) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against CYNTHIA CHERREY, COLE CRITTENDEN, KATHLEEN DEIGNAN, DOES 1-10, JOHN KOLLIGAN, ANITA MCLEAN, MICHAEL OLIN, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, SHIRLEY TILGHMAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number TRE042230) with JURY DEMAND, filed by W.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Pro Se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically)(gxh) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,682 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?