LaserDynamics, LLC v. Haier America Trading, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-09221
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 7:36 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laserdynamics, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 212 801 2100 +1 212 754 8522 kroubg@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Finnegan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@torys.com
v.
No Logo Haier America Trading LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M Bollinger +1 212 309 6000 +1 212 309 6001 jbollinger@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 212 704 6000 +1 212 309 6001 xin.he@troutmansanders.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Heaton +1 212 704 6417 +1 212 704 8383 timothy.heaton@troutmansanders.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It is, on this 12th day of March, 2014, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 60 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/12/2014) (ama) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
    DOCUMENT FILED IN CLOSED CASE - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) Modified on 3/6/2014 (jno). (Entered: 03/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It is, on this 3rd day of March, 2014, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/03/2014) (ama) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Rule 26f Report addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov dated 2/28/2014. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Haier America Trading, LLC.(Heaton, Timothy) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Haier America Trading, LLC.(Heaton, Timothy) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Xin He on behalf of Haier America Trading, LLC. New Address: Troutman Sanders LLP, 405 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10174, 212-704-6000. (He, Xin) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Xin He on behalf of Haier America Trading, LLC. (He, Xin) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Timothy P. Heaton dated 2/3/2014. Document filed by Haier America Trading, LLC.(Heaton, Timothy) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Patrick Heaton on behalf of Haier America Trading, LLC. (Heaton, Timothy) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Bollinger on behalf of Haier America Trading, LLC. (Bollinger, James) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, the case shall be assigned to that judge for all purposes, without further notice to the Assignment Committee and the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/29/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (tn) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kamatani Technologies, LLC for LaserDynamics, LLC. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sergey Kolmykov on behalf of LaserDynamics, LLC. New Address: Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC, 305 Broadway, Floor #7, New York, New York, United States 10007, (917) 702-9135. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Zachary David Silbersher on behalf of LaserDynamics, LLC. New Address: Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC, 305 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10007, 9177029135. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gaston Kroub on behalf of LaserDynamics, LLC. New Address: Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC, 305 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10007, 9177029135. (Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jom) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Haier America Trading, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401084541)Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(jom) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?