Judith Mwila, et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-5106

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 3:35 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207624239
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207624236
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207622610
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207622212
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207621823
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207620764
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207620758
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207616083
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207615308
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207612474
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207604525 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION filed [1498987] by All Plaintiffs in 14-5106 to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/07/2014) [Service Date: 06/23/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Vail, John)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207603792 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                        TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1498585] by Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105 [Service Date: 06/19/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/21/2014. [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207603789 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1498584] by Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105 [Service Date: 06/19/2014 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207603782 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                            UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1498583] by Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105 [Service Date: 06/19/2014 ] [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207603779 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1498582] by Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105 [Service Date: 06/19/2014 ] [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207600592 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1496753] by All Plaintiffs in 14-5106 [Service Date: 06/09/2014 ] [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Vail, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207600576 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1496747] by John Vail, Esq. and co-counsel Thomas Fortune Fay, Esq., William Coleman Dowden, III, Esq. on behalf of Appellee All Plaintiffs in 14-5106. [14-5105, 14-5106] (Vail, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207595314 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                    LETTER FILED [1493787] by James Owens in 14-5105 Correct the docket to show Sudan has entered an appearance on this case.. [Service Date: 05/20/2014 ] [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Fay, Thomas)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207595029 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1493633] dismissing as moot motion to strike document [1492163-2] in 14-5105 [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207594999 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1493618] by Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105, Ministry Of The Interior Of The Republic Of Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5106, 14-5107 [Service Date: 05/19/2014 ] [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207594980 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1493612] by Asim Ghafoor on behalf of Appellants Ministry of the Interior of the Republic of the Sudan and Republic of Sudan in 14-5105. [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Ghafoor, Asim)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207594388 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1493273] by Annie P. Kaplan, Esq. on behalf of Appellee James Owens in 14-5105. [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107] (Kaplan, Annie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207592678 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1492284] consolidating cases 14-5106, 14-5107 (Consolidation started 05/09/2014) with 14-5105; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/09/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/23/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/09/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/09/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/09/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/23/2014 [14-5105, 14-5106, 14-5107]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207591822 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1491791] by Ministry Of The Interior Of The Republic Of Sudan and Republic of Sudan seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:08-cv-01377-JDB. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-5106]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?