Banneker Ventures, LLC v. Jim Graham, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-7030

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 12:49 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01207672959
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207672849
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207672846
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207669394
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207666485
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207664017
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207659167
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Blank 01207649832
                  LREF
                  Blank 01207643498
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207642841
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Blank 01207642787
                        LREF
                        Blank 01207641075
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207640169
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207629863
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207628942
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207625980
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207618469
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207615574
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Blank 01207602698 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                      REPLY FILED [1497879] by Banneker Ventures, LLC to response [1496318-2],[1496318-3] [Service Date: 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207602695 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                        REPLY FILED [1497878] by Banneker Ventures, LLC to response [1496313-2],[1496313-3] [Service Date: 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207602692 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          REPLY FILED [1497877] by Banneker Ventures, LLC to response [1496287-2],[1496287-3] [Service Date: 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599816 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                            REPLY FILED [1496318] by Joshua A. Adler, Robb M. Lakritz and Lakritz Adler Development, LLC to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [1494259-3],[1494259-4](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 06/16/2014) [Service Date: 06/05/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (Rosenthal, Seth)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599806 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY FILED [1496313] by Jim Graham to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [1494260-3],[1494260-4](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 06/16/2014) [Service Date: 06/05/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (Venkatesh, Manasi)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599757 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                REPLY FILED [1496287] by WMATA to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [1494258-3],[1494258-4](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 06/16/2014) [Service Date: 06/05/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [14-7030] (Stief, Gerard)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596080 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MODIFIED EVENT--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1494260] to motion for summary affirmance [1491309-2](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/05/2014) combined with a MOTION FILED by Banneker Ventures, LLC for summary reversal [Service Date: 05/23/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [14-7030]--[Edited 05/23/2014 by JJA] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596077 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MODIFIED EVENT--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1494259] to motion for summary affirmance [1491313-2](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/05/2014) combined with a MOTION FILED by Banneker Ventures, LLC for summary reversal [Service Date: 05/23/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [14-7030]--[Edited 05/23/2014 by JJA] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596074 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MODIFIED EVENT--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1494258] to motion for summary affirmance [1491231-2](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/05/2014) combined with a MOTION FILED by Banneker Ventures, LLC for summary reversal [Service Date: 05/23/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [14-7030]--[Edited 05/23/2014 by JJA] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207593892 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1492983] granting motion to extend time [1492748-2]; directing response to motions for summary affirmance [1491313-2], [1491309-2], [1491231-2] Response due on 05/23/2014 [14-7030]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207593494 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                          CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1492748] by Banneker Ventures, LLC to extend time to file motion to 05/23/2014. Pages: 1-10. [14-7030] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586004
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586001
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Blank 01207585998
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585995
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585992
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585919
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585912
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585555
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207578082
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207578057
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207590897 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION filed [1491313] by Joshua A. Adler, Robb M. Lakritz and Lakritz Adler Development, LLC for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/15/2014) [Service Date: 05/02/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [14-7030] (Rosenthal, Seth)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207590882 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION filed [1491309] by Jim Graham for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/15/2014) [Service Date: 05/02/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [14-7030] (Venkatesh, Manasi)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207590722 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION filed [1491231] by WMATA for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/15/2014) [Service Date: 05/02/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [14-7030] (Stief, Gerard)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586628 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1488983] by Jim Graham [Service Date: 04/17/2014 ] [14-7030]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586454 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        STATEMENT FILED [1488888] by Lakritz Adler Development, LLC with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 04/17/2014 ] [14-7030] (Schwalb, Brian)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586418 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1488865] by Joshua A. Adler, Robb M. Lakritz and Lakritz Adler Development, LLC [Service Date: 04/17/2014 ] [14-7030] (Schwalb, Brian)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586412 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1488863] by Brian L. Schwalb Seth A. Rosenthal on behalf of Appellees Joshua A. Adler, Robb M. Lakritz and Lakritz Adler Development, LLC. [14-7030] (Schwalb, Brian)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586403 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1488860] by V. David Zvenyach, General Counsel and co-counsel John Hoellen, Deputy General Counsel Manasi Venkatesh, Assistant General Counsel on behalf of Appellee Jim Graham. [14-7030] (Venkatesh, Manasi)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207586009 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1488626] by Banneker Ventures, LLC [Service Date: 04/16/2014 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [14-7030] (McDaniel, Brian)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?