Carr et al v. Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-02223
District Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 4:43 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Aimee Talbert, Plaintiff
No Logo Alicia Washington, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrea Gregory, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrew Berry, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrew Tillman, Plaintiff
No Logo Anita Crosby, Plaintiff
No Logo Anita Foster, Plaintiff
No Logo Anita Wilson, Plaintiff
No Logo Antoinette Graves, Plaintiff
No Logo Antonio Owens, Plaintiff
No Logo Aravian Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Arvis Porter, Plaintiff
No Logo Audrey Herring, Plaintiff
No Logo Azline Baley, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Brimage, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Brinage, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Page, Plaintiff
No Logo Battonboneg Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Ben Kinsey, Plaintiff
No Logo Bennie Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Bertha Sturles, Plaintiff
No Logo Bertha Sturlese, Plaintiff
No Logo Bertrand Jupiter, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty . Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Jefferson, Plaintiff
No Logo Bonkeu Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Brandon Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Brandon Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Brandon Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Breonna Dickerson, Plaintiff
No Logo Brian Domino, Plaintiff
No Logo Carolyn Allen, Plaintiff
No Logo Carrie Pollard, Plaintiff
No Logo Catherine Seaman, Plaintiff
No Logo Cathy Brock, Plaintiff
No Logo Chanda Cheo, Plaintiff
No Logo Chankell Dominique, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Pohlmann, Plaintiff
No Logo Cheryl Cornish, Plaintiff
No Logo Chi Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo Chim Chandy, Plaintiff
No Logo Christina Brinage, Plaintiff
No Logo Cicely Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Clifford DeRouen, Plaintiff
No Logo Clyde Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Constance Bourgeois, Plaintiff
No Logo Corey Ledet, Plaintiff
No Logo Corey Maurice, Plaintiff
No Logo Dale Bassinger, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel, Gregory, Plaintiff
No Logo Danneil Weston, Plaintiff
No Logo Darlene Hart, Plaintiff
No Logo Dawn Whitley, Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah Stanley, Plaintiff
No Logo Debroski Tucker, Plaintiff
No Logo Della Mosley, Plaintiff
No Logo Deondre Westbrook, Plaintiff
No Logo Desmond Hart, Plaintiff
No Logo Diane Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Diane Keys, Plaintiff
No Logo Don Monae, Plaintiff
No Logo Donna Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Barnes, Plaintiff
No Logo Dwayne Lockette, Plaintiff
No Logo Edeltrud Barrilleaux, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Parker, Plaintiff
No Logo Edwin Alexander, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Benoit, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Jennings, Plaintiff
No Logo Emerlene Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Eric Washington, Plaintiff
No Logo Erica Crosby, Plaintiff
No Logo Eugene McDaniel, Plaintiff
No Logo Eva Dickerson, Plaintiff
No Logo Evonne Tucker, Plaintiff
No Logo Florestine Lanauex, Plaintiff
No Logo Francis Page, Plaintiff
No Logo Gerald Antoine, Plaintiff
No Logo Geraldine Mack, Plaintiff
No Logo Gina Grinaldi, Plaintiff
No Logo Gregory Keller, Plaintiff
No Logo Herbert Seaman, Plaintiff
No Logo Herman Prevost, Plaintiff
No Logo Huyen Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo J.R. Kelly, Plaintiff
No Logo Jack Bassinger, Plaintiff
No Logo Jaimie Pope, Plaintiff
No Logo James Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Jason Farve, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeanell Hill, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeanetta Jimerson, Plaintiff
No Logo Jentae Bickham, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesse Oller, Plaintiff
No Logo John Bosarge, Plaintiff
No Logo John Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo John Pope, Plaintiff
No Logo John Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Vittur, Plaintiff
No Logo June Carr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Ieyoub +1 225 297 2525 +1 225 298 8119 rieyoub@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carroll Louis Clifford, IV +1 601 812 5925

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert C. Hilliard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Walter Grillo +1 361 882 1612 +1 361 882 3015 kevin@hilliardandmunoz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Hilliard +1 361 882 1612 +1 361 882 3015 bobh@hillardandmunoz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ware Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Ware +1 601 845 9273 +1 601 845 0749

Toggle Switch Represented by Watts Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mikal C. Watts +1 800 994 0019 +1 210 447 0501 mcw@wgclawfirm.com
No Logo K'Ya Brock, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen Isabelle, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen Lewis, Plaintiff
No Logo Katrina Bosarge, Plaintiff
No Logo Katrina Nordin, Plaintiff
No Logo Keeshala Jacobs, Plaintiff
No Logo Keisha Porter, Plaintiff
No Logo Kem Cooper, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Hunnings, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenyata Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenyon Monea, Plaintiff
No Logo Kim Monae, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimberly Glaude, Plaintiff
No Logo La Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo La Thi Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo Lacy Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Lalique Cornish, Plaintiff
No Logo Larenzeo King, Plaintiff
No Logo LaSalle Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Latasha Pritchett, Plaintiff
No Logo LaToya Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo LAWRENCE GREEN, Plaintiff
No Logo Le Roy Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Lee, Spencer, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Oaktree Acquisition Corp.
No Logo Lenora Tucker, Plaintiff
No Logo Leo Soniat, Plaintiff
No Logo Leo Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Leslie Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Leulla Daughtry, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Jacobs, Plaintiff
No Logo Lionel Porter, Plaintiff
No Logo Lonnie Morrow, Plaintiff
No Logo Lori Price, Plaintiff
No Logo Lydia Jupiter, Plaintiff
No Logo Lynette Boyanton, Plaintiff
No Logo Mallory Bosarge, Plaintiff
No Logo Margie Stapleton, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Barnes, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Martha Young, Plaintiff
No Logo Marvin May, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Keller, Plaintiff
No Logo Melinda Seal, Plaintiff
No Logo Melinda Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Melton Crosby, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Bassinger, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Moeum Nou, Plaintiff
No Logo Monique Hart, Plaintiff
No Logo Monique Perkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Muth Nou, Plaintiff
No Logo Nadine Washington, Plaintiff
No Logo Natasha Dawsey, Plaintiff
No Logo Neitia White, Plaintiff
No Logo Neola Hartman, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole Tureaud, Plaintiff
No Logo Norwood Bienaime, Plaintiff
No Logo Noy Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Olivia Bosarge, Plaintiff
No Logo Pamela Dominique, Plaintiff
No Logo Pamela Fairley, Plaintiff
No Logo Pamela Reynolds, Plaintiff
No Logo Paris Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Bazile, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul A. Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Pauline Ruhr, Plaintiff
No Logo Peggy McCool, Plaintiff
No Logo Perry Bailey, Plaintiff
No Logo Petrina Hampton, Plaintiff
Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Philip Johnson"
Officer/Director, Barrier Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Immunicon Corp
Officer/Director, Nevro Corp
Officer/Director, Fusion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Officer/Director, Inno-tech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Biopsys Medical, Inc.
Officer/Director, De Puy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Femrx, Inc.
Officer/Director, Heartport, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orapharma, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tri Point Medical Corp
Officer/Director, Animas Corp
Officer/Director, Provention Bio, Inc.
No Logo Pringle Jordan, Plaintiff
No Logo Ramona Harris, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebecca Scogin, Plaintiff
No Logo Rene Markey, Plaintiff
No Logo Ressalyn Dukes, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert, Isabelle, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Yarborough, Plaintiff
No Logo Rodney Gould, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Chaupette, Plaintiff
No Logo Rontel Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Rosa Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Rosa Watkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Sa Mai Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel Watson, Plaintiff
No Logo Shana Mann, Plaintiff
No Logo Shanna Harbison, Plaintiff
No Logo Shannon Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Shannon Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Shannon Oller, Plaintiff
No Logo Shannon Triplett, Plaintiff
No Logo Shawanda Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Shelia Gains, Plaintiff
No Logo Shequille Prudhomme, Plaintiff
No Logo Shirley Bosarge, Plaintiff
No Logo Shunta Isaac, Plaintiff
No Logo Sidney Barrilleaux, Plaintiff
No Logo Sira Soun, Plaintiff
No Logo Stacy Bigelow, Plaintiff
No Logo Stacy McGee, Plaintiff
No Logo Steve Perkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Keller, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Connor, Plaintiff
No Logo Tai Thach, Plaintiff
No Logo Tanjaneia Bradley, Plaintiff
No Logo Tanjaneia Robinson, Plaintiff
No Logo Taurus Hart, Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Mcgee, Plaintiff
No Logo Thelma Butler, Plaintiff
No Logo Thiet Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Thieteu Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Tracy Bigelow, Plaintiff
No Logo Tracy Phomaningth, Plaintiff
No Logo Trisha Ryan, Plaintiff
No Logo Tronell Anderson, Plaintiff
No Logo Tyesha Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Tyrone Nelson, Plaintiff
No Logo Wade DeSilva, Plaintiff
No Logo Wanda Perkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Wayne Oden, Plaintiff
No Logo Wayne Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilfred Francis, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilfred Price, Plaintiff
No Logo William Seal, Plaintiff
No Logo William Tarver, Plaintiff
No Logo Yon Loch, Plaintiff
No Logo Zina Carr, Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND REASONS granting 16174 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fleetwood Settlement filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the settlement agreement entered into between certain plaintiffs and Fleetwood Canada, Ltd., Fleetwood Homes of North Carolina, Inc., Fleetwood Homes of Georgia, Inc., Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Maryland, Inc., and American International Group, Inc., as well as the liability insurers of the Fleetwood interests, including, but not limited to, Gibraltar Insurance Company, Ltd. and American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company (now known as Chartis Specialty Insurance Company), and Starr Excess Liability Insurance Company (now known as Chartis Select Insurance Company), all pending claims made or asserted by or on behalf of plaintiffs in these proceedings against the following defendants and/or their insurers are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own litigation costs. FURTHER ORDERED, more specifically, that the claims of plaintiffs in these proceedings against any of the above-listed defendants and/or insurers in the actions listed and identified on Exhibit A attached hereto, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own litigation cost. FINALLY ORDERED that claims against the above-listed defendants and/or insurers which are made or asserted by or on behalf of any plaintiffs in any action transferred into this MDL after the date of this Order, as well as claims against the above-listed defendants and/or insurers by or on behalf of any plaintiff hereafter matched as an occupant to an emergency housing unit manufactured by one or more of the above-listed settling defendant manufacturers, will be subject to dismissal with prejudice on the presentation of the appropriate motion confirming any such plaintiff's participation in the Special Masters protocol for the allocation and distribution of funds in connection with the above settlement. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (**Original filed in master case 07md1873, doc #19057)(ijg, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc. (clm, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 1 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Compliance, # 4 PreTrial Order #40)(clm, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
    LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 245 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?