City of Providence, Rhode Island v. Bats Global Markets, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-02811
District Judge Kimba M. Wood, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 13, 2021 at 10:40 PM DT (4.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Providence, Rhode Island, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randi Dawn Bandman +1 310 859 3100 +1 310 278 2148 randib@csgrr.com
Space ANDREW J. BROWN +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 andrewb@lcsr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com
Space David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Oliver O'Mara +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 bomara@rgrdlaw.com
Space Brian Oliver O'Mara +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 bomara@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
Space Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie Stephen Dycus +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 jamie.dycus@wilmerhale.com
Space Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr. +1 212 230 8882 +1 212 230 8888 fraser.hunter@wilmerhale.com
Space David Sapir Lesser +1 212 230 8851 +1 212 230 8888 david.lesser@wilmerhale.com
Barclays PLC Barclays PLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Imperial Holly Corp
Unknown Role, Jcg Inc
Unknown Role, Candie's, Inc.
Unknown Role, Eott Energy LLC
No Logo Bats Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Box Options Exchange L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Balber, Pickard, Battistoni, Maldonado, & Van Der Tuin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elyse Kennedy Yang +1 404 437 7000 +1 404 437 7100 eyang@schiffhardin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E. Dengel +1 312 258 5500 pdengel@schiffhardin.com
Space Paul Edwin Greenwalt, III +1 312 258 5500 pgreenwalt@schiffhardin.com
Space Stacie Rachel Hartman +1 312 258 5500 +1 312 258 5700 shartman@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Lee LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth L. Levine +1 212 223 4400 +1 212 223 4425 slevine@levinelee.com
Space Christos Papapetrou +1 212 257 4400 +1 212 223 4425 cpapapetrou@levinelee.com
No Logo Chopper Trading, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Bousnakis +1 312 840 7213 +1 312 840 7313 tbousnakis@jenner.com
Space Dean Nicholas Panos +1 312 923 2765 +1 312 840 7765 dpanos@jenner.com
Space Howard Steven Suskin +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 840 7604 hsuskin@jenner.com
No Logo Citadel Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nevin Merrill Gewertz +1 312 494 4400 nevin.gewertz@bartlit-beck.com
Space Adam L. Hoeflich +1 312 494 4400 +4944 494 494 4440 adam.hoeflich@bartlit-beck.com
Space Chris J Lind +1 312 494 4400 +1 312 494 4440 chris.lind@bartlit-beck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Mitchell +1 202 663 6426 +1 202 663 6363 elizabeth.mitchell@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Andrew Valentine +1 212 230 8800 +1 202 663 6363 john.valentine@wilmerhale.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Agnes Dunogue +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 adunogue@stblaw.com
Space Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
Space Mark Lanpher +1 202 508 8120 +1 202 661 7321 mark.lanpher@shearman.com
Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Group AG, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Alan Gilman +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 cgilman@cahill.com
Space David George Januszewski +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 djanuszewski@cahill.com
No Logo Direct Edge Ecn LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY & MCGONIGLE, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C. Lombard +1 202 661 7028 jlombard@mmlawus.com
Space James Alwin Murphy +1 804 762 5330 +1 804 762 5360 jmurphy@mmlawus.com
Space Theodore R. Snyder +1 212 825 9811 +1 212 825 9828 Theodore.Snyder@mmlawus.com
No Logo Drw Holdings, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, DRW Commodities, LLC
Unknown Role, Wilson, Donald R. Jr.
E*TRADE Financial Corporation E*TRADE Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Faith Elizabeth Gay +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 faithgay@quinnemanuel.com
Space Marc Laurence Greenwald +1 212 849 7140 +1 212 849 7100 marcgreenwald@quinnemanuel.com
Space Julia Marie Guaragna +1 212 558 3255 +1 212 558 3588 guaragnaj@sullcrom.com
Space Richard Corey Worcester +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 coreyworcester@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Fidelity Brokerage Services, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Fmr LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy A. Berman +1 212 735 2032 +1 917 777 2032 jberman@skadden.com
Space Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
Space Scott D. Musoff , +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 smusoff@skadden.com
No Logo GTS Securities, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Patrick Bedell +1 312 832 4500 sbedell@foley.com
Space Thomas Paul Krebs +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 tkrebs@foley.com
Space Mark S. Mandel +1 212 338 3620
No Logo Hudson River Trading Llc, Defendant
No Logo International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc., Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JPMorgan Chase & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Lawrence Friedman +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 blfriedman@proskauer.com
Space Harry Frischer +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 hfrischer@proskauer.com
Space Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
Space Boris Zeldin +1 212 788 1791 +1 212 788 9776 bzeldin@proskauer.com
No Logo Jump Trading, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Neil Eisenberg +1 202 778 9348 +1 202 778 9100 jon.eisenberg@klgates.com
Space Peter Nicholas Flocos +1 212 536 4025 +1 212 536 3901 peter.flocos@klgates.com
No Logo Kcg Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 maofiling@cgsh.com
Space Lewis J. Liman +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 lliman@cgsh.com
Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Alexander Edelman +1 212 530 5149 +1 212 822 5149 sedelman@milbank.com
Space Matthew Joseph Laroche +1 212 530 5684 +1 212 822 5684 mlaroche@milbank.com
No Logo Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nasdaq Omx Phlx LLC, Defendant
No Logo National Stock Exchange, Inc., Defendant
No Logo New York Stock Exchange LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Anthony Borden +1 202 434 5563 +1 202 434 5029 gborden@wc.com
Space Steven M.. Farina +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 sfarina@wc.com
No Logo NYSE Arca, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Onechicago, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Quantlab Financial L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
Space Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com
Space Alexander Virgil Maugeri +1 914 844 2615 +1 212 474 3700 amaugeri@cravath.com
Space Daniel Alexander Richards +1 212 474 1634 +1 212 474 3700 drichards@cravath.com
No Logo Scottrade Financial Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helen Byung-Son Kim +1 310 788 3575 +1 310 551 0283 hkim@tocounsel.com
No Logo TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J Kaplan +1 212 839 5839 +1 212 839 5599 ajkaplan@sidley.com
Space Jackie Adeline Lu +1 212 839 7346 +1 212 839 5599 jlu@sidley.com
Space Alfred Robert Pietrzak +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 rpietrzak@sidley.com
Charles Schwab & Company, Inc. Charles Schwab & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Charles Schwab Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Beth Brody +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 sbrody@sidley.com
Space Dorothy Jane Spenner +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5407 dspenner@sidley.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Ehrenberg +1 212 558 3269 +1 212 558 3588 ehrenbergs@sullcrom.com
Space Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. +1 212 558 3121 +1 212 558 3341 giuffrar@sullcrom.com
Space Thomas Charles White +1 212 558 3551 +1 212 558 3588 whitet@sullcrom.com
No Logo The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Randall Cox +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 530 9539 dcox@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Tower Research Capital LLC, Defendant
No Logo Tradebot Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angus White Dwyer +1 816 292 8338 adwyer@spencerfane.com
Space J. Loyd Gattis, III +1 816 292 8357 lgattis@spencerfane.com
Space Arnold Richard Kaplan +1 303 839 3809 +1 303 839 3838 akaplan@spencerfane.com
Space Stuart Harris Pack +1 303 839 3825 +1 303 839 3838 spack@spencerfane.com
No Logo Tradeworx, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 202 383 0716 +1 202 637 3593 thomas.bundy@sutherland.com
Space Holly H. Smith +1 202 383 0245 holly.smith@sutherland.com
UBS AG UBS AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Impsat Corp
Unknown Role, Ubs Capital II Inc
Unknown Role, Ip Factory Inc
Unknown Role, Muniyield Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles Bohan +1 312 902 5200 +1 312 577 4734 david.bohan@kattenlaw.com
Space William Michael Regan +1 212 940 8800 william.regan@kattenlaw.com
Space Allison Michele Wuertz +1 212 940 6675 +1 212 940 8776 allison.wuertz@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Virtu Financial Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Garry Gordon +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 373 2037 agordon@paulweiss.com
Space Ankush Khardori +1 212 373 3421 +1 212 492 0421 akhardori@paulweiss.com
Space Daniel Jonathan Kramer +1 212 373 3020 +1 212 492 0020 dkramer@paulweiss.com
No Logo Applied Financial Science, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia I. Avery +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 pavery@wolfpopper.com
Space Fei-Lu Qian +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 fqian@wolfpopper.com
Space Joshua W. Ruthizer +1 212 759 4600 jruthizer@wolfpopper.com
Space Chet Barry Waldman +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 CWaldman@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Dominic A. Morelli, Movant
No Logo Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Movant
No Logo Forsta AP-fonden, Movant
No Logo James J. Flynn, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward G Schloss Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor E. Stewart +1 201 445 3661 +1 201 445 5301 victornj@ix.netcom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Taylor Isquith, Jr. +1 212 608 1900 +7194 719 719 4775 fisquith@lshllp.com
No Logo Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Movant
No Logo State-Boston Retirement System, Movant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (515) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 3/20/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 1/18/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 11/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 5/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 288 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (285 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 56 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal,, filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, State-Boston Retirement System, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, City of Providence, Rhode Island. USCA Case Number 15-3057. Appellant Forsta AP-fonden moves to withdraw as an Appellant from this appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining parties. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 01/08/2016. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(nd) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 287 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (285 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 56 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal,, filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, State-Boston Retirement System, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, City of Providence, Rhode Island. USCA Case Number 15-3057. The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice as to Appellees Barclays PLC and Barclays Capital Inc, pursuant to FRAP 42(b). The stipulation hereby is so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 10/27/2015. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(nd) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (285 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 56 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, State-Boston Retirement System, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, City of Providence, Rhode Island were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF. (tp) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 285 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (284 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 55 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) Notice of Appeal,, (282 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 50 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (51 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 283 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF) Clerk's Judgment,,,,,,. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System, City of Providence, Rhode Island. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Brown, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - NOT ALL ORDERS SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL from (282 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF) Memorandum & Opinion, (283 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF) Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11428929. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Brown, Andrew) Modified on 9/25/2015 (tp). (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 283 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT:That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated August 26, 2015, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Complaints in these cases are granted; that leaves only the question of whether Great Pacific and the SDNY plaintiffs should be granted leave to amend their complaints for a second and third time, respectively; the SDNY Plaintiffs do not ask for leave to amend, and the Court will not grant them leave sua sponte, both because amendment would likely be futile and because, in granting leave to file a second amended complaint, the Court expressly warned the SDNY Plaintiffs that the would not be given another opportunity to address the issues raised in Defendants' motions to dismiss; Great Pacific is granted leave to file a second amended complaint no later than four weeks from August 26, 2015, the date of the Opinion and Order, that said because Great Pacific's case (15-CV-168) will be the only matter still pending in the MDL, the Parties are ordered to show cause in writing no later than two weeks from August 26, 2015, the date of the Opinion and Order why the Court should not suggest to the JPML that 15-CV-168 be remanded to the Central District of California and the MDL closed; the Complaints are dismissed; 14-MD-2589 and all member cases are closed, except for 15-CV-168. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/28/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(dt) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 282 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER re: (7 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. filed by New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Bats Global Markets, Inc., NYSE Arca, Inc., (23 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays PLC, (15 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays PLC: For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Complaints in these cases are GRANTED, and the Complaints are dismissed in their entirety. That leaves only the question of whether Great Pacific and the SDNY Plaintiffs should be granted leave to amend their complaints for a second and third time, respectively. The SDNY Plaintiffs do not ask for leave to amend, and the Court will not grant them leave sua sponte, both because amendment would likely be futile and because, in granting leave to file a second amended complaint, the Court expressly warned the SDNY Plaintiffs that they would not be given another opportunity to address the issues raised in Defendants' motions to dismiss. See, e.g., Clark v. Kitt, No. 12-CV-8061 (CS), 2014 WL 4054284, at *15 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 15, 2014) (holding that the plaintiff's failure to remedy the complaint's deficiencies identified by an earlier motion to dismiss "is alone sufficient ground to deny leave to amend"); see also, e.g., Ruotolo v. City of N.Y., 514 F.3d 184, 191 (2d Cir. 2008) (affirming the district court's denial of leave to amend in part because of the previous opportunities that the plaintiff had received to amend the complaint). (See 14-CV-2811, Docket No. 246). Great Pacific, however, does seek leave to amend (Great Pacific Mem. 25), and its request is on firm ground given "the liberal standard set forth in Rule 15" of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure." Loreley Fin. No. 3 Ltd., 2015 WL 4492258, at *24. As discussed, many of the deficiencies in the Amended Complaint turn on Great Pacific's failure to plead sufficient facts to establish a plausible claim rather than an inherently flawed legal theory. And while Great Pacific was also granted leave to amend its complaint after Barclays's initial motion to dismiss and warned that it would not be given another opportunity to address the deficiencies alleged by Barclays (see Barclays's Reply Mem. 10), the initial motion and the present motion are not identical and the earlier amendment was made "in the critical absence of a definitive ruling." Loreley Fin. No. 3 Ltd., 2015 WL 4492258, at *25. Put simply, the Court cannot say that Great Pacific is unable to plead facts sufficient to survive a motion to dismiss and, therefore, that amendment would necessarily be futile. See Lucente v. Int'l Bus. Machines Corp., 310 F.3d 243, 258 (2d Cir. 2002). ("[A]mendment... is futile if the proposed claim could not withstand a motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)."). Accordingly, Great Pacific is granted leave to file a second amended complaint no later than four weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order. That said, because Great Pacific's case (15-CV-168) will be the only matter still pending in the MDL, the parties are ordered to show cause in writing no later than two weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order why the Court should not suggest to the JPML that 15-CV-168 be remanded to the Central District of California and the MDL closed. As discussed at the outset of this Opinion and Order, the Court's task in deciding the present motions was not to wade into the larger public debate about HFT that was sparked by Michael Lewis's book Flash Boys. Lewis and the critics of HFT may be right in arguing that it serves no productive purpose and merely allows certain traders to exploit technological inefficiencies in the markets at the expense of other traders. They may also be right that there is a need for regulatory or other action from the SEC or entities such as the Exchanges and Barclays. Those, however, are debates and tasks for others. The Court's narrow task was, instead, to decide whether the Complaints in these cases were legally sufficient to survive Defendants' motions to dismiss. Having concluded that they are not, the Complaints must be and are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 14-MD-2589, Docket Nos. 7, 15, and 23, and to close all member cases except for 15-CV-168. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/26/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(tn) Modified on 8/26/2015 (tn). (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from George A. Borden dated 7/1/15 re: Response to Letter from City of Providence Plaintiffs Dated June 29, 2015. Document filed by Barclays Plc, NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Borden, George) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 280 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated July 1, 2015 re: Response to Letter from City of Providence Plaintiffs Dated June 29, 2015. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (43 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 278 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF) Notice (Other) filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Joshua H Saltzman terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(tn) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF JOSHUA H. SALTZMAN. Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Saltzman, Joshua) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated June 11, 2015 re: June 18, 2015 Oral Argument. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (37 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 275 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF) Letter, filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The surreply may not exceed 5 pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this letter in 14-MD-2589 and 14-CV-2811. (Surreplies due by 5/22/2015.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/20/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(tn) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph F. Rice dated 05/19/15 re: Permission To Submit a Sur-Reply. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Rice, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: that the requests for oral argument are hereby GRANTED. The Court will hold argument on all three motions on June 18, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Oral argument will tentatively be divided as further set forth in this order. For each motion, a single lawyer shall argue for each side. No later than June 11, 2015, each side shall file a letter identifying the counsel who will argue each motion. Further, counsel should confer in an effort to coordinate arguments so as to minimize any redundancy between the arguments on the different motions. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (15 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, (7 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, (23 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/13/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(tn) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated May 8, 2015 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Plc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jeffrey T. Scott in Support re: (15 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Plc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 271 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (15 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jessica L. Pahl dated 5/8/2015 re: Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, LLC, NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Pahl, Jessica) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (7 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, LLC, NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Pahl, Jessica) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 268 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank plc, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc. for Barclays Capital, Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital, Inc..(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot (241) Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot (244) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-02811-JMF: the previously filed motions to dismiss in those cases are denied as moot. The page limits and briefing schedule listed in Order Number 1 of this MDL shall govern the briefing for Defendants' motions. (See 14-MD-2589, Docket No. 2; 14-CV-2811, Docket No. 232). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate 14-CV-2811, Docket Nos. 241 and 244. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/26/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF (tn) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Capital, Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/26/2015 (lb). (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 265 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Hughes, III on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Hughes, John) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 264 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Hunter Reynard on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Reynard, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 263 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Schwartz on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brent James McIntosh on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(McIntosh, Brent) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 261 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Barclays Capital, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 260 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (73 in 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 31 in 1:14-cv-04321-JMF, 64 in 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 259 in 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 5 in 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 24 in 1:15-cv-00168-JMF) Letter, filed by Barclays Plc, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays PLC. ENDORSEMENT: Upon review of the parties' letters, the Court agrees that there is no need or basis for a consolidated complaint. The parties' proposed schedule for amendment of the complaint and motion practice in Great Pacific is hereby GRANTED, as are the proposed page limitations. The Court will not schedule a conference at this time. All other dates and deadlines remain in effect. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2015. Motions due by 3/13/2015. Responses due by 4/17/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/22/2015) As per chambers, filed in all Member Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(tn) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 259 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated January 20, 2015 re: Order No. 1 - Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Barclays PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays Capital, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 258 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David W. Mitchell dated 01/20/2015 re: Order No. 1 - Joint Status Letter. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF et al.(Mitchell, David) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 257 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER NO. 1: The provisions of this Order shall govern the practice and procedure in the MDL-2589 Cases and any "tag-along" actions later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. The Clerk will send a copy of this Order to counsel for any plaintiffs or newly named defendants in any case newly filed or transferred to this Court. This Order vacates any case management or scheduling order issued by a state or federal court prior to the transfer of a case to MDL-2589. The MDL-2589 Cases are consolidated for pretrial purposes. Any "tag-along" actions later removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of New York, will automatically be consolidated with this action without the necessity of future motions or orders. By order entered November 25, 2014 (No. 14-CV-2811, Docket No. 253), the Court adopted the following briefing schedule: 1. Defendants will move to dismiss no later than January 23, 2015. 2. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss is due by March 24, 2015. 3. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be due no later than May 8, 2015. By order dated October 22, 2014, the Court established page limits for these filings and granted certain parties leave to file separate or supplemental briefs. (No. 14-CV-2811, Docket No. 232). These three orders shall remain in effect and apply to all the MDL-2589 Cases unless and until the Court orders otherwise. All other deadlines are STAYED. Further, any and all pending motions in Great Pacific are denied without prejudice, and will be adjudicated under procedures set forth in this Order and subsequent orders issued by this Court. The parties in the MDL-2589 Cases are directed to confer and, no later than January 20, 2015, file two joint letters not to exceed five single-spaced pages each, as further set forth. All orders, pleadings, motions, and other documents served or filed in MDL-2589 shall bear the caption as further set forth in this order. All papers filed in any of these cases shall be docketed on the master docket and on the docket of each individual case. An attorney need file only one pro hac vice motion, even if he or she is the attorney of record for more than one party. The pro hac vice motion should be filed in the MDL (14-MD-2589), and "spread" to all cases for which the attorney represents a party. The attorney shall be required to pay the pro hac vice fee only one time. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/12/2015) As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02589-JMF, 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF, 1:15-cv-00168-JMF(tn) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 256 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclays Capital, Inc.. (laq) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 255 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital, Inc., re: 252 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital, Inc., re: 252 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 251 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The proposed schedule is hereby adopted. The briefing structure and page limits set forth in the Court's Order of October 22, 2014 (Docket No. 232) shall apply unless and until the Court orders otherwise. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 251. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/25/2014) (tro) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 226 Amended Complaint,, against Barclays Plc, Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Barclays Capital, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, City of Providence, Rhode Island, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. Related document: 226 Amended Complaint,, filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, State-Boston Retirement System, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, City of Providence, Rhode Island.(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated Nov. 24, 2014. Document filed by Barclays Plc.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felicia Yvonne Mann on behalf of State-Boston Retirement System. (Mann, Felicia) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry M. Okun on behalf of State-Boston Retirement System. (Okun, Barry) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 248 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira A. Schochet on behalf of State-Boston Retirement System. (Schochet, Ira) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 247 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel H. Bernstein on behalf of State-Boston Retirement System. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 246 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by November 24, 2014. Plaintiffs will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiffs do not amend their complaint, the briefing schedule set forth in the Court's Order of May 15, 2014 (Docket No. 40) shall remain in place. If Plaintiffs do amend their complaint, the parties are directed to meet and confer and to submit a proposed amended briefing schedule for the Court's consideration no later than November 24, 2014. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2014.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/4/2014) (tn) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 244 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 244 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Responses due by 1/2/2015(Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 243 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Scott in Support re: 241 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Plc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Plc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 241 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Barclays Plc.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 240 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barclays PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Hughes, III on behalf of Barclays PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Hughes, John) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 238 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Hunter Reynard on behalf of Barclays PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Reynard, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 237 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Schwartz on behalf of Barclays PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 236 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brent James McIntosh on behalf of Barclays PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(McIntosh, Brent) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 235 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Barclays PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 233 Letter filed by Forsta AP-fonden, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the above-listed parties in Dockets 14-CV-3133, 14-CV-3608, and 14-CV-4321. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/28/2014) (ja) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 233 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph F. Rice dated October 27, 2014 Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden.(Rice, Joseph) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 230 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 231 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Exchange Defendants are granted leave to file a consolidated brief in support of their motion to dismiss, not to exceed 50 pages; BATS and Direct Edge are granted leave to file a supplemental brief not to exceed 15 pages; and Barclays is granted leave to file a separate brief not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiffs shall respond in a single consolidated memorandum of law not to exceed 80 pages. Reply briefs, if any, shall not exceed 15 pages for the Exchange Defendants; 7 pages for BATS and Direct Edge; and 10 pages for Barclays. All dates and deadlines remain the same. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages -- Separate Motion to Dismiss Brief of 25 Pages on Behalf of Barclays PLC -- addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey T. Scott dated October 22, 2014. Document filed by Barclays Plc.(Scott, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/23/2014 (db). (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from George A. Borden dated October 22, 2014. Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..(Borden, George) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants have 60 days from the filing of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint to move or otherwise answer to that complaint, meaning that Defendants' response is due November 3, 2014. The scheduling order also instructed the parties to "confer regarding proposed page limits on anticipated motions to dismiss and whether any matters may be addressed by joint briefing by some or all of the defendants," and to "submit joint or competing proposals for the Court's consideration." Having received no such proposals with respect to anticipated motions to dismiss, each side shall file consolidated briefs (i.e. on behalf of all parties), unless the Court grants leave to any individual party or parties on good cause shown (by letter motion filed on ECF) that a separate or supplemental brief is necessary to present an argument or arguments not presented in the consolidated brief. The parties are further instructed that they are to comply with this Court's Local Rules as to the page lengths of any briefs. If the parties believe that the number of pages permitted under the Local Rules is inadequate, they shall file a joint letter motion seeking leave to file longer briefs. Barclays Plc answer due 11/3/2014; Bats Global Markets, Inc. answer due 11/3/2014; Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc. answer due 11/3/2014; Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C. answer due 11/3/2014; NYSE Arca, Inc. answer due 11/3/2014; Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc. answer due 11/3/2014; New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C. answer due 11/3/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 11/3/2014. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/15/2014) (tn) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 224 225 and 227 Motions of Lowell H. Haky, Mai Petersen Klaassen, and Jessica L. Pahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Jessica L. Pahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10059442. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pahl, Jessica) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint,,,, against Barclays Plc, Bats Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., NYSE Arca, Inc., Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, City of Providence, Rhode Island, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. Related document: 2 Complaint,,,, filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island.(Brown, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Mai Petersen Klaassen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10019388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klaassen, Mai) Modified on 8/20/2014 (sdi). Modified on 8/20/2014 (bcu). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Lowell H. Haky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10019348. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haky, Lowell) Modified on 8/20/2014 (sdi). Modified on 8/20/2014 (bcu). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Warren Muenz on behalf of The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Muenz, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghana Shah on behalf of Tradeworx Inc.. (Shah, Meghana) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 221 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Board Options Exchange, Incorporated, Corporate Parent CBOE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CBSX (CBOE Stock Exchange, LLC) for National Stock Exchange, Inc.. Document filed by National Stock Exchange, Inc..(Dorkey, Charles) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 218 Motion for Joseph F. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBSX (CBOE Stock Exchange, LLC) for National Stock Exchange, Inc.. Document filed by National Stock Exchange, Inc..(Dorkey, Charles) Modified on 7/25/2014 (lb). (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joseph F. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Joseph) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph F. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Joseph) Modified on 7/23/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 216 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (214) Motion for Joshua Littlejohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-cv-02811-JMF. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions associated with this Order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF (mro) Modified on 7/28/2014 (mro). (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph F. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9915031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Rice, Joseph) Modified on 7/23/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joshua Littlejohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9914486. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Littlejohn, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 213 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Kostolampros on behalf of National Stock Exchange, Inc.. (Kostolampros, George) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-3745 (KBF); 14-cv-3865 (KBF). Document filed by National Stock Exchange, Inc..(Dorkey, Charles) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-3745 (KBF); 14-cv-3865 (KBF); 14-cv-3866 (KBF). Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc., NASDAQ OMX PHLX LLC, Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..(Levine, Seth) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William H. Narwold on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF(Narwold, William) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 210
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting (167) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (167) Motion to Appoint; granting (167) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (170) Motion to Appoint; terminating (173) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-02811-JMF; terminating (6) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-04321-JMF. In light of the foregoing, and upon review of the Institutional Investors' motion papers and the complaints in all four cases, the Institutional Investors' motion is GRANTED in all respects. That is, the Court agrees that the cases are substantially similar and that judicial efficiency would be promoted by their consolidation. Accordingly, the four cases captioned above are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Additionally, the Institutional Investors are appointed lead Plaintiffs and their chosen counsel-Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, Motley Rice LLC, and Labaton Sucharow LLP-are appointed as lead counsel. In light of these decisions, the Court sees no reason to hold the conference previously scheduled in these cases for July 9, 2014, and that conference is hereby CANCELLED. The parties are reminded that the schedule set by the Court's endorsement of May 15, 2014 (14-CV-2811, Docket No. 40) remains in effect. Pursuant to that schedule, the Institutional Investors shall file an amended, consolidated complaint within sixty days of this order or otherwise indicate their intent to rely on the previously filed complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these four cases for all purposes and to terminate Docket Numbers 167, 170, and 173 in 14-CV-2811, and Docket Number 6 in 14-CV-4321. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/2/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-02811-JMF, 1:14-cv-03133-JMF, 1:14-cv-03608-JMF, 1:14-cv-04321-JMF (mro) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 209
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles E. Dorkey, III on behalf of National Stock Exchange, Inc.. (Dorkey, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 . MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. (Stocker, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The upcoming conference in this case, scheduled to take place on July 9, 2014, at 3:30 p.m., will take place in Courtroom 506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Please note that this is not the undersigned's regular courtroom. Counsel shall check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. Counsel should arrive at the Courthouse with sufficient time to go through security. Seats in the courtroom may not be reserved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/30/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re: 167 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 . MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by James J. Flynn, Dominic A. Morelli. (Stewart, Victor) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua H Saltzman on behalf of Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Saltzman, Joshua) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fei-Lu Qian on behalf of Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Qian, Fei-Lu) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Wolf Ruthizer on behalf of Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Ruthizer, Joshua) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia I. Avery on behalf of Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Avery, Patricia) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chet Barry Waldman on behalf of Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Waldman, Chet) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc..(Waldman, Chet) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re: 167 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 . MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Notice of Non-Opposition. Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Avery, Patricia) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Agnes Dunogue on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. New Address: Shearman & Sterling LLP, 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York, 10022,. (Dunogue, Agnes) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 194 Motion for Thomas E. Douglass to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 195 Motion for Christopher M. Hohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Christopher M. Hohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9823535. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scottrade Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Helen) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Thomas E. Douglass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9823492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scottrade Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Helen) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Scottrade Financial Services, Inc..(Kim, Helen) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helen Byung-Son Kim on behalf of Scottrade Financial Services, Inc.. (Kim, Helen) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 190 Motion for Thomas A. Bousnakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Thomas A. Bousnakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9822196. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chopper Trading, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bousnakis, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 186 Motion for Paul E. Dengel to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 187 Motion for Elyse K. Yang to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 188 Motion for Paul E. Greenwalt, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Paul E. Greenwalt, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9818072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order granting admission pro hac vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Paul Greenwalt)(Greenwalt, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Elyse K. Yang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9817476. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing in New York, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing in Georgia, # 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing in Illinois)(Yang, Elyse) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Paul E. Dengel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9816894. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting admission pro hac vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dengel, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court has scheduled a hearing on the various motions to appoint lead plaintiffs in these putative class actions. At that hearing, to be held on July 9, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, the Court will also consider Applied Financial Science, Inc.'s motion to consolidate all four actions. (See, e.g., 14-CV-2811 Docket No. 170). The parties to these cases should be prepared to discuss whether and to what extent consolidation would be appropriate or desirable. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/23/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C.. Document filed by NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C..(Farina, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 178 Motion for Chris Lind to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 179 Motion for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 180 Motion for Steven Michael Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 181 Motion for Nevin M. Gewertz to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 182 Motion for Elizabeth L. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Elizabeth L. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9797399. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citadel LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Massachusetts - Good Standing Certificate, # 2 New York - Good Standing Certificate, # 3 DC - Good Standing Certificate, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Nevin M. Gewertz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9797085. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citadel LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - IL, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - NY, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gewertz, Nevin) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Steven Michael Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9797041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farina, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9796932. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citadel LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoeflich, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Chris Lind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9796726. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citadel LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - CO, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - IL, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lind, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Anthony Borden on behalf of NYSE Arca, Inc., New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C.. (Borden, George) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victor E. Stewart on behalf of James J. Flynn, Dominic A. Morelli. (Stewart, Victor) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by James J. Flynn, Dominic A. Morelli. (Isquith, Fred) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 173 MOTION to Appoint James J. Flynn and Dominic A,. Morelli to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by James J. Flynn, Dominic A. Morelli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isquith, Fred) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint James J. Flynn and Dominic A,. Morelli to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by James J. Flynn, Dominic A. Morelli.(Isquith, Fred) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Fei-Lu Qian in Support re: 170 MOTION to Appoint Applied Financial Science, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate related actions, and for approval of selection of lead counsel.. Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Michele Marotta, # 4 Exhibit D - Wolf Popper Firm Bio)(Avery, Patricia) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 170 MOTION to Appoint Applied Financial Science, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate related actions, and for approval of selection of lead counsel. . Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc.. (Avery, Patricia) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Applied Financial Science, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate related actions, and for approval of selection of lead counsel. Document filed by Applied Financial Science, Inc.. Return Date set for 7/9/2014 at 03:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Avery, Patricia) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Patrick J. Coughlin in Support re: 167 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 . MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Coughlin, Patrick) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 . MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Forsta AP-fonden, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, State-Boston Retirement System. (Coughlin, Patrick) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-02811; 1:14-cv-03133; 1:14-cv-03608; 1:14-cv-4321 ., MOTION to Appoint City of Providence, Rhode Island; Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund; Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands; State-Boston Retirement System; Forsta AP-fonden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, State-Boston Retirement System, Forsta AP-fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coughlin, Patrick) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tower Research Capital L.L.C..(Mandel, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hudson River Trading L.L.C..(Mandel, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GTS Securities, L.L.C..(Mandel, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has notified the Court that the required notice was published on April 18, 2014. (Docket No. 154). Members of the purported class therefore have until June 17, 2014, to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiffs. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference shall be held on July 9, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. It is further ORDERED that opposition to any motion for appointment of lead plaintiff shall be served and filed by July 1, 2014. It is further ORDERED that the named plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on any and all defendants who have not yet entered a notice of appearance in these actions. ( Motions due by 6/17/2014., Responses due by 7/1/2014) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/10/2014) (mro) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Michael Regan on behalf of UBS AG. (Regan, William) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Charles White on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (White, Thomas) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Ehrenberg on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Ehrenberg, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 157 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Dismissal of BOX Options Exchange LLC Without Prejudice. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Coughlin, Patrick) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Neil Eisenberg on behalf of Jump Trading, L.L.C.. (Eisenberg, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 153 Motion for Jonathan N. Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Response to May 15, 2014 Court Order re: 40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Andrew) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Jonathan N. Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9728641. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jump Trading, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara B. Brody on behalf of The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Brody, Sara) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 150 Motion for Sara B. Brody to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Sara B. Brody to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for pro hac vice admission)(Brody, Sara) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 96 , 97 , 105 , and 106 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Paul Krebs, Stephen Patrick Bedell, Howard S. Suskin, and Dean N. Panos. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chopper Trading, L.L.C. served on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Virtu Financial Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Justin Waldie, General Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tradeworx Inc. served on 4/28/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tradebot Systems, Inc. served on 4/28/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. Service was accepted by Benton Chan, Compliance Officer. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tower Research Capital L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Alex O'Conner. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Quantlab Financial L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Tim McInturf, Executive Vice President & General Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. KCG Holdings, Inc. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Service was accepted by Thomas Merritt, Senior Managing Director. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jump Trading, L.L.C. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Service was accepted by Desiree Desalle, Attorney. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hudson River Trading L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Sylvia Mrozweski. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GTS Securities, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Patrick Romanello, Chief Compliance Officer. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. DRW Holdings, L.L.C. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Service was accepted by Kevin O'Brien, Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Citadel LLC served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Shawn Faga, General Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Nicole Neumann, Senior Analyst of Regulatory Compliance. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Scottrade Financial Services, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Mack McCain, Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fidelity Brokerage Services, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Wayne Shepard. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. FMR, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Monica Barbosa, Legal Analyst. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ETrade Financial Corporation served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Melodie Strawn, Senior Executive Assistant to the President. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Charles Schwab Corporation served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Charles Gomez, Legal Specialist. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citadel LLC.(Valentine, John) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Andrew Valentine on behalf of Citadel LLC. (Valentine, John) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. UBS AG served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Michele Taylor. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Lawrence Barbot, Director. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Siobhan Florvil, Legal Specialist II. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Joanne Cook, Vice President. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Deutsche Bank AG served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Paralegal. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Citigroup Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Fern Strauss, Vice President. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bank of America Corporation served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Paula Schmitt. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NYSE Arca, Inc. served on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Stock Exchange, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Matthew R. Rivera, Paralegal. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. National Stock Exchange, Inc. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Service was accepted by Mary Paterson. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NASDAQ OMX PHLX LLC served on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Venu Palaparthi, Vice President. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Venu Palaparthi, Vice President. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Samir Patel, Assistant General Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Service was accepted by Chris Solgan, Corporate Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. C2 Options Exchange, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Joseph Green, IP Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by James Ongena, General Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Joseph Green, IP Counsel. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Box Options Exchange L.L.C. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. Service was accepted by Beth Mahon. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. for NASDAQ OMX PHLX LLC, Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX PHLX LLC, Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..(Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bats Global Markets, Inc. served on 4/28/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. Service was accepted by Buffee Boggs-Gillihan. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Randall Cox on behalf of Nasdaq OMX BX, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., NASDAQ OMX PHLX LLC. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Thomas Paul Krebs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9717511. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GTS Securities, L.L.C., Hudson River Trading L.L.C., Tower Research Capital L.L.C..(Krebs, Thomas) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Stephen Patrick Bedell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9717469. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GTS Securities, L.L.C., Hudson River Trading L.L.C., Tower Research Capital L.L.C..(Bedell, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark S. Mandel on behalf of GTS Securities, L.L.C., Hudson River Trading L.L.C., Tower Research Capital L.L.C.. New Address: Foley & Lardner LLP, 90 Park Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10016, 2126827474. (Mandel, Mark) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Julia Marie Beskin on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10010, 212-849-7000. (Beskin, Julia) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ETrade Financial Corporation.(Gay, Faith) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Marie Beskin on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation. (Beskin, Julia) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Corey Worcester on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation. (Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Laurence Greenwald on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation. (Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Faith E. Gay on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation. (Gay, Faith) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Howard S. Suskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9713712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chopper Trading, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Suskin, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Dean N. Panos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9713648. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chopper Trading, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Panos, Dean) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,, Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,, . Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Brody, Sara) Modified on 5/29/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Virgil Maugeri on behalf of Quantlab Financial L.L.C.. (Maugeri, Alexander) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jackie Adeline Lu on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation. New Address: Sidley Austin LLP, 787 7th Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212 839 5300. (Lu, Jackie) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER VACATING DESIGNATION OF CASE FOR INCLUSION IN PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES: This case was previously designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the "Pilot Project"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that such designation is vacated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/22/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citigroup Inc..(Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Agnes Dunogue on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. (Dunogue, Agnes) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark D. Lanpher on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. (Lanpher, Mark) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. (Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 83 Motion for Thomas R. Bundy, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Michele Wuertz on behalf of UBS AG. (Wuertz, Allison) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Seth L. Levine on behalf of Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc.. New Address: Levine Lee LLP, 666 Fifth Avenue, 35th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10103, 212-223-4400. (Levine, Seth) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark S. Mandel on behalf of GTS Securities, L.L.C., Hudson River Trading L.L.C., Tower Research Capital L.L.C.. (Mandel, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Thomas R. Bundy, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradeworx Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates)(Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. New Address: Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP, 1000 Walnut St., Suite 1400, Kansas City, MO, USA 64106, 816-474-8100. (Dwyer, Angus) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 76 Motion for Joseph C. Lombard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Alexander Richards on behalf of Quantlab Financial L.L.C.. (Richards, Daniel) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Quantlab Holdings, LLC for Quantlab Financial L.L.C.. Document filed by Quantlab Financial L.L.C..(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joe Wesley Earnhardt on behalf of Quantlab Financial L.L.C.. (Earnhardt, Joe) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard W Clary on behalf of Quantlab Financial L.L.C.. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Joseph C. Lombard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9692542. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc., Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C., International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - MD, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - D.C., # 3 Text of Proposed Order, Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Lombard, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 73 Motion for Andrew J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 72 Motion for Holly H. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Andrew J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9690096. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Providence, Rhode Island.(Brown, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Holly H. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9689757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradeworx Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(Smith, Holly) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas R. Bundy, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9689711. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradeworx Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(Bundy, Thomas) Modified on 5/20/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for SARA BETH BRODY to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, # 2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Brody, Sara) Modified on 5/20/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sara Beth Brody to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9688849. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brody, Sara) Modified on 5/19/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBOE Holdings, Inc. for C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc.. Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc..(Hartman, Stacie) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arnold Richard Kaplan on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Kaplan, Arnold) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion for Arnold R. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christos Papapetrou on behalf of Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc.. (Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CHX Holdings, Inc. for Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc.. Document filed by Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc..(Levine, Seth) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth L. Levine on behalf of Chicago Stock Exchange, Inc.. (Levine, Seth) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc..(Hartman, Stacie) Modified on 5/19/2014 (lb). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacie Rachel Hartman on behalf of C2 Options Exchange, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange, Inc.. (Hartman, Stacie) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jump Trading Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Jump Financial, LLC for Jump Trading, L.L.C.. Document filed by Jump Trading, L.L.C..(Flocos, Peter) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Nicholas Flocos on behalf of Jump Trading, L.L.C.. (Flocos, Peter) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Harris Pack on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Pack, Stuart) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tradebot Systems, Inc..(Dwyer, Angus) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Loyd Gattis on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Gattis, James) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Motion for James Loyd Gattis III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for James Loyd Gattis III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing-MO, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing-KS, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gattis, James) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jackie Adeline Lu on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation. (Lu, Jackie) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Jason Kaplan on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation. (Kaplan, Alex) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Toronto-Dominion Bank for TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation. Document filed by TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation.(Pietrzak, Alfred) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred Robert Pietrzak on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation. (Pietrzak, Alfred) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 44 Motion for Stuart H. Pack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Jefferies LLC for KCG Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by KCG Holdings, Inc..(Lowenthal, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell A. Lowenthal on behalf of KCG Holdings, Inc.. (Lowenthal, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis J. Liman on behalf of KCG Holdings, Inc.. (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Arnold R. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9679168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kaplan, Arnold) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Stuart H. Pack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9678557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Pack, Stuart) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Charles Schwab Corporation.(Spenner, Dorothy) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dorothy Jane Spenner on behalf of The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Spenner, Dorothy) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Dwyer, Angus) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The proposed schedule is hereby adopted as an order of the Court. In addition, no later than May 30, 2014, Plaintiff shall advise the Court in writing of the date and manner in which it published the notice required by 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 5. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/15/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Borse AG, Corporate Parent Eurex Frankfurt AG, Corporate Parent U.S. Exchange Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Eurex Zurich AG, Corporate Parent Eurex Global Derivatives AG for International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc..(Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore R. Snyder on behalf of International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc.. (Snyder, Theodore) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Alwin Murphy on behalf of International Securities Exchange Holdings, Inc.. (Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Direct Edge Holdings, LLC for Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C.. Document filed by Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C..(Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore R. Snyder on behalf of Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C.. (Snyder, Theodore) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Alwin Murphy on behalf of Direct Edge ECN, L.L.C.. (Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bats Global Markets, Inc..(Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore R. Snyder on behalf of Bats Global Markets, Inc.. (Snyder, Theodore) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Alwin Murphy on behalf of Bats Global Markets, Inc.. (Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings Inc for Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C..(Edelman, Scott) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Laroche on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C.. (Laroche, Matthew) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Alexander Edelman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C.. (Edelman, Scott) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Zeldin on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Zeldin, Boris) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent VFH Parent, LLC, Corporate Parent Virtu Financial, LLC for Virtu Financial Inc.. Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc..(Kramer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Frischer, Harry) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Lawrence Friedman on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Friedman, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ankush Khardori on behalf of Virtu Financial Inc.. (Khardori, Ankush) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Garry Gordon on behalf of Virtu Financial Inc.. (Gordon, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jonathan Kramer on behalf of Virtu Financial Inc.. (Kramer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by UBS AG.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of UBS AG. (Bohan, David) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Januszewski, David) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,574 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?