Cotemar S.A. de C.V., et al v. Hornbeck Offshore Services, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 13-20230

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 11:53 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502586618 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Hornbeck Offshore Operators, Limited Liability Corporation, Hornbeck Offshore Services, Incorporated, Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. and Osv Hos Beaufort, in rem Date of Service: 04/07/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Moore, Palmer; Attorney for Appellees: Fowler, LeBreton, Llamas, Renshaw, Strickland [13-20230] (Edward Francis LeBreton III)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502586003 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
    SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L.. Date of service: 04/04/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Moore, Palmer; Attorney for Appellees: Fowler, LeBreton, Llamas, Renshaw, Strickland ; ; [13-20230] (Julia M. Palmer )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502585135 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Status Report received from Appellants Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L. [13-20230] This document was filed as a status report. If it your intent to cite to other cases this should be filed as a Rule 28(j) letter. If your intent is to further supporting the Brief and Oral Argument then a Motion to file a supplemental brief must be filed. (DMS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502585123 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
        DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Status Report received from Appellants Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L. because the exact same document was filed right after this filing but included an exhibit. [13-20230] (DMS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502578402 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
          APPELLEES SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER BRIEF FILED by Appellees Hornbeck Offshore Operators, Limited Liability Corporation, Hornbeck Offshore Services, Incorporated, Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. and Osv Hos Beaufort, in rem Date of Service: 03/31/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Moore, Palmer; Attorney for Appellees: Fowler, LeBreton, Llamas, Renshaw, Strickland [13-20230] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. No paper copies required at this time. E/Res's Supplemental Brief deadline satisfied [13-20230] (Edward Francis LeBreton III)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502578395 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
            APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER BRIEF FILED by Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L. Date of service: 03/31/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Moore, Palmer; Attorney for Appellees: Fowler, LeBreton, Llamas, Renshaw, Strickland [13-20230] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. No paper copies required at this time. A/Pet's Supplemental Brief deadline satisfied. [13-20230] (Julia M. Palmer )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502572807 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
              COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED to file simultaneous letter briefs with the clerk by 10:00 A.M., Monday, March 31, on the effect of the seizure of the M/V Hos Beaufort on the appeal pending before this Court in this Case. [7594668-2] A/Pet Supplemental Brief due on 03/31/2014 for Appellants Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L... E/Res Supplemental Brief due on 03/31/2014 for Appellees Hornbeck Offshore Operators, Limited Liability Corporation, Hornbeck Offshore Services, Incorporated, Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. and Osv Hos Beaufort, in rem.. [13-20230] (DMS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502571180 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                Motion of Appellants Cotemar S.A. de C.V., Exeter Marine Limited and Ocean Oil Construction and Services S.A.R.L. for judicial notice. Date of Service: 03/24/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Moore, Palmer; Attorney for Appellees: Fowler, LeBreton, Llamas, Renshaw, Strickland [13-20230] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. [7593565-3]. Date of service: 03/24/2014 [13-20230] (Julia M. Palmer )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 17 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?