Miorelli et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-02073
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 4:09 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Chris Miorelli, Plaintiff

Represented by Figari Law, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Emily Cowin Figari +1 415 235 2100 +1 415 963 4301 barbara@figarilaw.com
No Logo Trina, USA LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Charles Bowman, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS PARK, Defendant
No Logo Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky N. Unruh +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 runruh@schiffhardin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wyndham Worldwide Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Letter Brief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation.. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                  AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Chris Miorelli, Trina, USA LLC. Filed byWyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal, (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-538177. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8593623). Filed byWyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Wordwide Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 219 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?