ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:14-cv-00343
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 6:20 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Peter Bruskin +1 202 307 5958 +1 202 514 8264 eric.bruskin@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Peter Bruskin for USA . (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC. Service: 4/24/2014.(ar) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [03-2663], filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC. Service: 4/24/2014.(ar) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ar) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ar) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 076560) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC.Answer due by 6/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 128 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?