NOTICE of APPEAL by plaintiffs Indep Construc Equip et al from Dist. Court decision [51-1] (cc:Dft by clerk) (CM, ilcd)
51
Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995
Judgment*
JUDGMENT in a civil case entered. Judgment is entered in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiffs. Case is terminated. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
50
Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995
Order
ORDER by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court is denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [42-1] denying motion for summary judgment [35-1] and granting defendant's motion for summary judgment [39-1]. Case is terminated. terminating the case (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
49
Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995
Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd) Modified on 03/08/1995
48
Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995
Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Robert Curry (DK, ilcd) Modified on 03/08/1995
47
Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/16/1995
Statement of Facts
AMENDED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by defendant Hyster-Yale, defendant Hyster Company (DK, ilcd)
46
Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/16/1995
Response to Motion
RESPONSE by defendant Hyster-Yale, defendant Hyster Company to Amended motion for summary judgment [42-1] (DK, ilcd)
45
Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995
Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to motion for summary judgment [39-1] (DK, ilcd)
44
Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995
Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of John R. Blake regarding memorandum [41-1] (DK, ilcd)
43
Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995
Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd)
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale for summary judgment (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone by Atty Wallace/Newcomb re motion to extend time to file dispositive motions [33-1] on 12/8/94. Court is granting motion to extend time to file dispositive motions [33-1] and granting motion to extend time to file dispositive motions and respond to Motion for Summary Judgment [38-1]. Motion filing deadline of 1/23/95 for Plaintiff's and Defendant's motions. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale, defendant Hyster Company to extend time to file dispositive motions and respond to Motion for Summary Judgment (DK, ilcd)
37
Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994
Answer
ANSWER TO COUNT III of the Amended Complaint by defendant Hyster-Yale (DK, ilcd)
36
Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994
Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd)
MOTION by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip for summary judgment (DK, ilcd)
34
Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994
Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Court is setting motion to extend time to file dispositive motions [33-1] for a motion hearing at 10:45 on Thursday, 12/8/94 via phone, court to call.(cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
MOTION by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip for leave to file amended complaint (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone by Attys Nelson for Wallace and Atty Smith and Newcomb for Initial Pretrial/ Status hearing held 11:30 9/22/94. Discovery deadline of 11/15/94 set. Motion filing deadline of 11/22/94 for any summary judgment motions. Any responses are due within 21 days thereafter. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Case is set for a Status hearing at 11:30 on Thursday, 9/22/94 via phone, court to call. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
30
Filed: 8/18/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994
Response
RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd)
29
Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994
Answer
ANSWER by defendant Hyster-Yale (DK, ilcd)
28
Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: 7/25/1994
Order
ORDER by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. The Court is adopting the Magistrate's report & recommendation re: motion to dismiss [9-1] by Hyster-Yale [20-1]. Court is granting motion to dismiss [9-1] as to Count 1. Motion to Dismiss is denied as to Count 2. Hyster is ordered to answer to Count 2 within 21 days. Miscellaneous deadline of 8/12/94 for answer. Case referred to Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 7/22/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Parties present via phone by Attys Wallace/Smith/Newcomb for hearing re report & recommendation objection [22-1]. Oral argument by counsel. Court will enter a written order. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
27
Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 6/30/1994
Response
RESPONSE TO DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT BY DEFENDANTS by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/10/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. The court is granting motion to continue 7/7/94 hrg [26-1]. Court is resetting hrg on report & recommendation objection [22-1] on Thurs 7/21/94 at 4:30 PM via phone (court will call) (cc: all counsel) (CM, ilcd)
25
Filed: 6/7/1994, Entered: 6/7/1994
Trial Exhibit
EXHIBITS requested by the court (Hyster Kewanee Health Plan/Hyster Co dated 3/90 etc/Hyster Co Health Plan for Kewanee dated 1971/Successor collective Bargain Agmt between United Dominion and the ICEBU) for defendant Hyster-Yale stored in file (CM, ilcd)
26
Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/7/1994
Motion to Continue
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale to continue 7/7/94 hrg (CM, ilcd)
--
Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Case is set for a Status hearing RE: objections to the Magistrate's Recommendation at 4:30 on Thursday, 7/7/94 via phone, court to call. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 5/20/1994, Entered: 5/24/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Parties present via phone by Atty Wallace and Newcomb for hearing held at 4:00 5/20/94 re : Magistrate Recommendation. Hearing held. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: 5/17/1994
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court is setting this case for hearing re: objections to Magistrate Recommendation at 4:00 on Friday, 5/20/94 via phone, court to call. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
24
Filed: 4/28/1994, Entered: 4/28/1994
Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to response to report & recommendation motion re: motion to dismiss [9-1] by Hyster-Yale [20-1] (DK, ilcd)
23
Filed: 4/6/1994, Entered: 4/7/1994
Response
RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by defendant Hyster-Yale [22-1] (DK, ilcd)
22
Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994
Objection to Report and Recommendations
OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to magistrate's recommendation [20-1] (DK, ilcd)
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court is granting motion to extend time to file objection to Magistrate Recommendation [21-1]. Objection to Mag's Recommendation due 3/27/94 (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
MAGISTRATE'S RECOMMENDATION re: motion to dismiss [9-1] by Hyster-Yale by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Magistrate recommends that motion to dismiss be allowed in part and denied in part. Case referral terminated. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 12/21/1993, Entered: 12/21/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Court is granting motion for leave to file response to Plaintiff's additional Response to defendant's Motion to Dismiss [19-1] (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
19
Filed: 12/14/1993, Entered: 12/21/1993
Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale for leave to file response to Plaintiff's additional Response to defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Court is granting motion for leave to file Response to Plaintiff's Additional Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [18-1]. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
18
Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/7/1993
Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale for leave to file Response to Plaintiff's Additional Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DK, ilcd)
17
Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: 11/24/1993
Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to motion to dismiss [9-1] (Filed as Additional Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: 11/19/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. The Court has received several letters from the parties concerning substantive issues in this case. These letters will not be filed and do not become part of the record in this case. The parties are admonished to file PLEADINGS, not letters, with regard to the substance of this. Any further PLEADINGS addressing the pending motion to dismiss [9], must be on file on or before November 29, 1993. The court will not consider any substantive matter contained in a letter. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone with Atty Wallace and Newcomb for Status hearing held 10:00 11/12/93. Stay is lifted. Response re motion to dismiss [9-1] is due within 14 days or by 11/29/93. When response is filed or if not response is filed, Court will take motion to dismiss [9-1] under advisement. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 7/26/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to amend complaint by addition of paragraphs to Count 1 [16-1] (cc: all counsel) (CM, ilcd)
MOTION by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to amend complaint by addition of paragraphs to Count 1 (DK, ilcd)
15
Filed: 5/20/1993, Entered: 5/20/1993
Order
ORDER by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. IT IS ORDERED that this CASE IS STAYED. Court is denying motion to strike Plaintiff's Second Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [13-1]. Case is set for Status hearing at 10:00 11/12/93 via telephone, court to call. Ruling on motion to dismiss [9-1] is deferred. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
14
Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: 2/8/1993
Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion to strike Plaintiff's Second Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [13-1] by defendant Hyster-Yale (DK, ilcd)
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale to strike Plaintiff's Second Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 1/29/1993, Entered: 2/1/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone by Atty Wallace/Newcomb and Smith for Status hearing held 3:00 1/29/93. Court construes Document # 9 as a Motion to dismiss and Court is taking under advisement on 1/29/93 Motion to Dismiss [9-1](cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd) Modified on 02/11/1993
12
Filed: 1/28/1993, Entered: 1/28/1993
Response to Motion
SECOND RESPONSE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to Motion to Dismiss (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 1/14/1993, Entered: 1/14/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman finding the motion for hearing [9-1] moot. (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
11
Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: 1/8/1993
Response
ADDITIONAL RESPONSE by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to Defendant's Motion to Dismis (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 1/7/1993, Entered: 1/7/1993
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Case set for Status hearing on 1/28/93 is CANCELLED per request of attorney & reset to 3:00pm on Friday, 1/29/93 ;via phone, Crt. to set up call (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
10
Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: 12/22/1992
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to memorandum in opposition (which was construed as Motion to Dismiss Amended complaint) [9-1] by defendant Hyster-Yale (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: 12/21/1992
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone by Atty Newcomb/Smith/ and Cunningham for Wallace for Status hearing held 2:30 12/18/92. Miscellaneous deadline for Plaintiff to file Memo In Opposition is within 21 days or by 1/8/93. Case set for Status hearing at 2:00 on Thursday, 1/28/93 via phone, court to call. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
9
Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 5/20/1993
Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale to dismiss (memorandum in Opposition filed this date, construed as a motion to dismiss, per law clerk) (DK, ilcd) Modified on 02/10/1994
MOTION by plaintiff Indep Construc Equip to amend complaint (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 10/22/1992
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via telephone with Attys Smith/Newcomb and Atty Wallace in person for motion hearing re motion to dismiss [2-1]. Plaintiff files motion to amend complaint. Court is granting motion to amend complaint [5-1] and finding the motion to dismiss [2-1] moot. Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 14 days. Miscellaneous deadline for amended complaint is 11/5/92. Case set for Status hearing at 2:30 on Friday, 12/18/92 via phone, court to call. (cc: all counsel) (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 9/30/1992
Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman setting Hrg. on Pending Motions on Thurs. 10/22/92 at 2:00 p.m. via phone, Crt.to set up call. LOCAL ATTYS. IF THEY WISH, ARE WELCOME TO APPEAR IN PERSON IN ROCK ISLAND FOR THIS HEARING. Crt.sets the following motions: motion to dismiss [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
4
Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: 9/29/1992
Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiffs Indep Construc Equip, Et Al to motion to dismiss [2-1] (DK, ilcd)
3
Filed: 9/21/1992, Entered: 9/22/1992
Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion to dismiss [2-1] by defendant Hyster-Yale (DK, ilcd)
2
Filed: 9/21/1992, Entered: 9/22/1992
Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant Hyster-Yale to dismiss (DK, ilcd)
1
Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 9/15/1992
Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry County Circuit Case Number: 92-MR-83 Case referred to Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman (DK, ilcd)
--
Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 9/15/1992
Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID on 9/14/92 in the amount of $ 120.00 receipt # 07282. (DK, ilcd)